Oracle America, Inc. v. Google Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Oracle America, Inc.
Defendant: Google Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2010cv03561
Filed: August 12, 2010
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
October 19, 2012 1255 Transcript of Proceedings held on 8-23-12, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, Telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/17/2013. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
October 17, 2012 1254 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
October 15, 2012 1253 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED STAY OF EXECUTION OF COSTS by Hon. William Alsup granting 1252 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2012)
October 15, 2012 1252 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO STAY EXECUTION OF COSTS AWARD PENDING APPEAL filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 10/15/2012)
October 11, 2012 1251 Refund re 1246 Application for Refund Approved. (dtm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2012)
October 5, 2012 1250 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals as to 1248 Notice of Cross Appeal, 1243 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit,. Appeal Record due by 11/5/2012. (dtm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2012)
October 5, 2012 1249 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals as to 1247 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit. Appeal Record due by 11/5/2012. (dtm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2012)
October 4, 2012 1248 NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL as to 1243 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, by Google Inc.. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0971-7177323. Appeal Record due by 11/5/2012. (Hirsch, Steven) (Filed on 10/4/2012)
October 4, 2012 1247 Amended NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit as to 1242 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Google Inc.. See receipt number 0971-7176729 Appeal Record due by 11/5/2012. (Hirsch, Steven) (Filed on 10/4/2012)
October 4, 2012 1246 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-7176689 by Google Inc.. (Hirsch, Steven) (Filed on 10/4/2012)
October 4, 2012 1245 See Entry 1247 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit of 1242 by Google Inc.. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0971-7176729. Appeal Record due by 11/5/2012. (Hirsch, Steven) (Filed on 10/4/2012) Modified on 10/4/2012 (dtm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/5/2012 (dtm, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2012 1244 See Entry 1250 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals as to 1243 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, by Oracle America, Inc. Appeal Record due by 11/5/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Appeal Information Sheet)(dtm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2012) Modified on 10/5/2012 (dtm, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2012 1243 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit as to 1211 Judgment by Oracle America, Inc.. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0971-7174810. - PLAINTIFF ORACLE AMERICA, INC.'S NOTICE OF APPEAL - Appeal Record due by 11/2/2012. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 10/3/2012)
October 3, 2012 TRIAL EXHIBITS #3536, #3543, #3544, and #3547 Located in Vault, Section Wall "D". (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2012)
September 4, 2012 1242 Featured Case ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW AND NEW TRIAL by Hon. William Alsup denying 1222 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012)
September 4, 2012 1241 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING BILL OF COSTS re 1216 Bill of Costs filed by Google Inc., 1228 Brief filed by Google Inc., 1225 Objection filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 4, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012)
August 24, 2012 1240 RESPONSE to re 1238 Order to Supplement by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Part 1, # 2 Exhibit Part 2)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 8/24/2012)
August 23, 2012 1239 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/23/2012 before Judge William Alsup (Date Filed: 8/23/2012) re 1222 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Portions of Count VIII of Oracle's Amended Complaint, or, in the Alternative, for a New Trial filed by Google Inc. Motion taken under submission. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/23/2012)
August 20, 2012 1238 Featured Case ORDER TO SUPPLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 20, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
August 17, 2012 1237 RESPONSE to re 1229 Order Re Disclosure of Financial Relationships with Commentators on Issues in this Case by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 8/17/2012)
August 17, 2012 1236 Statement re 1229 Order - ORACLE'S STATEMENT REGARDING FINANCIAL RELATIONSHIPS WITH COMMENTATORS - by Oracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/17/2012)
August 14, 2012 1235 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 1232 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Vadim Bergelson in Support of Oracle's Objections to Google's Bill of Costs by Oracle America, Inc.. (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 8/14/2012)
August 14, 2012 1234 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 1232 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Oracle's Objections to Google's Bill of Costs by Oracle America, Inc.. (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 8/14/2012)
August 14, 2012 1233 Statement of Recent Decision Regarding Costs by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 8/14/2012)
August 9, 2012 1232 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEAL by Hon. William Alsup granting 1224 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2012)
August 8, 2012 1231 Statement on Behalf of Dr. Kearl Regarding Relationships with Commentators by John Lee Cooper. (Cooper, John) (Filed on 8/8/2012) Modified on 8/9/2012 (dtm, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2012 1230 REPLY in Support of (re 1222 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Portions of Count VIII of Oracle's Amended Complaint, or, in the Alternative, for a New Trial ) filed byGoogle Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 8/7/2012) Modified on 8/8/2012 (dtm, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2012 1229 Featured Case ORDER RE DISCLOSURE OF FINANCIAL RELATIONSHIPS WITH COMMENTATORS ON ISSUES IN THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 7, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2012)
August 3, 2012 1228 Reply to Objections re 1216 Bill of Costs filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 1216 ) (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 8/3/2012) Modified on 8/6/2012 (dtm, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2012 1227 RESPONSE (re 1222 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Portions of Count VIII of Oracle's Amended Complaint, or, in the Alternative, for a New Trial ) filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
July 26, 2012 1226 Featured Case ORDER FOR REPLY BRIEF. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 26, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2012)
July 23, 2012 1225 OBJECTIONS to re 1216 Bill of Costs by Oracle America, Inc.. (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 7/23/2012)
July 23, 2012 1224 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Discovery Pricing Information filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Benjamin Beck in support of Oracle's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Discovery Pricing Information, # 2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Oracle's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal)(Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 7/23/2012)
July 17, 2012 1223 Proposed Order re 1222 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Portions of Count VIII of Oracle's Amended Complaint, or, in the Alternative, for a New Trial by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
July 17, 2012 1222 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Portions of Count VIII of Oracle's Amended Complaint, or, in the Alternative, for a New Trial filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/23/2012 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 7/31/2012. Replies due by 8/7/2012. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
July 13, 2012 1221 Featured Case ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW AND NEW TRIAL by Hon. William Alsup denying 1212 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2012)
July 13, 2012 1220 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 1218 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit C(1), # 3 Exhibit C(2), # 4 Exhibit C(3), # 5 Exhibit C(4))(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 7/13/2012)
July 12, 2012 1219 REPLY (re 1212 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law - ORACLE AMERICA, INC.'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW UNDER RULE 50(B) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A NEW TRIAL - ) - ORACLE AMERICA, INC.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW UNDER RULE 50(B) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A NEW TRIAL - filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/12/2012)
July 11, 2012 1218 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEAL by Hon. William Alsup granting 1215 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
July 5, 2012 1217 RESPONSE (re 1212 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law - ORACLE AMERICA, INC.'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW UNDER RULE 50(B) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A NEW TRIAL - ) (Google Inc.'s Opposition to Oracle America, Inc.'s Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Rule 50(b) or, in the Alternative, for a New Trial) filed byGoogle Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 7/5/2012)
July 5, 2012 1216 BILL OF COSTS by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 7/5/2012)
July 5, 2012 1215 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Bill of Costs filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of William Adams, # 2 Proposed Order)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 7/5/2012)
June 26, 2012 1214 Transcript of Proceedings held on 6-20-2012, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, Telephone number (415) 431-1477. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/24/2012. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 6/26/2012)
June 20, 2012 1213 Minute Entry: Case Management Conference held on 6/20/2012 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 6/20/2012). (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/20/2012)
June 20, 2012 1212 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law - ORACLE AMERICA, INC.'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW UNDER RULE 50(B) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A NEW TRIAL - filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/26/2012 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 7/5/2012. Replies due by 7/12/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
June 20, 2012 1211 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 20, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
June 20, 2012 1210 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 1159 Stipulation and Order (Second) Regarding Copyright Damages filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
June 18, 2012 1209 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Conference Statement filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 6/18/2012)
June 5, 2012 Set/Reset Hearing re 1204 Order Case Management Conference set for 6/20/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2012)
June 5, 2012 1208 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION by Hon. William Alsup granting 1207 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2012)
June 5, 2012 1207 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Set/Reset Hearings Regarding Case Management Conference filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 6/5/2012)
June 5, 2012 1206 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING DR. JAMES KEARL. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 5, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2012)
May 31, 2012 1205 Five boxes of trial exhibits placed on overflow shelf. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2012)
May 31, 2012 Set/Reset Hearing Case Management Conference set for 6/21/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2012)
May 31, 2012 1204 NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 31, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2012)
May 31, 2012 1203 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW ON EQUITABLE DEFENSES re 1049 Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Oracle America, Inc., 1047 Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 31, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2012)
May 31, 2012 1202 Featured Case ORDER RE COPYRIGHTABILITY OF CERTAIN REPLICATED ELEMENTS OF THE JAVA APPLICATION PROGRAMMING INTERFACE by Judge William Alsup [granting 984 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; granting 1007 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; finding as moot 1105 Motion for New Trial]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2012)
May 30, 2012 1201 Featured Case ORDER DENYING ORACLE MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW RE PATENT INFRINGEMENT by Hon. William Alsup denying 1168 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2012)
May 24, 2012 1198 TRIAL BRIEF Google's May 24, 2012 Copyright Liability Trial Brief by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 5/24/2012)
May 24, 2012 1197 Brief re 1192 Trial Brief Oracle's May 24, 2012 Copyright Reply Brief filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Related document(s) 1192 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 5/24/2012)
May 24, 2012 1196 Exhibit List Joint List of Admitted Trial Exhibits - Phase 2 by Oracle America, Inc... (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 5/24/2012)
May 24, 2012 1195 Exhibit List Joint List of Admitted Trial Exhibits - Phase 1 by Oracle America, Inc... (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 5/24/2012)
May 24, 2012 1194 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 23, 2012, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, RPR, CRR, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/ Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 6/14/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/25/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/22/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 5/24/2012)
May 23, 2012 1200 Minute Entry: Jury Trial (Phase II) completed on 5/23/2012 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 5/23/2012). Jury Verdict read. Jury polled, thanked and discharged. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/23/2012)
May 23, 2012 1193 Jury Notes - Phase I and Phase II (4/18/12 - 5/23/12) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2012)
May 23, 2012 1192 TRIAL BRIEF Google's May 23, 2012 Copyright Liability Trial Brief by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 5/23/2012)
May 23, 2012 1191 Brief Oracle's May 23, 2012 Copyright Brief filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 5/23/2012)
May 23, 2012 1190 JURY VERDICT (Phase II). (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2012)
May 23, 2012 1189 OBJECTIONS to Answer to Juror May 22 question regarding "symbolic reference" and Request for Curative Instruction by Oracle America, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 5/23/2012)
May 23, 2012 1188 REQUEST FOR BRIEFING ON SONY V. CONNECTIX re 1181 Order. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 23, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2012)
May 22, 2012 1199 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 5/22/2012 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 5/22/2012). Jury Deliberations continued. Further Jury Trial set for 5/23/2012 8:00 AM.(Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/22/2012)
May 22, 2012 1185 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 22, 2012, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, RPR, CRR, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 6/12/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/22/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/20/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 5/22/2012)
May 22, 2012 1184 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 21, 2012, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, RPR, CRR, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 6/12/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/22/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/20/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 5/22/2012)
May 22, 2012 1183 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 18, 2012, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, RPR, CRR, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 6/12/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/22/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/20/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 5/22/2012)
May 22, 2012 1182 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 17, 2012, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, Official Reporter. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 6/12/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/22/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/20/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 5/22/2012)
May 21, 2012 1187 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 5/21/2012 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 5/21/2012). Deliberations continued. Further Jury Trial set for 5/22/2012 8:00 AM.(Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (dtS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/21/2012)
May 21, 2012 1181 REQUEST FOR MORE BRIEFING RE INTERFACES, EXCEPTIONS, AND INTEROPERABILITY. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 21, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2012)
May 18, 2012 1186 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 5/18/2012 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 5/18/2012). Delibertions continued. Further Jury Trial set for 5/21/2012 8:00 AM.(Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (dtS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/18/2012)
May 18, 2012 1179 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 5/16/2012 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 5/18/2012). Deliberations continued. Further Jury Trial set for 5/17/2012 8:00 AM. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/18/2012).
