In Re Sony PS3 "Other OS" Litigation Featured Case

Plaintiff: Anthony Ventura
Defendant: Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc
 
Case Number: 3:2010cv01811
Filed: April 27, 2010
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
January 23, 2012 198 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form for proceedings held on 11/04/10; 07/21/11 before Judge Richard Seeborg, re 195 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA, 193 Notice of Appeal, Transcript due by 2/21/2012. (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 1/23/2012)
January 4, 2012 197 STIPULATION re 187 Bill of Costs, To Stay Taxing of Costs by Jonathan Huber, Anthony Ventura. (Coll, Rebecca) (Filed on 1/4/2012)
December 28, 2011 196 Featured Case ORDER DENYING MOTION TO RELATE CASES. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2011)
December 27, 2011 Copy of Notice of Appeal and Docket sheet mailed to all non-efilers. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2011)
December 27, 2011 195 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 193 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Appeal Notification Form) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/27/2011: # 2 Docket Sheet) (gba, COURT STAFF).
December 27, 2011 192 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC re 191 Proposed Order, 188 MOTION to Relate Case , 189 Declaration in Support, 190 Declaration in Support (Ott, Carter) (Filed on 12/27/2011)
December 27, 2011 191 Proposed Order re 188 MOTION to Relate Case by Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Ott, Carter) (Filed on 12/27/2011)
December 27, 2011 190 Declaration of Mike Scott in Support of 188 MOTION to Relate Case filed bySony Computer Entertainment America Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Related document(s) 188 ) (Ott, Carter) (Filed on 12/27/2011)
December 27, 2011 189 Declaration of Carter Ott in Support of 188 MOTION to Relate Case filed bySony Computer Entertainment America Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 188 ) (Ott, Carter) (Filed on 12/27/2011)
December 27, 2011 188 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Ott, Carter) (Filed on 12/27/2011)
December 22, 2011 194 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Todd Densmore, Jeffrey Harper, Antal Herz, Jonathan Huber, Zachary Kummer, Elton Stovell, Anthony Ventura re 193 Notice of Appeal. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2011)
December 22, 2011 193 NOTICE OF APPEAL; Representation Statement as to 185 Order, Terminated Case, 186 Judgment by Todd Densmore, Jeffrey Harper, Antal Herz, Jonathan Huber, Zachary Kummer, Elton Stovell, Anthony Ventura. Filing fee $ 455.00., Receipt Number 34611068478. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2011)
December 22, 2011 187 BILL OF COSTS by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Carter Ott in Support of Defendant's Bill of Costs, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(Ott, Carter) (Filed on 12/22/2011)
December 8, 2011 186 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/8/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2011)
December 8, 2011 185 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS, WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND, AND DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/8/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2011)
November 29, 2011 184 Featured Case STIPULATED ORDER REGARDING DOCUMENT PRODUCTION PROTOCOL 183 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 11/29/11. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
November 28, 2011 183 STIPULATION [PROPOSED] STIPULATED ORDER REGARDING DOCUMENT PRODUCTION PROTOCOL by Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Ott, Carter) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
October 6, 2011 182 NOTICE of Change of Address by Ralph B. Kalfayan (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kalfayan, Ralph) (Filed on 10/6/2011)
August 23, 2011 181 Statement re 173 Opposition/Response to Motion, [Statement of Recent Decision] by Jason Baker, Jonathan Huber, Elton Stovell, Anthony Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 8/23/2011)
July 25, 2011 180 Transcript of Proceedings held on 07/21/2011, before Judge Richard Seeborg. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/24/2011. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 7/25/2011)
July 21, 2011 179 Minute Entry:Motion Hearing held on 7/21/2011 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 7/21/2011).(Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/21/2011)
July 14, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated*** Release of Transcript Restriction date 02/14/2011 Date Terminated 109 Transcript. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
May 25, 2011 Due to Judge Chen's elevation to Article III status, this case is re-referred to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins for discovery. All matters scheduled before, and deadlines set by, Judge Chen are hereby vacated. All future discovery matters should be addressed to Judge Cousins unless otherwise ordered by the presiding judge. Until Judge Cousins takes the bench on July 5, 2011, any urgent discovery issues requiring immediate judicial attention should be addressed to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero by contacting his courtroom deputy, Karen Hom, at (415) 522-2035.; Judge Hon. Edward M. Chen no longer assigned to case. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
May 10, 2011 178 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 177 . Motion Hearing set for 7/21/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/10/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2011)
May 10, 2011 177 Proposed Order Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Continuing Hearing by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Sacks, Luanne) (Filed on 5/10/2011)
April 28, 2011 176 REPLY (re 168 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed bySony Computer Entertainment America Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Ott, Carter) (Filed on 4/28/2011)
April 26, 2011 175 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER re 174 Proposed Order filed by Jason Baker, Elton Stovell, Jonathan Huber, Anthony Ventura. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/26/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2011)
April 22, 2011 174 Proposed Order [[Proposed] Protective Order] by Jason Baker, Jonathan Huber, Elton Stovell, Anthony Ventura. (Coll, Rebecca) (Filed on 4/22/2011)
