Edge Games, Inc. v. Electronic Arts Inc.,

Plaintiff: Edge Games, Inc.
Defendant: Electronic Arts Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv02614
Filed: June 15, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 13, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 14 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/20/08. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2010)
August 23, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 23, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
September 13, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING MOTION TO EXTEND TIME. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 13, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2010)
September 14, 2010 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO SEPTEMBER 30. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 14, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2010)
September 21, 2010 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 21, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2010)
September 29, 2010 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ALLOWING A/V EQUIPMENT TO BE BROUGHT INTO COURTROOM ON SEPTEMBER 30. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 29, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2010)
October 1, 2010 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Alsup denying 16 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
October 4, 2010 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING DEPOSITIONS PERTAINING TO FRAUD ALLEGATIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 4, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
October 8, 2010 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING THE PARTIES' STIPULATION REGARDING THE DISPOSITION OF CLAIMS AND PROPOSED JUDGMENT SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 8, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edge Games, Inc. v. Electronic Arts Inc.,
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edge Games, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher D. Banys
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electronic Arts Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]