May 18, 2012 1173 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 16, 2012, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, RPR, CRR, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 6/8/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/16/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 5/18/2012)
May 18, 2012 1172 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 15, 2012, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan and Debra L. Pas, Official Reporters, Telephone number 415-794-6659/ Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 6/8/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/16/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 5/18/2012)
May 18, 2012 1171 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 14, 2012, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan and Debra L. Pas, Official Reporters, Telephone number 415-794-6659/ Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 6/8/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/16/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 5/18/2012)
May 17, 2012 1180 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 5/17/2012 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 5/17/2012). Jury Deliberations Continued. Further Jury Trial set for 5/18/2012 7:30 AM. (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/17/2012)
May 17, 2012 1170 RESPONSE (re 1151 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Counts V and VII of Oracle's Amended Complaint ) filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 5/17/2012)
May 17, 2012 1169 RESPONSE (re 1168 Amended MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S RULE 50(A) MOTION AT THE CLOSE OF ALL EVIDENCE FOR PHASE II (PATENT PHASE)--REPLACES [DKT 1167] ) filed byGoogle Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 5/17/2012)
May 16, 2012 1168 Amended MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S RULE 50(A) MOTION AT THE CLOSE OF ALL EVIDENCE FOR PHASE II (PATENT PHASE)--REPLACES [DKT 1167] filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Responses due by 5/17/2012. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 5/16/2012)
May 16, 2012 1167 ERRONEOUS FILING. REPLACED BY 1168 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S RULE 50(A) MOTION AT THE CLOSE OF ALL EVIDENCE FOR PHASE II (PATENT PHASE) filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Responses due by 5/17/2012. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 5/16/2012) Modified on 5/17/2012 (mjj2, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2012 1166 Brief re 1151 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Counts V and VII of Oracle's Amended Complaint filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 1151 ) (Baber, Bruce) (Filed on 5/16/2012)
May 16, 2012 1165 Featured Case ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW REGARDING REGISTRATION AND OWNERSHIP. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 16, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2012)
May 16, 2012 1164 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 11, 2012, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan and Debra L. Pas, Official Reporters, Telephone number 415-794-6659/ Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 6/6/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 5/16/2012)
May 16, 2012 1163 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 10, 2012, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan and Debra L. Pas, Official Reporters, Telephone number 415-794-6659/ Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 6/6/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 5/16/2012)
May 16, 2012 1162 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 9, 2012, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan and Debra L. Pas, Official Reporters, Telephone number 415-794-6659/ Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 6/6/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 5/16/2012)
May 16, 2012 1161 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 8, 2012, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan and Debra L. Pas, Official Reporters, Telephone number 415-794-6659/ Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 6/6/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 5/16/2012)
May 16, 2012 1160 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 7, 2012, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan and Debra L. Pas, Official Reporters, Telephone number 415-794-6659/ Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 6/6/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 5/16/2012)
May 16, 2012 1159 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING COPYRIGHT DAMAGES re 1158 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Copyright Damages filed by Google Inc. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2012)
May 16, 2012 1158 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Copyright Damages filed by Google Inc.. (Baber, Bruce) (Filed on 5/16/2012)
May 15, 2012 1178 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 5/15/2012 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 5/15/2012). Closing Arguments Made. Jury Instructions Read. Deliberation Began. Further Jury Trial set for 5/16/2012 8:00 AM. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan; Debra Pas.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/15/2012)
May 15, 2012 1157 TRIAL BRIEF ORACLES OFFER OF PROOF ON LITERALLY COPIED CODE FILES AND INFRINGERS PROFITS by Oracle America, Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 5/15/2012)
May 15, 2012 1156 TRIAL BRIEF re Oracle's Failure of Proof on Causation by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 5/15/2012)
May 15, 2012 1155 Witness List by Google Inc. Rolling List of Next Ten Witnesses. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 5/15/2012)
May 15, 2012 1154 Witness List by Oracle America, Inc. Rolling List of Next Ten Witnesses. (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 5/15/2012)
May 15, 2012 1153 FINAL CHARGE GIVEN TO JURY FOR PHASE TWO. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 15, 2012. (Attachments: # 1 Special Verdict Form)(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2012)
May 15, 2012 1152 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Outline of Oracle America, Inc.'s Rule 50(a) Motion at the Close of All Evidence In Phase Two filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Responses due by 5/17/2012. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 5/15/2012)
May 14, 2012 1177 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 5/14/2012 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 5/14/2012). Witnesses called. Defendant Rest. Rebuttal witness called. Plaintiff and Defendant Rest. Further Charging Conference held. Further Jury Trial set for 5/15/2012 7:30 AM.(Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan; Debra Pas.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/14/2012)
May 14, 2012 1151 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Counts V and VII of Oracle's Amended Complaint filed by Google Inc.. Responses due by 5/17/2012. (Baber, Bruce) (Filed on 5/14/2012)
May 14, 2012 1150 RESPONSE (re 1145 MOTION Exclude Certain Witnesses from the Damages Phase ) ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S OPPOSITION TO GOOGLES MOTION TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN WITNESSES FROM THE DAMAGES PHASE filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 5/14/2012)
May 14, 2012 1149 RESPONSE (re 1146 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Evidence of Google's Android-Related Revenues Until Oracle Proves a Causal Nexus with the Infringement ) ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S OPPOSITION TO GOOGLES MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE ANDROID REVENUES filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 5/14/2012)
May 14, 2012 1148 REDACTION to 1122 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, 1046 Declaration in Support, EXHIBITS TO CORRECTED DEARBORN DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ORACLES MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF KEARL REPORT [REDACTED] by Oracle America, Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 5/14/2012)
May 14, 2012 1147 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 1122 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal EXHIBITS TO CORRECTED DEARBORN DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ORACLES MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF KEARL REPORT 1046 by Oracle America, Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 5/14/2012)
May 14, 2012 1146 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Evidence of Google's Android-Related Revenues Until Oracle Proves a Causal Nexus with the Infringement filed by Google Inc.. Responses due by 5/29/2012. Replies due by 6/5/2012. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 5/14/2012)
May 14, 2012 1145 MOTION Exclude Certain Witnesses from the Damages Phase filed by Google Inc.. Responses due by 5/29/2012. Replies due by 6/5/2012. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 5/14/2012)
May 14, 2012 1144 REDACTION to 1122 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ORACLES MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF RULE 706 EXPERT REPORT OF DR. JAMES KEARL [REDACTED] by Oracle America, Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 5/14/2012)
May 14, 2012 1143 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 1122 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ORACLES MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF RULE 706 EXPERT REPORT OF DR. JAMES KEARL by Oracle America, Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 5/14/2012)
May 14, 2012 1142 Witness List by Google Inc. Rolling List of Next Ten Witnesses. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 5/14/2012)
May 14, 2012 1141 FINAL DRAFT OF JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 14, 2012. (Attachments: # 1 Special Verdict Form)(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2012)
May 14, 2012 1140 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS GIVEN BEFORE MAY 14 CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 14, 2012. (Attachments: # 1 Draft Special Verdict Form)(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2012)
May 14, 2012 1139 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Indirect Patent Infringement filed by Google Inc.. (Baber, Bruce) (Filed on 5/14/2012)
May 14, 2012 1138 RESPONSE to re 1116 Trial Brief Oracle's May 14, 2012 Copyright Liability Reply Brief by Oracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 5/14/2012)
May 14, 2012 1137 TRIAL BRIEF Google's May 14, 2012 Copyright Liability Trial Brief by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 5/14/2012)
May 14, 2012 1136 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION RE PATENT WILLFUL INFRINGEMENT by Hon. William Alsup granting 1131 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2012)
May 13, 2012 1135 RESPONSE (re 1125 MOTION for Summary Judgment re Copyright Damages ) ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S OPPOSITION TO GOOGLES MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE: COPYRIGHT DAMAGES filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 5/13/2012)
May 13, 2012 1134 RESPONSE to re 1128 Objection Google's Opposition to Oracle's Untimely Claim Construction Motion by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 5/13/2012)
May 13, 2012 1133 RESPONSE (re 1129 MOTION TO ADMIT STATEMENT FROM GOOGLES INTERROGATORY RESPONSE ) filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 5/13/2012)
May 13, 2012 1132 OBJECTIONS to re 1121 Order to Final Charge to the Jury (Phase Two) by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 5/13/2012)
May 13, 2012 1131 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Case Management and Phase 3 Issues filed by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 5/13/2012)
May 13, 2012 1130 RESPONSE (re 1126 MOTION TO DEFER PHASE THREE PENDING RESOLUTION OF REMAINING LIABILITY ISSUES ) Google's Memorandum in Opposition to Oracle's Motion to Defer Phase Three filed byGoogle Inc.. (Baber, Bruce) (Filed on 5/13/2012)
May 13, 2012 1129 MOTION TO ADMIT STATEMENT FROM GOOGLES INTERROGATORY RESPONSE filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/14/2012 07:30 AM before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 5/13/2012. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 5/13/2012)
May 13, 2012 1128 OBJECTIONS to Jury Instruction and Request for Ruling Regarding "Symbolic Reference" by Oracle America, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 5/13/2012)
May 13, 2012 1127 Witness List by Oracle America, Inc. Rolling List of Next Ten Witnesses. (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 5/13/2012)
May 12, 2012 1126 MOTION TO DEFER PHASE THREE PENDING RESOLUTION OF REMAINING LIABILITY ISSUES filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/14/2012 07:30 AM before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 5/13/2012. (Norton, William) (Filed on 5/12/2012)
May 12, 2012 1125 MOTION for Summary Judgment re Copyright Damages filed by Google Inc.. Responses due by 5/29/2012. Replies due by 6/5/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Zimmer, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 5/12/2012)
May 12, 2012 1124 RESPONSE to Joint Response to Court's Request for Chart of Elements in Accused Packages by Oracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 5/12/2012)
May 11, 2012 1176 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 5/11/2012 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 5/11/2012). Witnesses called. Further Jury Trial set for 5/14/2012 7:30 AM. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan; Debra Pas.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/11/2012).