April 18, 2011 173 RESPONSE (re 168 MOTION to Dismiss ) [Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss] filed byJason Baker, Jonathan Huber, Elton Stovell, Anthony Ventura. (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
April 11, 2011 172 Featured Case ORDER Re Discovery Dispute From Letters of 169 170 171 April 1, 2011, April 6, 2011, and April 11, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/11/2011. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2011)
April 11, 2011 171 Letter from Rebecca Coll to Magistrate Judge Chen in response to SCEA's letter dated April 6, 2011. (Coll, Rebecca) (Filed on 4/11/2011)
April 6, 2011 170 Letter from SCEA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment A, # 2 Exhibit Attachment B, # 3 Exhibit Attachment C)(Ott, Carter) (Filed on 4/6/2011)
April 1, 2011 169 Letter from Plaintiffs to Magistrate Judge Chen. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 to 3, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits 4-6, # 3 Proof of Service)(Coll, Rebecca) (Filed on 4/1/2011)
March 28, 2011 168 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. Motion Hearing set for 5/12/2011 01:30 PM before Hon. Richard Seeborg. (Sacks, Luanne) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
March 24, 2011 167 Featured Case JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 166 PLEADING CHALLENGE BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Motion Hearing set for 5/12/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/23/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2011)
March 23, 2011 166 STIPULATION [Joint] and Proposed Order Regarding Pleading Challenge Briefing Schedule by Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Ott, Carter) (Filed on 3/23/2011)
March 9, 2011 165 AMENDED COMPLAINT [First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint] against Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. Filed byElton Stovell, Anthony Ventura, Jonathan Huber, Jason Baker. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 3/9/2011)
February 23, 2011 164 Letter from Luanne Sacks and Rececca Coll to Judge Chen. (Sacks, Luanne) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
February 18, 2011 163 Featured Case ORDER RE CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/17/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
February 17, 2011 162 Featured Case ORDER RE: 160 DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/17/11. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2011)
February 17, 2011 161 Featured Case ORDER RE: 96 , 97 GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS, WITH LEAVE TO AMEND, AND DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/17/11.(rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2011)
February 17, 2011 160 MOTION ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO FILE REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN FURTHER OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT SONY COMPUTER ENTERTAINMENT AMERICA, LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS re 104 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by Jason Baker, Jonathan Huber, Elton Stovell, Anthony Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit DECLARATION OF ROSEMARY M. RIVAS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO FILE REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN FURTHER OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT SONY COMPUTER ENTERTAINMENT AMERICA, LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Proposed Order)(Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 2/17/2011)
February 14, 2011 159 Letter from Carter Ott. (Ott, Carter) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
February 11, 2011 158 Letter from Rebecca Coll to Judge Seeborg. (Quadra, James) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
February 10, 2011 157 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 151 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Order on Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document Exhibit J to Declaration of Carter Ott in Support of Opposition to Motion to Compel and Motion for Protective Order by Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Ott, Carter) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
February 10, 2011 156 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 151 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Order on Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document Exhibit I to Declaration of Carter Ott in Support of Opposition to Motion to Compel and Motion for Protective Order by Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit I Volume 2, # 2 Exhibit I Volume 3, # 3 Exhibit I Volume 4, # 4 Exhibit I Volume 5, # 5 Exhibit I Volume 6, # 6 Exhibit I Volume 7, # 7 Exhibit I Volume 8, # 8 Exhibit I Volume 9)(Ott, Carter) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
February 10, 2011 155 EXHIBITS re 130 Declaration in Support,,,,, [Redacted Exhibit J] filed bySony Computer Entertainment America Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Related document(s) 130 ) (Ott, Carter) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
February 10, 2011 154 EXHIBITS re 130 Declaration in Support,,,,, [Redacted Exhibit I] filed bySony Computer Entertainment America Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Related document(s) 130 ) (Ott, Carter) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
February 10, 2011 152 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen Re 111 Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order; 112 Plaintiffs' Motion for Order Compelling Discovery and Entering Standard Stipulated Protective Order; and 116 Defendant's Motion to Compel. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
February 9, 2011 153 Minute Entry: Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order - Granted in part and denied in part; Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel - Granted in part and denied in part; Defendant's Motion to Compel - Granted in part and denied in part. Parties ordered to meet and confer and submit a letter report by February 21, 2011.Motion Hearing held on 2/9/2011 before Edward M. Chen (Date Filed: 2/9/2011) re 111 MOTION for Protective Order [Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities] MOTION for Protective Order [Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities] filed by Jason Baker, Elton Stovell, Jonathan Huber, Anthony Ventura, Antal Herz, 112 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant SCEA's Parent Company; and Order Entering the Northern District of California's Standard Stipulated Protective Order [Notice and Memorandum of Points and Authorities] MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant SCEA's Parent Company; and Order Entering the Northern District of California's Standard Stipulated Protective Order [Notice and Memorandum of Points and Authorities] filed by Jason Baker, Elton Stovell, Jonathan Huber, Anthony Ventura, Antal Herz, 116 MOTION to Compel ; Memorandum of Points and Authorites filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Court Reporter Sahar Bartlett.) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/9/2011)