May 11, 2012 1123 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW ON DECOMPILED FILES re 1045 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Oracle's Corrected Rule 50(A) Motion at the Close of Evidence (WITH TABLES) filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 11, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2012)
May 11, 2012 1122 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO SEAL (1036) by Hon. William Alsup [granting in part and denying in part 1036 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal].(whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2012)
May 11, 2012 1121 PROPOSED CHARGE TO THE JURY AND VERDICT FORM. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 11, 2012. (Attachments: # 1 Draft Special Verdict Form)(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2012)
May 10, 2012 1175 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 5/10/2012 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 5/10/2012). Witnesses called. Plaintiff REST. Charging Conference held. Further Jury Trial set for 5/11/2012 7:30 AM (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan; Debra Pas.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/10/2012)
May 10, 2012 1120 Proposed Jury Instructions by Google Inc. Proposed Additional Language for Patent Jury Instruction Number 23. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
May 10, 2012 1119 Featured Case ORDER ON MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW re 1043 Brief, filed by Google Inc., 1045 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Oracle's Corrected Rule 50(A) Motion at the Close of Evidence (WITH TABLES) filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 10, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
May 10, 2012 1118 RESPONSE to re 1062 Order, 1088 Order, 1057 Order Oracle's May 10, 2012 Brief Responding to Court's Questions on Copyrightability by Oracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
May 10, 2012 1117 RESPONSE (re 1105 MOTION for New Trial ON ORACLE'S CLAIM THAT GOOGLE IS LIABLE FOR INFRINGEMENT OF ORACLE'S COPYRIGHT ON THE STRUCTURE, SEQUENCE AND ORGANIZATION OF THE COMPILABLE CODE FOR THE 37 JAVA API PACKAGES ) filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
May 10, 2012 1116 TRIAL BRIEF May 10, 2012 Copyright Liability Trial Brief by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
May 10, 2012 1115 RESPONSE to ORACLE'S RESPONSE TO COURT'S REQUESTS FOR SOURCE CODE EXAMPLES by Oracle America, Inc.. (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
May 10, 2012 1114 RESPONSE to re 1106 Response ( Non Motion ) Response to Oracle's Brief re Copyright Damages by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
May 9, 2012 1174 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 5/9/2012 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 5/9/2012). Witnesses Called. Rule 50 Motions argued. Further Jury Trial set for 5/10/2012 7:30 AM. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan; Debra Pas.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/9/2012)
May 9, 2012 1113 RESPONSE (re 1112 MOTION in Limine ORACLES MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING HINKMOND WONG AND NOEL POORE ) filed byGoogle Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 5/9/2012)
May 9, 2012 1112 MOTION in Limine ORACLES MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING HINKMOND WONG AND NOEL POORE filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2012 07:30 AM before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 5/9/2012. (Norton, William) (Filed on 5/9/2012)
May 9, 2012 1111 Statement Google Comments on the Court's Description of Java Language Principles by Google Inc.. (Baber, Bruce) (Filed on 5/9/2012)
May 9, 2012 1110 Statement Oracle's markup of the Court's Background Section by Oracle America, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 5/9/2012)
May 9, 2012 1109 Featured Case ORDER RE CHARGING CONFERENCE re 1108 Order. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 9, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2012)
May 9, 2012 1108 COURTS PROPOSED CHARGE TO THE JURY. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 9, 2012. (Attachments: # 1 Special Verdict Form)(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2012)
May 8, 2012 1107 RESPONSE (re 1098 MOTION Motion to Preclude Google From Disputing Ownership ) filed byGoogle Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 5/8/2012)
May 8, 2012 1106 RESPONSE to COURTS QUESTIONS by Oracle America, Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 5/8/2012)
May 8, 2012 1105 MOTION for New Trial ON ORACLE'S CLAIM THAT GOOGLE IS LIABLE FOR INFRINGEMENT OF ORACLE'S COPYRIGHT ON THE STRUCTURE, SEQUENCE AND ORGANIZATION OF THE COMPILABLE CODE FOR THE 37 JAVA API PACKAGES filed by Google Inc.. Responses due by 5/22/2012. Replies due by 5/29/2012. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 5/8/2012)
May 8, 2012 1104 Declaration of DAVID ZIMMER in Support of 1036 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Oracle's Motion to Exclude Portions of Kearl Report filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 1036 ) (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 5/8/2012)
May 8, 2012 1103 Featured Case ORDER FOR COPIES OF EXPERT REPORTS. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 8, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2012)
May 8, 2012 1102 Witness List by Google Inc. Rolling List of Next Ten Witnesses. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 5/8/2012)
May 8, 2012 1101 Witness List by Oracle America, Inc. Rolling List of Next Ten Witnesses. (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 5/8/2012)
May 8, 2012 1100 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 5/8/2012 before Willliam Alsup (Date Filed: 5/8/2012). Defendant's Opening Statement made. Witnesses called. Further Jury Trial set for 5/9/2012 7:30 AM. Rule 50 Motion Hearing set for 5/9/2012 01:45 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan; Debra Pas.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/8/2012)
May 8, 2012 1099 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 1056 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Google Inc.'s Opposition to Oracle America, Inc.'s Renewed Motion to Strike Portions of Dr. James Kearl's Expert Report by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 5/8/2012)
May 8, 2012 1098 MOTION Motion to Preclude Google From Disputing Ownership filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Responses due by 5/8/2012. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 5/8/2012)
May 7, 2012 1097 OBJECTIONS to re 1081 Response ( Non Motion ) GOOGLE'S OBJECTION TO ORACLE'S RESPONSES TO GOOGLE'S PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 5/7/2012)
May 7, 2012 1096 AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Rachel Claflin Regarding Google's Production of Android Financial Data in This Litigation by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 5/7/2012)
May 7, 2012 1095 AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Christopher C. Carnaval Regarding Google's Production of Android Financial Data in This Litigation by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 5/7/2012)
May 7, 2012 1094 DECLARATION of ROMAN A. SWOOPES in Opposition to 1093 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Related document(s) 1093 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 5/7/2012)
May 7, 2012 1093 RESPONSE (re 1007 Second MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Sections of Count VIII of Oracle's Amended Complaint ) filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 5/7/2012)
May 7, 2012 1092 RESPONSE (re 1045 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Oracle's Corrected Rule 50(A) Motion at the Close of Evidence (WITH TABLES) ) GOOGLE'S OPPOSITION TO ORACLE'S RULE 50(A) MOTION AT THE CLOSE OF PHASE ONE EVIDENCE filed byGoogle Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 5/7/2012)
May 7, 2012 1091 Witness List by Oracle America, Inc. ORACLE AMERICA, INC.'S ROLLING LIST OF NEXT TEN WITNESSES. (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 5/7/2012)
May 7, 2012 1090 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 5/7/2012 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 5/7/2012). Jury Deliberations Continued. Verdict read. Phase II - Plaintiff's Opening Statement. Further Jury Trial set for 5/8/2012 7:30 AM. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan; Debra Pas.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/7/2012)
May 7, 2012 1089 JURY VERDICT - Phase One. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2012)
May 7, 2012 1088 FURTHER ITEM FOR TWENTY-PAGE BRIEFS DUE MAY 10 [re 1062 Order, 1057 Order]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/7/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2012)
May 7, 2012 1087 REMINDER TO BRING COPIES OF COLOR HANDOUTS. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 7, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2012)
May 7, 2012 1086 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING 104 PATENT by Hon. William Alsup granting 1075 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2012)
May 6, 2012 1085 RESPONSE (re 1080 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Regarding Compatibility Testing Suite ) filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Peters, Marc) (Filed on 5/6/2012)
May 6, 2012 1084 RESPONSE (re 1076 MOTION in Limine re Peter Kessler Testimony re Android Code Modifications ) filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Peters, Marc) (Filed on 5/6/2012)
May 6, 2012 1083 RESPONSE (re 1077 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony of Timothy Lindholm ) ORACLES OPPOSITION TO GOOGLES MOTION TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY OF TIMOTHY LINDHOLM filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 5/6/2012)
May 6, 2012 1082 RESPONSE (re 1078 MOTION in Limine re Evidence Allegedly Supporting Knowledge Requirement for Indirect Infringement ) filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 5/6/2012)
May 6, 2012 1081 RESPONSE to re 1047 Proposed Findings of Fact Oracle's Responses to Google's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Oracle America, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 5/6/2012)
May 6, 2012 1080 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Regarding Compatibility Testing Suite filed by Google Inc.. Responses due by 5/21/2012. Replies due by 5/29/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Truman Fenton, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 5/6/2012)
May 6, 2012 1079 RESPONSE to re 1049 Proposed Findings of Fact by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 5/6/2012)
May 6, 2012 1078 MOTION in Limine re Evidence Allegedly Supporting Knowledge Requirement for Indirect Infringement filed by Google Inc.. Responses due by 5/21/2012. Replies due by 5/29/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 5/6/2012)
May 6, 2012 1077 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony of Timothy Lindholm filed by Google Inc.. Responses due by 5/21/2012. Replies due by 5/29/2012. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 5/6/2012)
May 6, 2012 1076 MOTION in Limine re Peter Kessler Testimony re Android Code Modifications filed by Google Inc.. Responses due by 5/21/2012. Replies due by 5/29/2012. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 5/6/2012)
May 6, 2012 1075 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER regarding '104 patent filed by Google Inc., Oracle America, Inc.. (Peters, Marc) (Filed on 5/6/2012)
May 5, 2012 1074 RESPONSE (re 1061 MOTION in Limine CONCERNING TESTIMONY BY JONATHAN SCHWARTZ ) filed byGoogle Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 5/5/2012)
May 5, 2012 1073 Witness List by Oracle America, Inc. Rolling List of Next Ten Witnesses. (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 5/5/2012)
May 4, 2012 1072 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING PATENT PHASE. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 4, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2012)
May 4, 2012 1071 Transcript of Proceedings held on 5/4/12, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, RPR, CRR, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 5/25/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/4/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/2/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 5/4/2012)
May 4, 2012 1070 Transcript of Proceedings held on 5/3/12, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, RPR, CRR, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 5/25/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/4/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/2/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 5/4/2012)
May 4, 2012 1069 Transcript of Proceedings held on 5/2/12, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, Official Reporter, Telephone number 415-431-1477. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 5/25/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/4/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/2/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 5/4/2012)
May 4, 2012 1068 Transcript of Proceedings held on 5/1/12, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, RPR, CRR, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 5/25/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/4/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/2/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 5/4/2012)
May 4, 2012 1067 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/30/12, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan and Debra L. Pas, Official Reporters, Telephone number 415-794-6659/ Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 5/25/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/4/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/2/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 5/4/2012)
May 4, 2012 1066 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/27/12, Vol. 11, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, Official Reporter, Telephone number 415-431-1477. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 5/25/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/4/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/2/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 5/4/2012)
May 4, 2012 1065 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/27/12, Vol. 10, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, Official Reporter, Telephone number 415-431-1477. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 5/25/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/4/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/2/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 5/4/2012)
May 4, 2012 1064 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/26/12, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan and Debra L. Pas, Official Reporters, Telephone number 415-794-6659/ Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 5/25/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/4/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/2/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 5/4/2012)
May 4, 2012 1063 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 5/4/2012 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 5/4/2012). Jury Deliberations continued. Further Jury Trial set for 5/7/12 at 8:00 AM.(Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/4/2012)
May 4, 2012 1062 FURTHER ITEMS TO BRIEF IN TWENTY-PAGE BRIEFS DUE MAY 10 [re 1057 Request for Briefing]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/4/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2012)
May 3, 2012 1061 MOTION in Limine CONCERNING TESTIMONY BY JONATHAN SCHWARTZ filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Responses due by 5/17/2012. Replies due by 5/24/2012. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 5/3/2012)
May 3, 2012 1060 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 5/3/2012 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 5/3/2012). Jury Deliberations continued. Further Jury Trial 5/4/2012 8:00 AM. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/3/2012)
May 3, 2012 1057 REQUEST FOR FURTHER PHASE ONE BRIEFING RE COPYRIGHTABILITY OF SSO (briefing due noon 5/10/2012; replies due noon 5/14/2012). Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/3/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2012)
May 3, 2012 1056 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEAL (Dkt. No. 1039) by Hon. William Alsup [granting 1039 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal].(whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2012)
May 3, 2012 1055 Featured Case SUPERSEDING ORDER REGARDING ORACLES RENEWED MOTION TO STRIKE. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 3, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2012)
May 3, 2012 1054 Featured Case *** PLEASE IGNORE. SUPERSEDED BY 1055 *** ORDER REGARDING MOTION TO STRIKE REPORTS OF DR. COX AND DR. KEARL. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 3, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2012) Modified on 5/3/2012 (whalc1, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2012 1059 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 5/2/2012 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 5/2/2012). Jury Deliberations continued. Further Jury Trial set for 5/3/2012 8:00 AM. (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/2/2012)
May 2, 2012 1053 RESPONSE to re 1050 Order Joint Reponse to Notice Re Second Phase of Trial by Google Inc., Oracle America, Inc.. (Peters, Marc) (Filed on 5/2/2012)
May 2, 2012 1052 Statement Regarding Trial Exhibit 610.1 by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 5/2/2012)
May 2, 2012 1051 Statement Oracle Statement Regarding J2SE 5.0 Specification License (TX610.1) by Oracle America, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 5/2/2012)
May 2, 2012 1050 NOTICE RE SECOND PHASE OF TRIAL. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/2/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2012)
May 2, 2012 1049 Corrected Proposed Findings of Fact by Oracle America, Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 5/2/2012) Modified on 5/3/2012 (mjj2, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2012 1048 REPLACED BY CORRECTED PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT 1049 Proposed Findings of Fact by Oracle America, Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 5/2/2012) Modified on 5/3/2012 (mjj2, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2012 1047 Proposed Findings of Fact by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 5/2/2012)
May 2, 2012 1046 Declaration of MEREDITH DEARBORN in Support of 1037 MOTION to Strike ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE RULE 706 EXPERT REPORT OF DR. JAMES KEARL [CORRECTED] filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B)(Related document(s) 1037 ) (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 5/2/2012)
May 2, 2012 1045 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Oracle's Corrected Rule 50(A) Motion at the Close of Evidence (WITH TABLES) filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Responses due by 5/5/2012. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 5/2/2012)
May 2, 2012 1044 REPLACED BY CORRECTED MOTION 1045 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Oracle's Rule 50(A) Motion at the Close of All Evidence filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Responses due by 5/5/2012. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 5/2/2012) Modified on 5/3/2012 (mjj2, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2012 1058 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 5/1/2012 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 5/1/2012). Jury Deliberations continued. Further Jury Trial set for 5/2/2012 8:00 AM. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/1/2012)
May 1, 2012 1043 Brief re 1007 Second MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Sections of Count VIII of Oracle's Amended Complaint GOOGLE'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF SECOND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW ON COUNT VIII OF ORACLE'S AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 1007 ) (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 5/1/2012)
May 1, 2012 1042 Declaration of Daniel Purcell in Support of 1041 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 1041 ) (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 5/1/2012)
May 1, 2012 1041 RESPONSE (re 1037 MOTION to Strike ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE RULE 706 EXPERT REPORT OF DR. JAMES KEARL ) Google Inc.'s Opposition to Oracle America, Inc.'s Renewed Motion to Strike Portions of Dr. James Kearl's Expert Report filed byGoogle Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 5/1/2012)
May 1, 2012 1040 Declaration of David Zimmer in Support of 1039 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Google's Opposition to Oracle's Renewed Motion to Strike Portions of Dr. James Kearl's Expert Report filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 1039 ) (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 5/1/2012)
May 1, 2012 1039 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 5/1/2012)
May 1, 2012 1038 AFFIDAVIT re 1037 MOTION to Strike ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE RULE 706 EXPERT REPORT OF DR. JAMES KEARL [CORRECTED] DECLARATION OF MEREDITH DEARBORN IN SUPPORT OF ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE RULE 706 EXPERT REPORT OF DR. JAMES KEARL by Oracle America, Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 5/1/2012)
May 1, 2012 1037 MOTION to Strike ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE RULE 706 EXPERT REPORT OF DR. JAMES KEARL filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Responses due by 5/15/2012. Replies due by 5/22/2012. *** ATTACHMENT FILED IN ERROR, REFER TO DOCUMENT 1046 . *** (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 5/1/2012) Modified on 5/2/2012 (fff, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/2/2012 (fff, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2012 1036 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Oracle's Motion to Exclude Portions of Kearl Report filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 5/1/2012)
May 1, 2012 1035 Witness List by Google Inc. GOOGLE INC.'S ROLLING LIST OF NEXT TEN WITNESSES. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 5/1/2012)
May 1, 2012 1034 Featured Case ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SEAL by Hon. William Alsup [denying 920 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal].(whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012)
April 30, 2012 1033 EXHIBITS re 935 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, 872 Declaration in Support, TO DECLARATION OF MEREDITH DEARBORN IN SUPPORT OF ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S OPPOSITION TO GOOGLES MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DR. JAMES KEARLS EXPERT REPORT filed by Oracle America, Inc. (Related document(s) 935 , 872 ) (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 4/30/2012) Modified on 5/1/2012 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2012 1032 REDACTION to 935 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S OPPOSITION TO GOOGLES MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DR. JAMES KEARLS EXPERT REPORT by Oracle America, Inc. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 4/30/2012) Modified on 5/1/2012 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2012 1031 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 935 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, EXHIBITS C & H TO DECLARATION OF MEREDITH DEARBORN IN SUPPORT OF ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S OPPOSITION TO GOOGLES MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DR. JAMES KEARLS EXPERT REPORT by Oracle America, Inc. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 4/30/2012) Modified on 5/1/2012 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2012 1030 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 935 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S OPPOSITION TO GOOGLES MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DR. JAMES KEARLS EXPERT REPORT by Oracle America, Inc. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 4/30/2012) Modified on 5/1/2012 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2012 1029 REDACTION to 935 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, EXHIBITS TO DECLARATION OF MEREDITH DEARBORN IN SUPPORT OF ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE RULE 706 EXPERT REPORT OF DR. JAMES KEARL by Oracle America, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F & H)(Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 4/30/2012) Modified on 5/1/2012 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2012 1028 REDACTION to 935 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE RULE 706 EXPERT REPORT OF DR. JAMES KEARL by Oracle America, Inc. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 4/30/2012) Modified on 5/1/2012 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2012 1027 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 935 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, EXHIBITS TO DECLARATION OF MEREDITH DEARBORN IN SUPPORT OF ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE RULE 706 EXPERT REPORT OF DR. JAMES KEARL by Oracle America, Inc. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 4/30/2012) Modified on 5/1/2012 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2012 1026 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 935 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF RULE 706 EXPERT REPORT OF DR. JAMES KEARL by Oracle America, Inc. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 4/30/2012) Modified on 5/1/2012 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2012 1025 Witness List by Oracle America, Inc. Rolling List of Next Ten Witnesses. (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 4/30/2012)
April 30, 2012 1024 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 935 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Google's Opposition to Oracle's Motion to Strike Portions of Dr. James Kearl's Expert Report by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/30/2012) Modified on 5/1/2012 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2012 1023 MOTION to Strike Portions of Dr. James Kearl's Expert Report (Public Version Pursuant to Dkt. No. 935) filed by Google Inc.. Responses due by 5/14/2012. Replies due by 5/21/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/30/2012)
April 30, 2012 1022 EXHIBITS re 991 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 1 - 3 to Declaration of Marc David Peters in Support of Oracle's Motion for Administrative Relief to Supplement the Joint Exhibit List filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Related document(s) 991 ) (Peters, Marc) (Filed on 4/30/2012)
April 30, 2012 1021 MOTION Oracle's Notice of Motion and Motion for Administrative Relief to Supplement the Joint Exhibit List re 991 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Responses due by 5/14/2012. Replies due by 5/21/2012. (Peters, Marc) (Filed on 4/30/2012)
April 30, 2012 1020 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 4/30/2012 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 4/30/2012). Closing Arguments held. Jury Instructions read. Deliberations began. Further Jury Trial set for 5/1/2012 8:00 AM. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan; Debra Pas.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/30/2012)
April 30, 2012 1018 FINAL CHARGE TO THE JURY AND SPECIAL VERDICT FORM. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 30, 2012. (Attachments: # 1 Special Verdict Form)(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2012)
April 30, 2012 1017 NOTICE OF JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 30, 2012. (Attachments: # 1 Special Verdict Form)(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2012)
April 30, 2012 1016 OBJECTIONS to re 1012 Order Oracle's Objections to the Court's Final Charge to the Jury and Special Verdict Form (Phase One) by Oracle America, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 4/30/2012)
April 29, 2012 1015 OBJECTIONS to re 1012 Order, 1014 Objection Google's Objections to Final Charge to the Jury (Phase One) and Special Verdict Form (corrected version of Dkt. 1014) by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/29/2012)
April 29, 2012 1014 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 1015 *** OBJECTIONS to re 1012 Order Google's Objections to Final Charge to the Jury (Phase One) and Special Verdict Form by Google Inc. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/29/2012) Modified on 4/30/2012 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2012 1013 RESPONSE (re 984 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Google's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Sections of Count VIII of Oracle's Amended Complaint ) WITH TABLES filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 4/29/2012)
April 29, 2012 1012 NOTICE OF JURY INSTRUCTIONS AND SPECIAL VERDICT FORM. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 29, 2012. (Attachments: # 1 Draft Special Verdict Form)(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2012)
April 29, 2012 1011 Witness List by Oracle America, Inc. ORACLE AMERICA, INC.'S AMENDED ROLLING LIST OF NEXT TEN WITNESSES. (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 4/29/2012)
April 29, 2012 1010 Brief ORACLE'S OBJECTION TO GOOGLE'S PROPOSED INSTRUCTION ON THE OBJECTIVE-SUBJECTIVE TEST filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 4/29/2012)
April 29, 2012 1009 RESPONSE (re 984 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Google's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Sections of Count VIII of Oracle's Amended Complaint ) filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 4/29/2012)
April 29, 2012 1008 Statement OUTLINE OF ORACLE AMERICA INC.'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF ITS RULE 50(A) MOTION AT THE CLOSE OF ALL EVIDENCE by Oracle America, Inc.. (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 4/29/2012)
April 29, 2012 1007 Second MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Sections of Count VIII of Oracle's Amended Complaint filed by Google Inc.. Responses due by 5/14/2012. Replies due by 5/21/2012. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/29/2012)
April 29, 2012 1006 Witness List by Oracle America, Inc. Rolling List of Next Ten Witnesses. (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 4/29/2012)
April 29, 2012 1005 Brief Oracle's Objections to Proposed New Jury Instruction on Fair Use filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 4/29/2012)
April 29, 2012 1004 OBJECTIONS to Oracle's Objection to Jury Instruction on Equitable Defenses by Oracle America, Inc.. (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 4/29/2012)
April 28, 2012 1003 Witness List by Oracle America, Inc. ORACLE AMERICA, INC.'S ROLLING LIST OF NEXT TEN WITNESSES. (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 4/28/2012)
April 28, 2012 1002 NOTICE by Oracle America, Inc. Joint Notice Appending Handouts to Jury (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (timeline), # 2 Exhibit 2 (glossary), # 3 Exhibit 3 (list of witnesses and attorneys))(Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 4/28/2012)
April 28, 2012 1001 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION granting 1000 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 998 Order, 999 Order re Contributory and Vicarious Copyright Infringement filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 28, 2012.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2012)
April 28, 2012 1000 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 998 Order, 999 Order re Contributory and Vicarious Copyright Infringement filed by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/28/2012)
April 28, 2012 999 Featured Case ORDER RE INDIRECT INFRINGEMENT re 998 Order. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 28, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2012)
April 27, 2012 1019 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 4/27/2012 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 4/27/2012). Charging Conference held. Further Jury Trial set for 4/30/2012 7:30 AM. (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/27/2012)
April 27, 2012 998 NOTICE [re jury instructions and "indirect infringement]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/27/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2012)
April 27, 2012 997 Statement Oracle's Comments Regarding the Court's 994 Proposed Jury Instructions (Phase One) by Oracle America, Inc. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 4/27/2012) Modified on 4/27/2012 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
April 26, 2012 996 Statement Google Inc.'s Comments on the Court's 994 Proposed Charge to the Jury by Google Inc. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/26/2012) Modified on 4/27/2012 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
April 26, 2012 995 Witness List by Oracle America, Inc. Rolling List of Next Ten Witnesses. (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
April 26, 2012 994 PROPOSED CHARGE TO THE JURY AND SPECIAL VERDICT FORM. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 26, 2012. (Attachments: # 1 Draft Special Verdict Form)(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
April 26, 2012 993 TRIAL BRIEF Google's Corrected April 25 Copyright Brief by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
April 26, 2012 992 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 4/26/2012 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 4/26/2012). Further Jury Trial set for 4/27/2012 7:30 AM. Charging Conference set for 4/27/2012 02:15 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan; Debra Pas.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/26/2012)
April 26, 2012 991 Featured Case ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SEAL (DKT. NO. 906) by Hon. William Alsup [denying 906 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal].(whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
April 26, 2012 990 Declaration of David Zimmer in Support of Oracle America, Inc.'s 849 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Oracle's Motion to Exclude Portions of the Rule 706 Expert Report of Dr. James Kearl (Dkt. No. 849) (revised per Docket No. 973) filed by Google Inc. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/26/2012) Modified on 4/27/2012 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
April 26, 2012 989 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/25/12, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan and Debra L. Pas, Official Reporters,, Telephone number 415-794-6659/ Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 5/17/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/29/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/25/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
April 26, 2012 988 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/24/12, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan and Debra L. Pas, Official Reporters, Telephone number 415-794-6659/ Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 5/17/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/29/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/25/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
April 26, 2012 987 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/23/12, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan and Debra L. Pas, Official Reporters, Telephone number 415-794-6659 Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 5/17/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/29/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/25/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