February 9, 2011 151 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 150 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; Granting 150 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2011)
February 7, 2011 150 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document Docket No. 130 filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Defendant's Administrative Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Documents; Docket No. 130, # 2 Declaration of Carter Ott in Support of Administrative Motions to File Under Seal and Remove Incorrectly Filed Documents, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Carter Ott in Support of Administrative Motions to File Under Seal and Remove Incorrectly Filed Documents, # 4 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Administrative Motions to File Under Seal and Remove Incorrectly-Filed Documents)(Ott, Carter) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
February 7, 2011 149 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 146 Motion to Appear by Telephone at February 9, 2011 Hearing. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
February 4, 2011 148 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jason Baker, Antal Herz, Jonathan Huber, Elton Stovell, Anthony Ventura Administrative Motion for an Order Granting Blankinship Permission to Appear Telephonically and Proposed Order (Quadra, James) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
February 4, 2011 147 Proposed Order Granting Greg Blankinship Permission to Appear Telephonically at the Feb. 9, 2011 Hearing by Jason Baker, Antal Herz, Jonathan Huber, Elton Stovell, Anthony Ventura. (Quadra, James) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
February 4, 2011 146 MOTION to Appear by Telephone by Greg Blankinship for Feb. 9, 2011 Hearing filed by Jason Baker, Antal Herz, Jonathan Huber, Elton Stovell, Anthony Ventura. Motion Hearing set for 2/9/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen. (Quadra, James) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
January 31, 2011 145 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Edward Collins For Defendant Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC (Collins, Joseph) (Filed on 1/31/2011)
January 28, 2011 144 Featured Case STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byJason Baker, Antal Herz, Jonathan Huber, Elton Stovell, Anthony Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 104 ) (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 1/28/2011)
January 26, 2011 143 Reply Memorandum ISO Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order filed byJason Baker, Antal Herz, Jonathan Huber, Elton Stovell, Anthony Ventura. (Quadra, James) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 26, 2011 142 Reply Memorandum re 112 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant SCEA's Parent Company; and Order Entering the Northern District of California's Standard Stipulated Protective Order [Notice and Memorandum of Points and Authorities] MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant SCEA's Parent Company; and Order Entering the Northern District of California's Standard Stipulated Protective Order [Notice and Memorandum of Points and Authorities] filed byJason Baker, Antal Herz, Jonathan Huber, Elton Stovell, Anthony Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 26, 2011 141 Declaration of Carter Ott in Support of 139 Reply Memorandum filed bySony Computer Entertainment America Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 139 ) (Sacks, Luanne) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 26, 2011 140 RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Addendum Brief filed bySony Computer Entertainment America Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Sacks, Luanne) (Filed on 1/26/2011) Modified on 1/27/2011 (slh, COURT STAFF).
January 26, 2011 139 Reply Memorandum re 116 MOTION to Compel ; Memorandum of Points and Authorites filed bySony Computer Entertainment America Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Sacks, Luanne) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 26, 2011 138 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION OF ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JOSEPH COLLINS PRO HAC VICE by Judge Richard Seeborg. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 25, 2011 137 MOTION of Joseph Collins for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611055374) filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
January 25, 2011 136 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC of Application for Admission of Attorney Joseph Collins Pro Hac Vice and [Proposed] Order (Ott, Carter) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
January 18, 2011 135 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jason Baker, Antal Herz, Jonathan Huber, Elton Stovell, Anthony Ventura Proof of Service (Quadra, James) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
January 18, 2011 134 NOTICE by Jason Baker, Antal Herz, Jonathan Huber, Elton Stovell, Anthony Ventura Notice of Change of Firm Name (Quadra, James) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
January 18, 2011 133 MEMORANDUM in Opposition of MDCPE to Defendant Sony's 116 Motion to Compel filed by Jason Baker, Antal Herz, Jonathan Huber, Elton Stovell, Anthony Ventura. (Quadra, James) (Filed on 1/18/2011) Modified on 1/19/2011 (slh, COURT STAFF).
January 18, 2011 132 Declaration of James A. Quadra in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Sony's MTC filed by Jason Baker, Antal Herz, Jonathan Huber, Elton Stovell, Anthony Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Quadra, James) (Filed on 1/18/2011) Modified on 1/19/2011 (slh, COURT STAFF).
January 18, 2011 131 MEMORANDUM in Opposition Sony's 116 Motion to Compel filed by Jason Baker, Antal Herz, Jonathan Huber, Elton Stovell, Anthony Ventura. (Quadra, James) (Filed on 1/18/2011) Modified on 1/19/2011 (slh, COURT STAFF).