April 26, 2012 986 Brief Oracle's Copyright Brief Regarding Work as a Whole filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
April 25, 2012 985 Statement Google's Comments on the Court's April 25 Draft Special Verdict Form by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/25/2012)
April 25, 2012 984 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Google's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Sections of Count VIII of Oracle's Amended Complaint filed by Google Inc.. Responses due by 5/9/2012. Replies due by 5/16/2012. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/25/2012)
April 25, 2012 983 Statement Oracle's Comments Regarding the Court's Draft Special Verdict Form by Oracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 4/25/2012)
April 25, 2012 982 TRIAL BRIEF Google's April 25 Copyright Brief by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/25/2012)
April 25, 2012 981 Witness List by Oracle America, Inc. Amended Rolling List of Next Ten Witnesses. (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 4/25/2012)
April 25, 2012 980 NOTICE OF FILING OF DRAFT SPECIAL VERDICT FORM GIVEN TO PARTIES ON APRIL 19 AND COMMENTS. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 25, 2012. (Attachments: # 1 April 19 Draft Verdict Form, # 2 April 20 Parties Comments)(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2012)
April 25, 2012 979 Witness List by Oracle America, Inc. Rolling Witness List. (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 4/25/2012)
April 25, 2012 978 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING THE 702 PATENT by Hon. William Alsup denying 970 Motion.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2012)
April 25, 2012 977 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 4/25/2012 before Judge William Alsup (Date Filed: 4/25/2012). Witnesses called. Further Jury Trial set for 4/26/2012 7:30 AM. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan; Debra Pas.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/25/2012)
April 25, 2012 974 Featured Case ORDER RE DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS OF LARRY ELLISON (RE GOOGLE'S FINAL PACKET OF DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS FOR LARRY ELLISON -- DATED 4/25/2012 BUT NOT FILED). Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/25/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2012)
April 25, 2012 973 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR FILING UNDER SEAL AND GRANTING GOOGLE LEAVE TO FILE REVISED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ORACLE'S MOTION TO SEAL by Judge William Alsup [granting 966 Motion for Extension of Time to File]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2012)
April 25, 2012 972 Featured Case ORDER TO PAY ADDITIONAL ATTENDANCE FEE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/24/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2012)
April 24, 2012 976 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 4/24/2012 before Judge William Alsup (Date Filed: 4/24/2012). Witness called. Plaintiff REST - Phase One. Further Jury Trial set for 4/25/2012 7:30 AM. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan; Debra Pas.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/24/2012)
April 24, 2012 971 RESPONSE (re 970 MOTION Oracle Motion for Clarification Regarding 702 Patent ) Google's Opposition to Oracle's Motion for Clarification re '702 Patent filed byGoogle Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/24/2012)
April 24, 2012 970 MOTION Oracle Motion for Clarification Regarding 702 Patent filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Responses due by 4/24/2012. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 4/24/2012)
April 24, 2012 969 Witness List by Google Inc. Google Inc.'s Rolling List of Next Ten Witnesses. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/24/2012)
April 24, 2012 968 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING FORMAT OF PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 24, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2012)
April 24, 2012 967 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/20/12, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan and Debra L. Pas, OfficialReporters, Telephone number 415-794-6659/ Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 5/15/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/25/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/23/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 4/24/2012)
April 23, 2012 975 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 4/23/2012 before Judge William Alsup (Date Filed: 4/23/2012). Witnesses called. Further Jury Trial 4/24/2012 7:30 AM. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan; Debra Pas.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/23/2012)
April 23, 2012 966 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Administrative Relief to Extend Deadline for Filing Under Seal and Grant Google Leave to File a Revised Declaration in Support of Oracle's Motion to Seal filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation and Proposed Order)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/23/2012)
April 23, 2012 965 Witness List by Google Inc. Google Inc.'s Rolling List of Next Ten Witnesses. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/23/2012)
April 23, 2012 964 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED PAGE LENGTH by Hon. William Alsup granting 954 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2012)
April 22, 2012 963 RESPONSE (re 958 MOTION ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S MOTION TO ADMIT TRIAL EXHIBIT 1026 ) filed byGoogle Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/22/2012)
April 22, 2012 962 RESPONSE (re 959 MOTION ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S MOTION SEEKING A CLARIFYING INSTRUCTION AND PROFFER REGARDING APACHE HARMONY ) filed byGoogle Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/22/2012)
April 22, 2012 961 NOTICE by Oracle America, Inc. Update on Reexamination of '702 Patent (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 4/22/2012)
April 22, 2012 960 Statement Google's Statement re Order re Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law re All Issues of Fact and Law that Must be Resolved by the Judge, Including Scope of Protection of the Copyrights by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/22/2012)
April 22, 2012 959 MOTION ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S MOTION SEEKING A CLARIFYING INSTRUCTION AND PROFFER REGARDING APACHE HARMONY filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Responses due by 5/7/2012. Replies due by 5/14/2012. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 4/22/2012)
April 22, 2012 958 MOTION ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S MOTION TO ADMIT TRIAL EXHIBIT 1026 filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Responses due by 5/7/2012. Replies due by 5/14/2012. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 4/22/2012)
April 22, 2012 957 Witness List by Google Inc. Google Inc.'s Rolling List of Next Ten Witnesses. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/22/2012)
April 22, 2012 956 Brief re 953 Order, 948 Order Oracle's Brief Addressing Court's Copyright Questions filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 953 , 948 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 4/22/2012)
April 22, 2012 955 TRIAL BRIEF Google's April 22, 2012 Copyright Liability Trial Brief by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/22/2012)
April 22, 2012 954 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 953 Order, 948 Order REGARDING BRIEFING ON COPYRIGHT ISSUES filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 4/22/2012)
April 21, 2012 953 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER RE BRIEF DUE SUNDAY re 951 Order. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 21, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2012)
April 21, 2012 952 Witness List by Oracle America, Inc. Oracle America, Inc.'s Rolling List of Next Ten Witnesses. (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 4/21/2012)
April 21, 2012 951 Featured Case ORDER RE BRIEF DUE SUNDAY. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 21, 2012. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2012)
April 20, 2012 950 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/19/12, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan and Debra L. Pas, OfficialReporters,Telephone number 415-794-6659/ Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 5/11/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/21/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/19/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 4/20/2012)
April 20, 2012 949 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/18/12, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan and Debra L. Pas, OfficialReporters, Telephone number 415-794-6659 Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 5/11/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/21/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/19/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 4/20/2012) Modified on 4/23/2012 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
April 20, 2012 948 Featured Case ORDER RE ADDITIONAL ISSUES FOR SECOND BRIEF DUE SUNDAY. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 20, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2012)
April 20, 2012 947 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 4/20/2012 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 4/20/2012). Witnesses called. Further Jury Trial 4/23/2012 7:30 AM. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan; Debra Pas.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/20/2012)
April 20, 2012 946 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED STATEMENT by Hon. William Alsup granting 945 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2012)
April 19, 2012 945 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation regarding selection, arrangement, and structure filed by Google Inc., Oracle America, Inc.. (Peters, Marc) (Filed on 4/19/2012)
April 19, 2012 944 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 4/19/2012 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 4/19/2012). Witnessess called. Further Jury Trial set for 4/20/2012 7:30 AM. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan; Debra Pas.) (dtS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/19/2012)
April 18, 2012 943 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/17/12, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan and Debra L. Pas, Official Reporters, Telephone number 415-794-6659Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 5/9/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/21/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 4/18/2012)
April 18, 2012 942 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/16/12, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan and Debra L. Pas, Official Reporters, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 5/9/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/21/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 4/18/2012)
April 18, 2012 941 Witness List by Oracle America, Inc. Rolling List of Next Ten Witnesses. (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 4/18/2012)
April 18, 2012 940 NOTICE RE DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/18/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2012)
April 18, 2012 939 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 4/18/2012 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 4/18/2012). Witnesses called. Further Jury Trial 4/19/2012 7:30 AM. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan; Debra Pas.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/18/2012)
April 18, 2012 938 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART ORACLE'S MOTION TO DEEM ISSUES UNDISPUTED AND DENYING RELIEF REGARDING STATEMENT TO JURY by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 908 Motion.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2012)
April 17, 2012 937 Witness List by Oracle America, Inc. Rolling List of Next Ten Witnesses. (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 4/17/2012)
April 17, 2012 936 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 4/17/2012 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 4/17/2012). Witnesses called. Further Jury Trial 4/18/2012 7:30 AM. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan; Debra Pas.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/17/2012)
April 17, 2012 935 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge William Alsup [denying 844 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 849 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 866 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 870 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2012)
April 16, 2012 934 Statement ORACLES STATEMENT REGARDING MOTIONS TO DEEM ISSUES UNDISPUTED by Oracle America, Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 4/16/2012)
April 16, 2012 933 Statement RE THE IMPORT OF FACTS DEEMED UNDISPUTED FOR TRIAL by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/16/2012)
April 16, 2012 932 Witness List by Oracle America, Inc. Rolling List of Next Ten Witnesses. (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 4/16/2012)
April 16, 2012 931 Witness List by Google Inc. Rolling List of Next Ten Witnesses. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/16/2012)
April 16, 2012 930 Minute Entry: Jury Trial began on 4/16/2012 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 4/16/2012), Jury Selection held on 4/16/2012 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 4/16/2012). (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan; Debra Pas.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/16/2012)
April 16, 2012 929 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING APRIL 16 MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Hon. William Alsup denying without prejudice 921 922 .(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2012)
April 16, 2012 928 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING ORACLE'S MOTION TO AUGMENT EXHIBIT LIST by Hon. William Alsup granting 907 Motion augment exhibit list.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2012)
April 16, 2012 927 Featured Case ORDER AMENDING STIPULATED TRIAL PROCEDURES re 890 Order on Stipulation. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 16, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2012)
April 15, 2012 926 Statement Joint Statement of the Case for Voir Dire by Google Inc., Oracle America, Inc.. (Peters, Marc) (Filed on 4/15/2012)
April 15, 2012 925 RESPONSE (re 921 MOTION in Limine re Presentation of Financial Evidence and Testimony ) ORACLE AMERICAS OPPOSITION TO GOOGLES MOTION IN LIMINE RE PRESENTATION OF FINANCIAL EVIDENCE AND TESTIMONY filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 4/15/2012)
April 15, 2012 924 RESPONSE (re 922 MOTION to Exclude Evidence Regarding License, Implied License, and Equitable Estoppel Defenses ) filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/15/2012)
April 15, 2012 923 Exhibit List Joint Submission of Corrected Exhibit List by Oracle America, Inc... (Peters, Marc) (Filed on 4/15/2012)
April 15, 2012 922 MOTION to Exclude Evidence Regarding License, Implied License, and Equitable Estoppel Defenses filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Responses due by 4/17/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 4/15/2012)
April 15, 2012 921 MOTION in Limine re Presentation of Financial Evidence and Testimony filed by Google Inc.. Responses due by 4/30/2012. Replies due by 5/7/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/15/2012)
April 15, 2012 920 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the redacted sections of Google Inc.'s Motion in Limine re Presentation of Financial Evidence and Testimony filed by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/15/2012)
April 15, 2012 919 Witness List by Oracle America, Inc. Rolling List of Next Ten Witnesses. (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 4/15/2012)
April 14, 2012 918 Witness List by Oracle America, Inc. Rolling List of Next Ten Witnesses. (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 4/14/2012)
April 13, 2012 917 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING SECOND STIPULATION RE TRIAL PROCEDURES by Hon. William Alsup granting 905 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2012)
April 13, 2012 916 Declaration of David Zimmer in Support of 870 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 870 ) (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/13/2012)
April 13, 2012 915 Declaration of Eugene M. Paige in Support of 913 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Related document(s) 913 ) (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/13/2012)
April 13, 2012 914 RESPONSE (re 908 MOTION to Deem Facts Admitted by Google ) filed byGoogle Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/13/2012)
April 13, 2012 913 RESPONSE (re 907 MOTION to Supplement the Joint Exhibit List ) Google Inc.' filed byGoogle Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/13/2012)
April 13, 2012 912 RESPONSE (re 909 MOTION for Administrative Relief Regarding Statement to Jury ) filed byGoogle Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/13/2012)
April 13, 2012 911 REMINDER ON FIRST DAY OF TRIAL (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2012)
April 13, 2012 910 Featured Case ORDER FOR RESPONSE re 907 MOTION to Supplement the Joint Exhibit List filed by Oracle America, Inc., 909 MOTION for Administrative Relief Regarding Statement to Jury filed by Oracle America, Inc., 908 MOTION to Deem Facts Admitted by Google filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 13, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2012)
April 12, 2012 909 MOTION for Administrative Relief Regarding Statement to Jury filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Responses due by 4/16/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration Declaration of Marc Peters)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 4/12/2012)
April 12, 2012 908 MOTION to Deem Facts Admitted by Google filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Responses due by 4/16/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Marc David Peters, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 4/12/2012)
April 12, 2012 907 MOTION to Supplement the Joint Exhibit List filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Responses due by 4/16/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Marc David Peters, # 3 Exhibit A-C)(Peters, Marc) (Filed on 4/12/2012)
April 12, 2012 906 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Oracle's Motion for Administrative Relief to Supplement the Joint Exhibit List filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Peters, Marc) (Filed on 4/12/2012)
April 12, 2012 905 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Second Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Trial Procedures filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 4/12/2012)
April 12, 2012 904 Featured Case ORDER FOR PARTIES TO ACCOMMODATE THE PRESS. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 12, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2012)
April 12, 2012 903 NOTICE TO PRESS AND PUBLIC RE LIMITED SEATING ON FIRST DAY. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 12, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2012)
April 12, 2012 902 Proposed Findings of Fact by Oracle America, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 4/12/2012)
April 12, 2012 901 Statement re 854 Order Google's Proposed Statement of Issues Regarding Copyright by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/12/2012)
April 12, 2012 900 Brief re 852 Trial Brief ORACLES APRIL 12, 2012 BRIEF REGARDING COPYRIGHT ISSUES filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Related document(s) 852 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 4/12/2012)
April 12, 2012 899 NOTICE by Oracle America, Inc. re 854 Order Submission of Oracle's Statement of Issues Regarding Copyright (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Oracle statement of copyright issues)(Peters, Marc) (Filed on 4/12/2012)
April 12, 2012 898 Statement re 877 Order Google's Proposed Findings of Fact Regarding the Copyrightability of the Structure, Selection and Organization of the 37 APIs by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/12/2012)
April 12, 2012 897 TRIAL BRIEF Google's 4/12/12 Copyright Liability Trial Brief by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/12/2012)
April 11, 2012 896 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART GOOGLE'S MOTION TO DEEM ISSUES UNDISPUTED by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 861 Motion to deem issues undisputed.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2012)
April 11, 2012 895 Transcript of Proceedings held on March 28, 2012, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, RPR, CRR, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 5/2/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/14/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/10/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 4/11/2012)
April 11, 2012 894 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENT by Hon. William Alsup granting 876 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2012)
April 10, 2012 893 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for administrative relief (Peters, Marc) (Filed on 4/10/2012)
April 10, 2012 892 MOTION Administrative Relief to Deem Facts Admitted by Google filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Responses due by 4/12/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 4/10/2012)
April 10, 2012 891 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING DAUBERT MOTIONS AGAINST DR. JAMES KEARL by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 845 Motion to Strike 850 MOTION to Strike.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2012)
April 10, 2012 890 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING TRIAL PROCEDURES by Hon. William Alsup granting 884 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2012)
April 10, 2012 889 Letter from Michael A. Jacobs re 857 ORDER Regarding Telephone Call. FILED UNDER SEAL. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2012)
April 9, 2012 888 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 881 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Letter re Telephone Call by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
April 9, 2012 887 TRIAL BRIEF Google's Supplemental Copyright Trial Brief Pursuant to March 26, 2012 Order Unredacted Public Version by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
April 9, 2012 886 Declaration of David Zimmer in Support of 849 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF ORACLES MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE RULE 706 EXPERT REPORT OF DR. JAMES KEARL filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal)(Related document(s) 849 ) (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
April 9, 2012 885 Statement Parties' Joint Timeline [With Corrected Attestation] by Oracle America, Inc.. (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
April 9, 2012 884 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING TRIAL PROCEDURES filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
April 9, 2012 883 Statement Parties' Joint Timeline by Oracle America, Inc.. (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
April 9, 2012 882 RESPONSE (re 861 MOTION Administrative Relief to Deem Issues Undisputed ) filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
April 9, 2012 881 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Hon. William Alsup granting 875 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
April 9, 2012 880 Featured Case ORDER AUTHORIZING ENTRY AND USE OF EQUIPMENT FOR TRIAL by Hon. William Alsup granting 864 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
April 9, 2012 879 Featured Case ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SEAL by Hon. William Alsup denying 830 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
April 9, 2012 878 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING TRIAL TIME ALLOCATED TO DR. KEARL re 855 Letter filed by John Lee Cooper. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 9, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
April 9, 2012 877 REQUEST FOR PROPOSED FINDINGS. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 9, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
April 6, 2012 876 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENT [DKT. NO. 871] filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENT)(Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 4/6/2012)
April 6, 2012 875 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Google Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Under Seal its Response to the Court's Order Regarding Telephone Call filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/6/2012)
April 6, 2012 874 SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR FURTHER BRIEFING re 865 Order. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 6, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2012)
April 6, 2012 873 RESPONSE (re 845 MOTION to Strike Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Its Motion to Strike Portion of Dr. James Kearl's Expert Report ) ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S OPPOSITION TO GOOGLES MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DR. JAMES KEARLS EXPERT REPORT [PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION] filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 4/6/2012)
April 6, 2012 872 Declaration of MEREDITH DEARBORN in Support of 873 Opposition/Response to Motion, DECLARATION OF MEREDITH DEARBORN IN SUPPORT OF ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S OPPOSITION TO GOOGLES MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DR. JAMES KEARLS EXPERT REPORT filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-K)(Related document(s) 871 ) (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 4/6/2012) Modified on 4/9/2012 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
April 6, 2012 871 *** THIS ENTRY REMOVED BY ORDER OF THE COURT. SEE DOCKET # 894 . *** filed by Oracle America, Inc. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 4/6/2012) Modified on 4/6/2012 (ewn, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/11/2012 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
April 6, 2012 870 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration DECLARATION OF ANDREW C. TEMKIN IN SUPPORT OF ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL, # 2 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING IN PART ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL)(Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 4/6/2012)
April 6, 2012 869 Declaration of David Zimmer in Support of 868 Opposition/Response to Motion, to Strike Portions of Dr. James Kearl's Expert Report filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 868 ) (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/6/2012)
April 6, 2012 868 RESPONSE (re 850 MOTION to Strike ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE RULE 706 EXPERT REPORT OF DR. JAMES KEARL ) Google Inc's Opposition to Oracle America, Inc.'s Motion to Strike Portions of Dr. James Kearl's Expert Report filed byGoogle Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/6/2012)
April 6, 2012 867 Declaration in Support of 866 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Reid Mullen in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of Google's Opposition to Oracle's Motion to Strike Portions of Dr. James Kearl's Expert Report filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 866 ) (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/6/2012)
April 6, 2012 866 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/6/2012)
April 6, 2012 865 REQUEST FOR FURTHER BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 6, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2012)
April 5, 2012 864 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER AUTHORIZING ENTRY AND USE OF EQUIPMENT FOR TRIAL filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 4/5/2012)
April 5, 2012 863 Proposed Order re 861 MOTION Administrative Relief to Deem Issues Undisputed by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/5/2012)
April 5, 2012 862 Declaration of Reid P. Mullen in Support of 861 MOTION Administrative Relief to Deem Issues Undisputed filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 861 ) (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/5/2012)
April 5, 2012 861 MOTION Administrative Relief to Deem Issues Undisputed filed by Google Inc.. Responses due by 4/19/2012. Replies due by 4/26/2012. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/5/2012)
April 5, 2012 860 Brief re 853 Brief, Google's 4/5/12 Copyright Liability Trial Brief filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 853 ) (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/5/2012)
April 5, 2012 859 Brief re 852 Trial Brief Oracle's April 5, 2012 Brief Regarding Copyright Issues filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Related document(s) 852 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 4/5/2012)
April 5, 2012 858 Featured Case ORDER TO JURY COMMISSIONER to furnish refreshments for the jury. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/5/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2012)
April 4, 2012 857 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Telephone Call. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/4/2012. FILED UNDER SEAL.(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2012)
April 4, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Trial set for 5/31/2012 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2012).
April 4, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Trial set for 4/17/2012 4/18/2012 4/19/2012 07 4/20/2012 4/23/2012 4/24/2012 4/25/2012 4/26/2012 4/27/2012 4/30/2012 5/1/2012 5/2/2012 5/3/2012 5/4/2012 5/7/2012 5/8/2012 5/9/2012 5/10/2012 5/11/2012 5/14/2012 5/15/2012 5/16/2012 5/17/2012 5/18/2012 5/21/2012 5/22/2012 5/23/2012 5/24/2012 5/25/2012 5/28/2012 5/29/2012 5/30/2012 6/1/2012 07:30 AM before Hon. William Alsup. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2012) .
April 4, 2012 TELEPHONE CONFERENC FOR 3:00 P.M. ON 4/3/2012. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/4/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2012)
April 4, 2012 856 Featured Case ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE FOR 3:00 APRIL 4, 2012. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/4/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2012)
April 4, 2012 855 Letter from John L. Cooper to Judge Alsup regarding Dr. Kearl. (Cooper, John) (Filed on 4/4/2012)
April 4, 2012 854 REQUEST FOR STATEMENT OF ISSUES RE COPYRIGHT. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 4, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2012)
April 3, 2012 853 Brief re 835 Pretrial Conference - Interim, 837 Order, 838 Order, 843 Order Oracle's April 3, 2012 Supplemental Brief Regarding Copyright Issues filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Related document(s) 835 , 837 , 838 , 843 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 4/3/2012)
April 3, 2012 852 TRIAL BRIEF Google's 4/3/12 Copyright Liability Trial Brief by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/3/2012)
April 2, 2012 851 Featured Case ORDER RE ROLLING, WRITTEN NOTICE OF NEXT SEVEN WITNESSES (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2012)
April 2, 2012 850 MOTION to Strike ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE RULE 706 EXPERT REPORT OF DR. JAMES KEARL filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Responses due by 4/16/2012. Replies due by 4/23/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration DECLARATION OF MEREDITH DEARBORN IN SUPPORT OF ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE RULE 706 EXPERT REPORT OF DR. JAMES KEARL, # 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, # 3 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, # 4 Exhibit EXHIBIT C, # 5 Exhibit EXHIBIT D, # 6 Exhibit EXHIBIT E, # 7 Exhibit EXHIBIT F)(Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 4/2/2012)
April 2, 2012 849 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF ORACLES MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE RULE 706 EXPERT REPORT OF DR. JAMES KEARL filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration DECLARATION OF DEBORAH K. MILLER REGARDING THE EXPERT REPORT AND DEPOSITION OF RULE 706 EXPERT DR. JAMES KEARL, # 2 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING IN PART ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL)(Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 4/2/2012)
April 2, 2012 848 Featured Case ORDER RE: FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCES. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on April 2, 2012. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2012)
April 2, 2012 847 Declaration of Daniel Purcell in Support of Google Inc.'s 845 Motion to Strike Portions of Dr. James Kearl's Expert Report filed by Google Inc. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/2/2012) Modified on 4/3/2012 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
April 2, 2012 845 MOTION to Strike Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Its Motion to Strike Portion of Dr. James Kearl's Expert Report filed by Google Inc.. Responses due by 4/16/2012. Replies due by 4/23/2012. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/2/2012)
April 2, 2012 844 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/2/2012)
April 2, 2012 843 REQUEST FOR FURTHER BRIEFING AND TO SUBMIT AGREED-ON TIMELINE. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 2, 2012.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2012)
March 31, 2012 846 Minute Entry: Further Settlement Conference held. Case did not settle. No further discussion shall be convened. (Date Filed: 3/31/2012). (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/31/2012)
March 30, 2012 842 Statement Joint Statement Regarding Introduction of Dr. James Kearl to the Jury by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 3/30/2012)
March 30, 2012 841 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING SEATING FOR FIRST DAY OF TRIAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 30, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2012)
March 29, 2012 840 Witness List by Google Inc. (Supplemental) Trial Witness Disclosure Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(3). (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
March 29, 2012 839 EXHIBITS re 783 Declaration in Support, of Oracle's motion to amend 205 patent infringement contentions and supplement expert reports (Exhibit B) filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Related document(s) 783 ) (Peters, Marc) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
March 29, 2012 838 REVISION TO DUE DATE AND REQUEST FOR FURTHER BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 29, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
March 28, 2012 837 REQUEST FOR INPUT. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 28, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/28/2012: # 1 Errata Order With Signature) (whalc1, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2012 836 NOTICE REGARDING QUESTIONS FOR DR. JAMES KEARL. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 28, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2012)
March 28, 2012 835 Minute Entry: Pretrial Conference held on 3/28/2012 before Judge William Alsup(Date Filed: 3/28/2012). Supplemental briefs due by 4pm on 3/30/12. Refer to the Final Pretrial Order (dkt #675) (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/28/2012) .