January 18, 2011 130 Declaration of Carter Ott in Support of 124 Memorandum in Opposition, 125 Memorandum in Opposition filed bySony Computer Entertainment America Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I Vol. 1, # 10 Exhibit I Vol. 2, # 11 Exhibit I Vol. 3, # 12 Exhibit I Vol. 4, # 13 Exhibit I Vol. 5, # 14 Exhibit I Vol. 6, # 15 Exhibit I Vol. 7, # 16 Supplement I Vol. 8, # 17 Exhibit I Vol. 9, # 18 Exhibit J, # 19 Exhibit K)(Related document(s) 124 , 125 ) (Ott, Carter) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
January 18, 2011 129 Declaration of Luanne Sacks in Support of 124 Memorandum in Opposition, 125 Memorandum in Opposition filed bySony Computer Entertainment America Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 124 , 125 ) (Ott, Carter) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
January 18, 2011 128 Declaration of John Koller in Support of 124 Memorandum in Opposition, 125 Memorandum in Opposition filed bySony Computer Entertainment America Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Related document(s) 124 , 125 ) (Ott, Carter) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
January 18, 2011 127 OBJECTIONS to re 124 Memorandum in Opposition, 125 Memorandum in Opposition [Objection to Plaintiffs' Evidence Offered in Support] by Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Ott, Carter) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
January 18, 2011 126 Request for Judicial Notice re 124 Memorandum in Opposition, 125 Memorandum in Opposition filed bySony Computer Entertainment America Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Related document(s) 124 , 125 ) (Ott, Carter) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
January 18, 2011 125 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' 111 Motion for Protective Order filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Ott, Carter) (Filed on 1/18/2011) Modified on 1/19/2011 (slh, COURT STAFF).
January 18, 2011 124 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' 112 Motion to Compel filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Ott, Carter) (Filed on 1/18/2011) Modified on 1/19/2011 (slh, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2011 123 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER TO RELATE AND CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS C 10-1811 RS, C 10-5179 DMR, C 10-5224 EDL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/7/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
January 4, 2011 122 STIPULATION to Relate and Consolidate Actions by Jason Baker, Antal Herz, Jonathan Huber, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC, Elton Stovell, Anthony Ventura. (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 1/4/2011)
December 17, 2010 121 NOTICE by Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC OF PENDENCY OF OTHER ACTION OR PROCEEDING (Ott, Carter) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
December 16, 2010 120 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 110 Stipulation filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/16/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2010)
December 15, 2010 119 Proposed Order re 116 MOTION to Compel ; Memorandum of Points and Authorites by Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Ott, Carter) (Filed on 12/15/2010)
December 15, 2010 118 Request for Judicial Notice re 116 MOTION to Compel ; Memorandum of Points and Authorites filed bySony Computer Entertainment America Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Related document(s) 116 ) (Ott, Carter) (Filed on 12/15/2010)
December 15, 2010 117 Declaration of Carter Ott in Support of 116 MOTION to Compel ; Memorandum of Points and Authorites filed bySony Computer Entertainment America Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Supplement Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB, # 29 Exhibit CC, # 30 Exhibit DD, # 31 Supplement EE, # 32 Exhibit FF, # 33 Exhibit GG, # 34 Exhibit HH, # 35 Exhibit II, # 36 Exhibit JJ, # 37 Exhibit KK VOL 1, # 38 Exhibit KK VOL 2, # 39 Exhibit LL VOL 1, # 40 Exhibit LL VOL 2, # 41 Exhibit LL VOL 3, # 42 Exhibit LL VOL 4, # 43 Exhibit MM VOL 1, # 44 Exhibit MM VOL 2, # 45 Exhibit MM VOL 3, # 46 Exhibit NN VOL 1, # 47 Exhibit NN VOL 2, # 48 Exhibit OO, # 49 Exhibit PP, # 50 Exhibit QQ, # 51 Exhibit RR)(Related document(s) 116 ) (Ott, Carter) (Filed on 12/15/2010)
December 15, 2010 116 MOTION to Compel ; Memorandum of Points and Authorites filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. Motion Hearing set for 2/9/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Ott, Carter) (Filed on 12/15/2010)
December 15, 2010 115 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jason Baker, Antal Herz, Jonathan Huber, Elton Stovell, Anthony Ventura re 113 Request for Judicial Notice,, 111 MOTION for Protective Order [Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities] MOTION for Protective Order [Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities], 112 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant SCEA's Parent Company; and Order Entering the Northern District of California's Standard Stipulated Protective Order [Notice and Memorandum of Points and Authorities] MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant SCEA's Parent Company; and Order Entering the Northern District of California's Standard Stipulated Protective Order [Notice and Memorandum of Points and Authorities], 114 Declaration in Support,,,, (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 12/15/2010)
December 15, 2010 114 Declaration of Rosemary M. Rivas in Support of 111 MOTION for Protective Order [Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities] MOTION for Protective Order [Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities], 112 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant SCEA's Parent Company; and Order Entering the Northern District of California's Standard Stipulated Protective Order [Notice and Memorandum of Points and Authorities] MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant SCEA's Parent Company; and Order Entering the Northern District of California's Standard Stipulated Protective Order [Notice and Memorandum of Points and Authorities] filed byJason Baker, Antal Herz, Jonathan Huber, Elton Stovell, Anthony Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P)(Related document(s) 111 , 112 ) (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 12/15/2010)
December 15, 2010 113 Request for Judicial Notice re 112 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant SCEA's Parent Company; and Order Entering the Northern District of California's Standard Stipulated Protective Order [Notice and Memorandum of Points and Authorities] MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant SCEA's Parent Company; and Order Entering the Northern District of California's Standard Stipulated Protective Order [Notice and Memorandum of Points and Authorities] filed byJason Baker, Antal Herz, Jonathan Huber, Elton Stovell, Anthony Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 112 ) (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 12/15/2010)
December 15, 2010 112 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant SCEA's Parent Company; and Order Entering the Northern District of California's Standard Stipulated Protective Order [Notice and Memorandum of Points and Authorities] filed by Jason Baker, Antal Herz, Jonathan Huber, Elton Stovell, Anthony Ventura. Motion Hearing set for 2/9/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 12/15/2010)
December 15, 2010 111 MOTION for Protective Order [Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities] filed by Jason Baker, Antal Herz, Jonathan Huber, Elton Stovell, Anthony Ventura. Motion Hearing set for 2/9/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 12/15/2010)
December 13, 2010 110 STIPULATION [JOINT] AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Ott, Carter) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
November 15, 2010 109 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/4/10, before Judge Richard Seeborg. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, RPR, CRR, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/14/2011. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 11/15/2010)
November 4, 2010 108 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 11/4/2010 before Richard Seeborg; Matters Submitted. (Date Filed: 11/4/2010) re 97 MOTION to Dismiss [Memorandum of Points and Authorities] MOTION to Dismiss [Memorandum of Points and Authorities] filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC, 96 MOTION to Strike 76 Amended Complaint [Class Allegations; Memorandum of Points and Authorities] MOTION to Strike 76 Amended Complaint [Class Allegations; Memorandum of Points and Authorities] filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/4/2010)
October 21, 2010 107 Request for Judicial Notice re 105 Reply Memorandum, 106 Reply Memorandum, to Motion to Strike and Motion to Dismiss filed bySony Computer Entertainment America Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Related document(s) 105 , 106 ) (Ott, Carter) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
October 21, 2010 106 Reply Memorandum re 97 MOTION to Dismiss [Memorandum of Points and Authorities] MOTION to Dismiss [Memorandum of Points and Authorities] filed bySony Computer Entertainment America Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Ott, Carter) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
October 21, 2010 105 Reply Memorandum re 96 MOTION to Strike 76 Amended Complaint [Class Allegations; Memorandum of Points and Authorities] MOTION to Strike 76 Amended Complaint [Class Allegations; Memorandum of Points and Authorities] filed bySony Computer Entertainment America Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Ott, Carter) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
October 12, 2010 104 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 97 MOTION to Dismiss [Memorandum of Points and Authorities] MOTION to Dismiss [Memorandum of Points and Authorities] filed byJason Baker, Antal Herz, Jonathan Huber, Elton Stovell, Anthony Ventura. (Related document(s) 97 ) (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
October 12, 2010 103 Memorandum in Opposition re 96 MOTION to Strike 76 Amended Complaint [Class Allegations; Memorandum of Points and Authorities] MOTION to Strike 76 Amended Complaint [Class Allegations; Memorandum of Points and Authorities] filed byJason Baker, Antal Herz, Jonathan Huber, Elton Stovell, Anthony Ventura. (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
October 12, 2010 102 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 99 Request for Judicial Notice,, filed byJason Baker, Antal Herz, Jonathan Huber, Elton Stovell, Anthony Ventura. (Related document(s) 99 ) (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
September 10, 2010 101 Proposed Order re 97 MOTION to Dismiss [Memorandum of Points and Authorities] MOTION to Dismiss [Memorandum of Points and Authorities] by Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Sacks, Luanne) (Filed on 9/10/2010)
September 10, 2010 100 Proposed Order re 96 MOTION to Strike 76 Amended Complaint [Class Allegations; Memorandum of Points and Authorities] MOTION to Strike 76 Amended Complaint [Class Allegations; Memorandum of Points and Authorities] by Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Sacks, Luanne) (Filed on 9/10/2010)
September 10, 2010 99 Request for Judicial Notice re 97 MOTION to Dismiss [Memorandum of Points and Authorities] MOTION to Dismiss [Memorandum of Points and Authorities], 96 MOTION to Strike 76 Amended Complaint [Class Allegations; Memorandum of Points and Authorities] MOTION to Strike 76 Amended Complaint [Class Allegations; Memorandum of Points and Authorities] filed bySony Computer Entertainment America Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Related document(s) 97 , 96 ) (Sacks, Luanne) (Filed on 9/10/2010)
September 10, 2010 98 Declaration of Carter Ott in Support of 97 MOTION to Dismiss [Memorandum of Points and Authorities] MOTION to Dismiss [Memorandum of Points and Authorities], 96 MOTION to Strike 76 Amended Complaint [Class Allegations; Memorandum of Points and Authorities] MOTION to Strike 76 Amended Complaint [Class Allegations; Memorandum of Points and Authorities] filed bySony Computer Entertainment America Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X)(Related document(s) 97 , 96 ) (Sacks, Luanne) (Filed on 9/10/2010)
September 10, 2010 97 MOTION to Dismiss [Memorandum of Points and Authorities] filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Sacks, Luanne) (Filed on 9/10/2010)
September 10, 2010 96 MOTION to Strike 76 Amended Complaint [Class Allegations; Memorandum of Points and Authorities] filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Sacks, Luanne) (Filed on 9/10/2010)
September 3, 2010 95 Featured Case NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/3/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
September 3, 2010 94 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Parties are referred to a Magistrate Judge for Discovery; The Parties shall file and serve a motion for class certification on or before 2/28/11. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/2/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
September 3, 2010 93 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 9/2/2010 before Judge Richard Seeborg. Parties are referred to a Magistrate Judge for Discovery (Date Filed: 9/3/2010). (Court Reporter unreported.)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/3/2010)