March 27, 2012 834 Statement Joint Statement of Trial Streamlining Proposals by Google Inc., Oracle America, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
March 27, 2012 833 Brief re 793 Order, 708 Order, 754 Order, 827 Order - ORACLE'S MARCH 27, 2012 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF REGARDING COPYRIGHT ISSUES - filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Related document(s) 793 , 708 , 754 , 827 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
March 27, 2012 832 Featured Case ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SEAL by Hon. William Alsup denying 781 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
March 27, 2012 831 TRIAL BRIEF Google's Supplemental Copyright Trial Brief Pursuant to March 26, 2012 Order by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
March 27, 2012 830 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
March 27, 2012 829 NOTICE RE DISCUSSION ITEMS AT FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 27, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
March 26, 2012 828 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING ADJUSTMENTS TO DR. COCKBURN'S REPORT re 817 Brief filed by Google Inc., 816 Statement filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 26, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
March 26, 2012 827 REQUEST FOR FURTHER BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 26, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
March 26, 2012 826 Featured Case ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE MOTION TO AMEND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS by Hon. William Alsup denying without prejudice 782 Motion to Amend/Correct ;.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
March 23, 2012 825 Featured Case ORDER RE SCHEDULING FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 23, 2012. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2012)
March 23, 2012 824 Brief re 793 Order, 708 Order, 754 Order Oracle's March 23, 2012 Brief Regarding Copyright Issues filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Related document(s) 793 , 708 , 754 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 3/23/2012)
March 23, 2012 823 TRIAL BRIEF Reply Re Copyright Liability by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 3/23/2012)
March 21, 2012 822 NOTICE RE GUIDELINES FOR JURY TRIAL. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/21/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2012)
March 20, 2012 821 REQUEST FOR DR. KEARL'S REPORT. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 20, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2012)
March 20, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: Pretrial Conference set for 3/28/2012 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2012)
March 20, 2012 820 Featured Case ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE by Hon. William Alsup denying 804 Motion to Continue.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2012)
March 19, 2012 819 RESPONSE (re 804 MOTION to Continue The Trial Date From April 16, 2012 to April 23, 2012 ) ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S OPPOSITION TO GOOGLE, INC.S REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE [DKT. NO. 804] filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration DECLARATION OF DAVID BOIES IN SUPPORT OF ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S OPPOSITION TO GOOGLES MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE (DKT. NO. 804), # 2 Declaration DECLARATION OF MICHAEL A. JACOBS IN SUPPORT OF ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S OPPOSITION TO GOOGLES MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE (DKT. NO. 804))(Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 3/19/2012)
March 19, 2012 818 Declaration of Dr. Gregory K. Leonard in Support of 817 Brief filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 817 ) (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 3/19/2012)
March 19, 2012 817 Brief re 785 Order on Motion to Strike filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 785 ) (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 3/19/2012)
March 19, 2012 816 Statement re 785 Order on Motion to Strike ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S STATEMENT RESPONDING TO THE COURTS ORDER CONCERNING DR. COCKBURNS THRID REPORT [DKT. NO. 785] by Oracle America, Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 3/19/2012)
March 19, 2012 815 Declaration of Marc Peters in Support of 814 Reply to Opposition/Response, 782 MOTION to Amend/Correct Oracle's '205 Patent Infringement Contentions and Supplement Expert Reports filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 814 , 782 ) (Peters, Marc) (Filed on 3/19/2012)
March 19, 2012 814 REPLY (re 782 MOTION to Amend/Correct Oracle's '205 Patent Infringement Contentions and Supplement Expert Reports ) filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 3/19/2012)
March 16, 2012 813 Declaration of Mark H. Francis in Support of 812 Opposition/Response to Motion to Amend/Correct Oracle's '205 Patent Infringement Contentions and Supplement Expert Reports filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 812 ) (Francis, Mark) (Filed on 3/16/2012)
March 16, 2012 812 RESPONSE (re 782 MOTION to Amend/Correct Oracle's '205 Patent Infringement Contentions and Supplement Expert Reports ) filed byGoogle Inc.. (Francis, Mark) (Filed on 3/16/2012)
March 16, 2012 811 Statement re 705 Order (Joint) Update Re Third Damage Report Costs by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 3/16/2012)
March 16, 2012 810 MOTION to Strike Cockburn and Shugan Expert Reports (PUBLIC VERSION) filed by Google Inc.. Responses due by 3/30/2012. Replies due by 4/6/2012. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 3/16/2012)
March 15, 2012 809 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 789 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE LEONARD SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORT by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EX F to Zimmer Declaration)(Purcell, Daniel) (Filed on 3/15/2012)
March 15, 2012 808 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 789 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE COCKBURN AND SHUGAN EXPERT REPORTS by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EX A to Mullen Declaration, # 2 Exhibit EX B to Mullen Declaration, # 3 Exhibit EX C to Mullen Declaration, # 4 Exhibit EX D to Mullen Declaration, # 5 Exhibit EX E to Mullen Declaration)(Purcell, Daniel) (Filed on 3/15/2012)
March 15, 2012 807 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 789 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal MOTION TO STRIKE COCKBURN AND SHUGAN EXPERT REPORTS by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EX. A to Zimmer Declaration, # 2 Exhibit EX. H to Zimmer Declaration, # 3 Exhibit EX. I to Zimmer Declaration, # 4 Exhibit EX. J to Zimmer Declaration, # 5 Exhibit EX. K to Zimmer Declaration)(Purcell, Daniel) (Filed on 3/15/2012)
March 15, 2012 806 REPLY (re 803 MOTION to Strike 789 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal MOTION TO STRIKE COCKBURN AND SHUGAN EXPERT REPORTS [PUBLIC VERSION] ) REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE COCKBURN AND SHUGAN EXPERT REPORTS [PUBLIC VERSION] filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EX. A to Mullen Decl. [PUBLIC], # 2 Exhibit EX. B to Mullen Decl. [PUBLIC], # 3 Exhibit EX. C to Mullen Decl. [PUBLIC], # 4 Exhibit EX. D to Mullen Decl. [PUBLIC], # 5 Exhibit EX. E to Mullen Decl. [PUBLIC])(Purcell, Daniel) (Filed on 3/15/2012)
March 15, 2012 805 EXHIBITS re 719 Declaration in Support,, of Motion to Strike Cockburn and Shugan (Exhibit A) filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit D, # 3 Exhibit F, # 4 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) 719 ) (Purcell, Daniel) (Filed on 3/15/2012)
March 15, 2012 804 MOTION to Continue The Trial Date From April 16, 2012 to April 23, 2012 filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 3/15/2012)
March 15, 2012 803 *** FILED IN ERROR WITH CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. DOCUMENT LOCKED. *** MOTION to Strike 789 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal MOTION TO STRIKE COCKBURN AND SHUGAN EXPERT REPORTS [PUBLIC VERSION] filed by Google Inc.. Responses due by 3/29/2012. Replies due by 4/5/2012. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 3/15/2012) Modified on 3/16/2012 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
March 15, 2012 802 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 789 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF GREGORY K. LEONARDS SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT by Oracle America, Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 3/15/2012)
March 15, 2012 801 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 789 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S OPPOSITION TO GOOGLES MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THIRD EXPERT REPORT BY IAIN COCKBURN AND EXPERT REPORT BY STEVEN SHUGAN by Oracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Norton Declaration, Ex. E, # 2 Exhibit Norton Declaration, Ex. G, # 3 Exhibit Norton Declaration, Ex. H)(Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 3/15/2012)
March 15, 2012 800 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 789 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF GREGORY LEONARDS SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT by Oracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Richardson Declaration, Ex. D, # 2 Exhibit Richardson Declaration, Ex. E, # 3 Exhibit Richardson Declaration, Ex. G, # 4 Exhibit Richardson Declaration, Ex. H)(Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 3/15/2012)
March 15, 2012 799 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 789 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORT OF DR. ALAN J. COX by Oracle America, Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 3/15/2012)
March 15, 2012 798 MOTION to Strike ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF GREGORY LEONARDS SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT [PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION] filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Responses due by 3/29/2012. Replies due by 4/5/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Richardson Declaration, Ex. A, # 2 Exhibit Richardson Declaration, Ex. C)(Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 3/15/2012)
March 15, 2012 797 MOTION to Strike ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORT OF DR. ALAN J. COX [PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION] filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Responses due by 3/29/2012. Replies due by 4/5/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Dearborn Declaration, Ex. A, # 2 Exhibit Dearborn Declaration, Ex. B)(Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 3/15/2012)
March 15, 2012 796 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DAUBERT MOTION TO STRIKE GOOGLE'S SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT DAMAGES REPORTS by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 729 Motion to Strike 734 MOTION to Strike EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORT OF DR. ALAN J. COX.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2012)
March 14, 2012 795 Transcript of Proceedings held on March 7, 2012, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, RPR, CRR, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 4/4/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/16/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/12/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 3/14/2012)
March 14, 2012 794 Featured Case ORDER RE REQUEST TO CONTINUE TRIAL [re 792 Letter filed by Google Inc.]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/14/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2012)
March 14, 2012 793 REQUEST FOR BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 14, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2012)
March 14, 2012 792 Letter from Robert A. Van Nest re Trial Date . (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 3/14/2012)
March 14, 2012 791 NOTICE RE DR. JAMES KEARL re 790 Letter filed by John Lee Cooper. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 14, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2012)
March 13, 2012 790 Letter from John L. Cooper to Hon. William Alsup re Dr. Kearl, Rule 706 Expert. (Cooper, John) (Filed on 3/13/2012)
March 13, 2012 Order by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 772 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2012)
March 13, 2012 Order by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 761 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2012)
March 13, 2012 Order by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 750 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2012)
March 13, 2012 Order by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 736 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2012)
March 13, 2012 Order by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 733 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2012)
March 13, 2012 Order by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 727 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2012)
March 13, 2012 789 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTIONS TO SEAL by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 717 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2012)
March 13, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 4/16/2012 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2012) .
March 13, 2012 788 NOTICE RE TRIAL MATERIALS. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 13, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2012)
March 13, 2012 787 REQUEST AND NOTICE RE DR. JAMES KEARL re 413 Order. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 13, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2012)
March 13, 2012 786 Featured Case ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE OF APRIL 16, 2012 re 675 Order. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 13, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2012)
March 13, 2012 785 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART GOOGLE'S DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE DR. COCKBURN'S THIRD REPORT by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 718 Motion to Strike.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2012)
March 13, 2012 784 *** FILED IN WRONG CASE. NO NEW DOCUMENT. *** Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/12/12, before Judge James Ware. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, RPR, CRR, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 4/3/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/13/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/11/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 3/13/2012) Modified on 3/13/2012 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2012 783 Declaration of Marc Peters in Support of 782 MOTION to Amend/Correct Oracle's '205 Patent Infringement Contentions and Supplement Expert Reports filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed amended infringement contentions, # 2 Exhibit B - proposed supplemental infringement report, # 3 Exhibit C - portions of August noninfringement report)(Related document(s) 782 ) (Peters, Marc) (Filed on 3/12/2012)
March 12, 2012 782 MOTION to Amend/Correct Oracle's '205 Patent Infringement Contentions and Supplement Expert Reports filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Responses due by 3/16/2012. Replies due by 3/19/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 3/12/2012)
March 12, 2012 781 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions and Supplement Expert Reports filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 3/12/2012)
March 9, 2012 780 Brief re 708 Order, 754 Order ORACLE'S MARCH 9, 2012 BRIEF REGARDING COPYRIGHT ISSUES filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Related document(s) 708 , 754 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 3/9/2012)
March 9, 2012 779 Statement re 726 Order Regarding Re-Examination Proceedings by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 3/9/2012)
March 9, 2012 778 TRIAL BRIEF re Copyright Liability by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 3/9/2012)
March 9, 2012 777 Statement re 726 Order, 757 Order Oracle Statement Regarding Patent Reexaminations by Oracle America, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 3/9/2012)
March 7, 2012 776 NOTICE TO DR. JAMES KEARL. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 7, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2012)
March 7, 2012 775 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/7/2012 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 3/7/2012) re 718 MOTION to Strike Portions of Third Expert Report by Iain Cockburn and Expert Report by Steven Shugan; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Google Inc. Motion taken under submission. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/7/2012)
March 7, 2012 774 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PRECIS TO FILE MOTION TO AMEND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS re 755 Letter filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 7, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2012)
March 6, 2012 773 REPLY (re 729 MOTION to Strike PORTIONS OF GREGORY LEONARDS SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT ) filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 3/6/2012)
March 6, 2012 772 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration DECLARATION OF ANDREW TEMKIN REGARDING GOOGLE, INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL (DKT. NO. 750) AND ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S FILINGS OF MARCH 6, 2012, # 2 Proposed Order)(Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 3/6/2012)
March 6, 2012 771 REPLY (re 734 MOTION to Strike EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORT OF DR. ALAN J. COX ) filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 3/6/2012)
March 6, 2012 770 REQUEST FOR DISCUSSION AT TOMORROW'S HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 6, 2012.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2012)
March 5, 2012 769 Letter from Michael A. Jacobs regarding Court order 767 and Oracle's withdrawal of Claim 14 of the '476 patent. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 3/5/2012)