September 1, 2010 92 Letter from G. Blankinship withdrawing previous request to appear via telephone for 9/2/10 conference. (Blankinship, Douglas) (Filed on 9/1/2010)
September 1, 2010 91 Letter from G. Blankinship requesting to appear telephonically for 9/2/10 conference. (Blankinship, Douglas) (Filed on 9/1/2010)
August 26, 2010 90 Certificate of Interested Entities by Jason Baker Plaintiff Jason Baker's Certificate of Interested Parties (Fabry, John) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
August 26, 2010 89 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Plaintiff Jason Baker's ADR Certification by Parties and Counsel (Fabry, John) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
August 24, 2010 88 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Tien, Tracy) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 24, 2010 87 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/24/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 23, 2010 86 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Jason Baker, Antal Herz, Jonathan Huber, Elton Stovell, Anthony Ventura. (Quadra, James) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 23, 2010 85 Certificate of Interested Entities by Jonathan Huber (Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 23, 2010 84 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 20, 2010 83 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND TIME by Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Ott, Carter) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
August 18, 2010 82 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elton Stovell re 81 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b)of discussion of ADR options (Kalfayan, Ralph) (Filed on 8/18/2010)
August 18, 2010 81 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Parties and Counsel (Kalfayan, Ralph) (Filed on 8/18/2010)
August 18, 2010 80 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elton Stovell re 79 Certificate of Interested Entities (Kalfayan, Ralph) (Filed on 8/18/2010)
August 18, 2010 79 Certificate of Interested Entities by Elton Stovell (Kalfayan, Ralph) (Filed on 8/18/2010)
August 18, 2010 78 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options as to plaintiff Anthony Ventura (Blankinship, Douglas) (Filed on 8/18/2010)
July 30, 2010 77 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jason Baker, Antal Herz, Jonathan Huber, Elton Stovell, Anthony Ventura re 76 Amended Complaint (Consolidated Class Action Complaint) (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 7/30/2010)
July 30, 2010 76 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Consolidated Class Action Complaint) against Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. Filed byAntal Herz, Anthony Ventura, Jonathan Huber, Jason Baker, Elton Stovell. (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 7/30/2010)
July 28, 2010 75 Featured Case ORDER RE: 74 GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY BENJAMIN F. JOHNS PRO HAC VICE. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2010)
July 27, 2010 74 MOTION of Benjamin F. Johns for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611048576) filed by Jeffrey Harper, Zachary Kummer. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2010)
July 21, 2010 73 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 72 RESCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 9/2/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/21/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2010)
July 21, 2010 72 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Rescheduling Initial Case Management Conference by Todd Densmore, Antal Herz. (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 7/21/2010)
July 20, 2010 71 Featured Case ORDER RE 69 GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JEFFREY I. CARTON PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2010)
July 20, 2010 70 Featured Case ORDER RE: 68 GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY D. GREG BLANKINSHIP PRO HAC VICE. By Judge Richard Seeborg. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2010)
July 19, 2010 69 MOTION of Jeffrey I. Carton for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611048319) filed by Anthony Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2010)
July 19, 2010 68 MOTION of D. Greg Blankinship for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611048318) filed by Anthony Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2010)
July 8, 2010 67 Featured Case ORDER RE 66 GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JAMES J. PIZZIRUSSO PRO HAC VICE.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2010)
July 7, 2010 66 MOTION of James J. Pizzirusso for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611047813) filed by Jonathan Huber. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2010)
June 30, 2010 65 STIPULATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NUMBER 1 AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. All filings hereafter shall be made exclusively in Case No. 10-1811 RS. The Initial Case Management Conference shall be held on September 9, 2010, as originally scheduled in C 10-1811 RS. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
June 29, 2010 64 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NUMBER 1 by Todd Densmore, Antal Herz. (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
June 16, 2010 63 Featured Case ORDER RELATING CASES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/16/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2010)
June 15, 2010 62 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc. (Gigounas, George) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
June 9, 2010 61 Declaration of Joseph G. Sauder in Support of 60 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed byJeffrey Harper, Zachary Kummer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 60 ) (Luzon, Rosemary) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
June 9, 2010 60 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Jeffrey Harper, Zachary Kummer. Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Luzon, Rosemary) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
June 7, 2010 59 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc. (Gigounas, George) (Filed on 6/7/2010)
June 7, 2010 58 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc. (Gigounas, George) (Filed on 6/7/2010)
June 7, 2010 57 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc. (Gigounas, George) (Filed on 6/7/2010)
June 2, 2010 56 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Fabry (Fabry, John) (Filed on 6/2/2010)
June 2, 2010 55 NOTICE of Entry of Order Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice by Jason Baker. (Fabry, John) (Filed on 6/2/2010) Modified on 6/3/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
May 28, 2010 54 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING MOTION HEARING. Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
May 28, 2010 53 Featured Case ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
May 28, 2010 52 Featured Case ORDER RELATING CASES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
May 27, 2010 51 Declaration of Daniel L. Warshaw in Support of 45 Motion for Consolidation and Appointment of Interim Lead Counsel filed by Jonathan Huber. (Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 5/27/2010) Modified on 5/28/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
May 27, 2010 50 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jonathan Huber re 47 Declaration in Support, 45 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Memorandum of Points and Authorites in Support (Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
May 27, 2010 49 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jeffrey Harper, Zachary Kummer re 44 MOTION to Relate Case Pursuant to Civil LR 3-12 (Luzon, Rosemary) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
May 27, 2010 48 Proposed Order re 44 MOTION to Relate Case Pursuant to Civil LR 3-12 by Jeffrey Harper, Zachary Kummer. (Luzon, Rosemary) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
May 27, 2010 47 Declaration of James Pizzirusso in Support of 45 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Memorandum of Points and Authorites in Support filed byJonathan Huber. (Related document(s) 45 ) (Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
May 27, 2010 46 Declaration of Rose F. Luzon in Support of 44 MOTION to Relate Case Pursuant to Civil LR 3-12 filed byJeffrey Harper, Zachary Kummer. (Related document(s) 44 ) (Luzon, Rosemary) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
May 27, 2010 45 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Memorandum of Points and Authorites in Support filed by Jonathan Huber. Motion Hearing set for 7/8/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
May 27, 2010 44 MOTION to Relate Case Pursuant to Civil LR 3-12 filed by Jeffrey Harper, Zachary Kummer. (Luzon, Rosemary) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
May 27, 2010 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Luanne R. Sacks (Sacks, Luanne) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
May 27, 2010 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Carter Winford Ott (Ott, Carter) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
May 27, 2010 41 Certificate of Interested Entities by Anthony Ventura (Coll, Rebecca) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
May 26, 2010 40 Declaration of Daniel L. Warshaw in Support of 39 MOTION to Relate Case Plaintiff Jonathan Huber's Administrative Motion to Relate Cases filed byJonathan Huber. (Related document(s) 39 ) (Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 5/26/2010)
May 26, 2010 39 MOTION to Relate Case Plaintiff Jonathan Huber's Administrative Motion to Relate Cases filed by Jonathan Huber. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 5/26/2010)
May 20, 2010 38 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Jason Baker. Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations), # 2 Proposed Order)(Bishop, Charles) (Filed on 5/20/2010)
May 20, 2010 37 Featured Case ORDER RELATING CASES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/20/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2010)
May 20, 2010 36 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 38 . *** MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Jason Baker. Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations), # 2 Proposed Order)(Bishop, Charles) (Filed on 5/20/2010) Modified on 5/21/2010 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2010 35 Proposed Order re 32 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointing Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Setting Case Management Dates, 33 Declaration in Support, 34 Declaration in Support, by Anthony Ventura. (Coll, Rebecca) (Filed on 5/20/2010)
May 20, 2010 34 Declaration of James A. Quadra in Support of 32 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointing Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Setting Case Management Dates, 33 Declaration in Support, filed byAnthony Ventura. (Related document(s) 32 , 33 ) (Coll, Rebecca) (Filed on 5/20/2010)
May 20, 2010 33 Declaration of Jeffrey I. Carton in Support of 32 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointing Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Setting Case Management Dates with exhibits 1 - 7 filed byAnthony Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 32 ) (Coll, Rebecca) (Filed on 5/20/2010)
May 20, 2010 32 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointing Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Setting Case Management Dates filed by Anthony Ventura. Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Coll, Rebecca) (Filed on 5/20/2010)
May 19, 2010 31 Declaration of DEBORAH E. MCCRIMMON in Support of 30 Statement, OF SUPPORT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO RELATE VENTURA, BAKER, AND DENSMORE CASES filed bySony Computer Entertainment America Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) 30 ) (McCrimmon, Deborah) (Filed on 5/19/2010)
May 19, 2010 30 Statement re 19 MOTION to Relate Case CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 16 ., 11 MOTION to Relate Cases; to Consolidate Related Cases; to Appoint Interim Co-Lead Counsel; and set Case Management Dates, 7 MOTION to Relate Case STATEMENT OF SUPPORT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO RELATE VENTURA, BAKER, AND DENSMORE CASES by Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc. (McCrimmon, Deborah) (Filed on 5/19/2010)
May 19, 2010 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Todd Densmore, Antal Herz re 28 Declaration in Support, 27 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Appoint Finkelstein Thompson LLP As Interim, Co-Lead Class Counsel; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 5/19/2010)
May 19, 2010 28 Declaration of Rosemary M. Rivas in Support of 27 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Appoint Finkelstein Thompson LLP As Interim, Co-Lead Class Counsel; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof filed byTodd Densmore, Antal Herz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 27 ) (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 5/19/2010)
May 19, 2010 27 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Appoint Finkelstein Thompson LLP As Interim, Co-Lead Class Counsel; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Todd Densmore, Antal Herz. Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (1) Consolidating Cases, and (2) Appointing Finkelstein Thompson LLP as Interim, Co-Lead Class Counsel)(Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 5/19/2010)
May 19, 2010 26 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc. (Gigounas, George) (Filed on 5/19/2010)
May 19, 2010 25 NOTICE of Appearance by George J. Gigounas (Gigounas, George) (Filed on 5/19/2010)
May 19, 2010 24 Featured Case ORDER RE: 23 REASSIGNING CASE TO JUDGE SEEBORG. Case Management Conference set for 9/9/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco.Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/19/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2010)
May 19, 2010 23 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Judge Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/19/10. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2010)
May 18, 2010 22 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2010)
May 17, 2010 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Todd Densmore, Antal Herz re 19 MOTION to Relate Case CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 16 ., 20 Declaration in Support, CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 18 . (Tien, Tracy) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
May 17, 2010 20 Declaration of Tracy Tien in Support of 19 MOTION to Relate Case CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 16 . CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 17 . filed byTodd Densmore, Antal Herz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) 19 ) (Tien, Tracy) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
May 17, 2010 19 MOTION to Relate Case CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 16 . filed by Todd Densmore, Antal Herz. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Relating Cases)(Tien, Tracy) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
May 17, 2010 18 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT 21 . *** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Todd Densmore, Antal Herz re 17 Declaration in Support, 16 MOTION to Relate Case (Civil Local Rule 3-12) (Tien, Tracy) (Filed on 5/17/2010) Modified on 5/18/2010 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
May 17, 2010 17 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT 20 . *** Declaration of Tracy Tien in Support of 16 MOTION to Relate Case (Civil Local Rule 3-12) filed byTodd Densmore, Antal Herz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 16 ) (Tien, Tracy) (Filed on 5/17/2010) Modified on 5/18/2010 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
May 17, 2010 16 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT 19 . *** MOTION to Relate Case (Civil Local Rule 3-12) filed by Todd Densmore, Antal Herz. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Relating Cases)(Tien, Tracy) (Filed on 5/17/2010) Modified on 5/18/2010 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
May 17, 2010 15 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc. (McCrimmon, Deborah) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
May 17, 2010 14 Proposed Order re 11 Motion for Order 1) Finding Cases Related, 2) Consolidating Related Cases, 3) Appointing Interim Co-Lead Counsel, and 4) Setting Case Management Dates by Anthony Ventura. (Coll, Rebecca) (Filed on 5/17/2010) Modified on 5/18/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
May 17, 2010 13 Declaration of James A. Quadra in Support of Plaintiff Ventura's 11 Motion for Order 1) Finding Cases Related, 2) Consolidating Related Cases, 3) Appointing Interim Co-Lead Counsel, and 4) Setting Case Management Dates filed by Anthony Ventura. (Related document(s) 11 ) (Coll, Rebecca) (Filed on 5/17/2010) Modified on 5/18/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
May 17, 2010 12 Declaration of Jeffrey I. Carton in Support of Plaintiff Ventura's 11 Motion for Order 1) Finding Cases Related, 2) Consolidating Related Cases, 3) Appointing Interim Co-Lead Counsel, and 4) Setting Case Management Dates filed by Anthony Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Carton Declaration Exhibits 1 - 3, # 2 Exhibit Carton Declaration Exhibits 4 - 7)(Related document(s) 11 ) (Coll, Rebecca) (Filed on 5/17/2010) Modified on 5/18/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
May 17, 2010 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES in Support of Plaintiff Ventura's Motion for Order 1) Finding Cases Related, 2) Consolidating Related Cases, 3) Appointing Interim Co-Lead Counsel, and 4) Setting Case Management Dates by Anthony Ventura (Coll, Rebecca) (Filed on 5/17/2010) Modified on 5/18/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2010 10 Proposed Order re 9 Affidavit, 7 MOTION to Relate Case, 8 Declaration in Support by Jason Baker. (Bishop, Charles) (Filed on 5/14/2010)
May 14, 2010 9 AFFIDAVIT re 7 MOTION to Relate Case, 8 Declaration in Support Certificate of Service by Jason Baker. (Bishop, Charles) (Filed on 5/14/2010)
May 14, 2010 8 Declaration of Charles S. Bishop in Support of 7 MOTION to Relate Case filed byJason Baker. (Related document(s) 7 ) (Bishop, Charles) (Filed on 5/14/2010)
May 14, 2010 7 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Jason Baker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Complaint in Ventura Action, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B-Complaint in Baker Action)(Bishop, Charles) (Filed on 5/14/2010)
May 14, 2010 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anthony Ventura. Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc served on 4/29/2010, answer due 5/20/2010. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2010)
May 12, 2010 5 NOTICE by Jason Baker of Related Case (Bishop, Charles) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
May 4, 2010 4 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Anthony Ventura.. (Coll, Rebecca) (Filed on 5/4/2010)
April 28, 2010 3 Summons Issued as to Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2010)
April 27, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2010)
April 27, 2010 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 8/25/2010. Case Management Conference set for 9/1/2010 01:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2010)
April 27, 2010 1 COMPLAINT (no process) against Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc (Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611045153). Filed by Anthony Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: In Re Sony PS3 "Other OS" Litigation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Ventura
Represented By: Rebecca Coll
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]