March 5, 2012 768 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING HEARING ON MARCH 7 re 756 Order. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 5, 2012.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2012)
March 2, 2012 767 Featured Case ORDER DENYING PRECIS REQUEST AS MOOT re 716 Letter filed by Oracle America, Inc., 715 Letter filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 2, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2012)
March 2, 2012 766 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING DAUBERT HEARING ON MARCH 7. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 2, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2012)
March 2, 2012 765 Letter from Michael A. Jacobs Re Oracle Request for Leave to File Motion to Amend Oracle's 205 Patent Infringement Contentions and Report. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 3/2/2012)
March 2, 2012 764 Declaration of GREGORY LEONARD in Support of 762 Google's Opposition to Oracle's Motion to Strike Portions of Gregory Leonard's Supplemental Report filed by Google Inc. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 3/2/2012) Modified on 3/5/2012 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
March 2, 2012 763 Declaration of David Zimmer in Support of 762 Google Inc.'s Opposition to Oracle America, Inc.'s Motion to Strike Portions of Gregory Leonard's Supplemental Expert Report filed byGoogle Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit E(1), # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 3/2/2012) Modified on 3/5/2012 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
March 2, 2012 762 RESPONSE (re 729 MOTION to Strike PORTIONS OF GREGORY LEONARDS SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT ) filed byGoogle Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 3/2/2012)
March 2, 2012 761 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 3/2/2012)
March 2, 2012 760 Declaration of Reid P. Mullen in Support of 759 Opposition/Response to Motion to Exclude Portions of the Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Alan J. Cox filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 759 ) (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 3/2/2012)
March 2, 2012 759 RESPONSE (re 734 MOTION to Strike EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORT OF DR. ALAN J. COX ) filed byGoogle Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 3/2/2012)
March 2, 2012 758 Letter from Robert A. Van Nest Opposing Oracle's Request for Leave to Amend its '205 Patent Infringement Contentions. (Francis, Mark) (Filed on 3/2/2012)
March 1, 2012 757 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER REGARDING STATEMENT ON REEXAMINATIONS re 726 Order. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 1, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2012)
March 1, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 718 MOTION to Strike Portions of Third Expert Report by Iain Cockburn and Expert Report by Steven Shugan; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof. Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2012 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2012)
March 1, 2012 756 Featured Case ORDER SETTING DAUBERT HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 1, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2012)
February 29, 2012 755 Letter from Michael A. Jacobs Requesting Leave to File Motion to Amend Oracle's 205 Patent Infringement Contentions and Report. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
February 29, 2012 754 Featured Case ORDER REQUESTING DISCUSSION IN COPYRIGHT BRIEFS. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 29, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
February 29, 2012 753 Featured Case ORDER ALLOWING EXPERTS TO ADDRESS FINAL REEXAMS re 723 Letter filed by Google Inc., 732 Response ( Non Motion ) filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 29, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
February 28, 2012 752 Declaration of Reid Mullen in Support of 750 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 751 Reply to Opposition/Response, [PUBLIC VERSION] filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 750 , 751 ) (Mullen, Reid) (Filed on 2/28/2012)
February 28, 2012 751 REPLY (re 718 MOTION to Strike Portions of Third Expert Report by Iain Cockburn and Expert Report by Steven Shugan; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, 750 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) filed byGoogle Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 2/28/2012)
February 28, 2012 750 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 2/28/2012)
February 27, 2012 749 NOTICE REGARDING FEBRUARY 24 LETTER re 748 Letter filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 27, 2012.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2012)
February 24, 2012 748 Letter from Robert A. Van Nest . (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
February 24, 2012 747 ERRATA re 736 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF ITS OPPOSITION TO GOOGLES DAUBERT MOTION [CORRECTED] PROPOSED ORDER by Oracle America, Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
February 24, 2012 746 Declaration of GEORGE SIMION in Support of 737 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Related document(s) 737 ) (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
February 24, 2012 745 Declaration of HINKMOND WONG in Support of 737 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Related document(s) 737 ) (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
February 24, 2012 744 Declaration of JOHN R. ROSE in Support of 737 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Related document(s) 737 ) (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
February 24, 2012 743 Declaration of MARK REINHOLD in Support of 737 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Related document(s) 737 ) (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
February 24, 2012 742 Declaration of CHRISTOPHER PLUMMER in Support of 737 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Related document(s) 737 ) (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
February 24, 2012 741 Declaration of PETER KESSLER in Support of 737 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Related document(s) 737 ) (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
February 24, 2012 740 Declaration of STEVEN M. SHUGAN in Support of 737 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 737 ) (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
February 24, 2012 739 Declaration of IAIN M. COCKBURN in Support of 737 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 737 ) (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
February 24, 2012 738 Declaration of FRED NORTON in Support of 737 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Related document(s) 737 ) (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
February 24, 2012 737 RESPONSE (re 718 MOTION to Strike Portions of Third Expert Report by Iain Cockburn and Expert Report by Steven Shugan; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
February 24, 2012 736 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF ITS OPPOSITION TO GOOGLES DAUBERT MOTION filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
February 24, 2012 735 Declaration of MEREDITH DEARBORN in Support of 734 MOTION to Strike EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORT OF DR. ALAN J. COX filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 734 ) (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
February 24, 2012 734 MOTION to Strike EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORT OF DR. ALAN J. COX filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Responses due by 3/2/2012. Replies due by 3/6/2012. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
February 24, 2012 733 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF ITS MOTION TO STRIK PORTIONS OF THE SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORT OF DR. ALAN J. COX filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
February 24, 2012 732 RESPONSE to re 723 Letter regarding '702 and '205 invalidity supplementation by Oracle America, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
February 24, 2012 731 Declaration of BEKO REBLITZ-RICHARDSON in Support of 729 MOTION to Strike PORTIONS OF GREGORY LEONARDS SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) 729 ) (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 2/24/2012) Modified on 2/27/2012 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
February 24, 2012 730 Declaration of IAIN M. COCKBURN in Support of 729 MOTION to Strike PORTIONS OF GREGORY LEONARDS SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Related document(s) 729 ) (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
February 24, 2012 729 MOTION to Strike PORTIONS OF GREGORY LEONARDS SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Responses due by 3/2/2012. Replies due by 3/6/2012. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
February 24, 2012 728 Declaration of ANDREW TEMKIN in Support of 727 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORT OF DR. GREGORY K. LEONARD filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Related document(s) 727 ) (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
February 24, 2012 727 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORT OF DR. GREGORY K. LEONARD filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
February 24, 2012 726 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING REEXAMINATIONS re 722 Notice (Other) filed by Google Inc., Oracle America, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 24, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
February 24, 2012 725 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING PATENT MARKING JOINT STATEMENT re 721 Statement filed by Google Inc., Oracle America, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 24, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
February 23, 2012 724 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING EXPERTS' COMPENSATION. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 23, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2012)
February 22, 2012 723 Letter from Defendant Google Inc. Requesting Leave to Supplement Invalidity Expert Reports In View of Reexamination Proceedings. (Francis, Mark) (Filed on 2/22/2012)
February 22, 2012 722 NOTICE by Google Inc., Oracle America, Inc. Regarding Reexamination of Patents-in-Suit (Francis, Mark) (Filed on 2/22/2012)
February 21, 2012 721 Statement re 707 Order Supplemental Joint Statement Regarding Oracle Products Practicing Patents by Google Inc., Oracle America, Inc.. (Peters, Marc) (Filed on 2/21/2012)
February 17, 2012 720 Proposed Order re 718 MOTION to Strike Portions of Third Expert Report by Iain Cockburn and Expert Report by Steven Shugan; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 2/17/2012)
February 17, 2012 719 Declaration of DAVID ZIMMER in Support of 718 MOTION to Strike Portions of Third Expert Report by Iain Cockburn and Expert Report by Steven Shugan; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Related document(s) 718 ) (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 2/17/2012)
February 17, 2012 718 MOTION to Strike Portions of Third Expert Report by Iain Cockburn and Expert Report by Steven Shugan; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Google Inc.. Responses due by 3/2/2012. Replies due by 3/9/2012. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 2/17/2012)
February 17, 2012 717 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 2/17/2012)
February 17, 2012 716 Letter from Plaintiff Oracle America Re Google Precis Letter Re Claim 14 of the '476 Patent. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 2/17/2012)
February 15, 2012 715 Letter from Defendant Google Inc Re Invalidity of Claim 14 of the '476 Patent. . (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 2/15/2012)
February 9, 2012 714 Featured Case ORDER of USCA re 618 USCA for the Federal Circuit. Petition for writ of mandamus. The petition for a writ of mandamus is denied. The motion for oral argument is denied. Misc. No. 106. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2012)
February 9, 2012 713 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER REGARDING ADDITIONAL DEPOSITIONS re 712 Order. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 9, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2012)
February 9, 2012 712 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING FEBRUARY 8 JOINT LETTER re 711 Letter filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 9, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2012)
February 8, 2012 711 Letter from Daniel Purcell and Steven Holtzman Joint Letter Regarding Depositions of Oracle Engineers. (Purcell, Daniel) (Filed on 2/8/2012)
February 3, 2012 710 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING TRIAL BRIEFS. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 3, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2012)
February 2, 2012 709 Featured Case ORDER REQUESTING COPIES OF EXPERT REPORTS re 702 Order,. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 2, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2012)
February 1, 2012 708 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING COPYRIGHT ISSUES. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 1, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2012)
January 31, 2012 707 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING PATENT MARKING DISPUTE re 706 Statement filed by Google Inc., Oracle America, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 31, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2012)
January 27, 2012 706 Statement re 641 Order, 661 Statement Joint Statement regarding Oracle Products Practicing Patents by Google Inc., Oracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix B)(Peters, Marc) (Filed on 1/27/2012)
January 25, 2012 705 Featured Case ORDER RE ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS FOR THIRD DAMAGES STUDY re 702 Order,. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 25, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2012)
January 25, 2012 704 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER re 637 Claim Construction Statement filed by Google Inc., 647 Objection filed by Google Inc., 645 Objection filed by Oracle America, Inc., 691 Response ( Non Motion ) filed by Oracle America, Inc., 646 Declaration in Support, filed by Oracle America, Inc., 693 Brief filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 25, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2012)
January 24, 2012 703 RESPONSE to re 702 Order, ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER OF JANUARY 20, 2012 702 by Oracle America, Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 1/24/2012)
January 20, 2012 702 Featured Case ORDER CONDITIONALLY ALLOWING DR. COCKBURN A THIRD DAMAGES REPORT re 700 Response ( Non Motion ) filed by Oracle America, Inc., 701 Response filed by Google Inc., 698 Response ( Non Motion ) filed by Oracle America, Inc., 697 Response filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 20, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2012)
January 19, 2012 701 Response re 698 Response ( Non Motion ) GOOGLE'S REPLY TO ORACLE'S RESPONSE TO THE COURT'S JANUARY 9, 2012 ORDER ON GOOGLE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 byGoogle Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 1/19/2012)
January 19, 2012 700 RESPONSE to re 697 Response ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S REPLY TO GOOGLES RESPONSE TO THE COURTS JANUARY 9, 2012 ORDER ON GOOGLE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 [DKT. 685] by Oracle America, Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 1/19/2012)
January 17, 2012 699 Featured Case ORDER RESCHEDULING DEADLINE FOR FIVE-PAGE REPLIES re 698 Response ( Non Motion ) filed by Oracle America, Inc., 697 Response filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 17, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
January 17, 2012 698 RESPONSE to re 685 Order on Motion in Limine, ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S RESPONSE TO THE COURTS JANUARY 9, 2012 ORDER ON GOOGLE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 (DKT. 685) by Oracle America, Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
January 17, 2012 697 Response re 685 Order on Motion in Limine, Memorandum Regarding Whether Dr. Cockburn Should Be Allowed To Submit A Third Damages Report byGoogle Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
January 12, 2012 696 Declaration of Daniel Purcell in Support of 695 Brief filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 695 ) (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 1/12/2012)
January 12, 2012 695 Brief re MOTION in Limine No. 3 [SUPPLEMENTAL] filed byGoogle Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 1/12/2012)
January 12, 2012 694 Featured Case FURTHER RULINGS REGARDING COMMENTS ON FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER re 692 Response ( Non Motion ) filed by Google Inc., 690 Response ( Non Motion ) filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 12, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2012)
January 11, 2012 693 Brief in Reply to Oracle's Proposed Claim Constructions filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Sabnis, Cheryl) (Filed on 1/11/2012)
January 11, 2012 692 RESPONSE to re 675 Order and Objections to Final Pretrial Order by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 1/11/2012)
January 11, 2012 691 RESPONSE to re 647 Objection Oracle's Responsive Brief Regarding Objections To Google's Proposed Claim Constructions by Oracle America, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 1/11/2012)
January 11, 2012 690 RESPONSE to Oracle's Response to Final Pretrial Order by Oracle America, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 1/11/2012)
January 11, 2012 689 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 687 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal EXHIBITS J & M TO THE DECLARATION OF MEREDITH DEARBORN IN SUPPORT OF 688 ORACLE AMERICA INC.S RESPONSIVE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO 549 re 494 GOOGLES MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF COCKBURN REPORT ON DAMAGES by Oracle America, Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 1/11/2012)
January 11, 2012 688 Response ORACLE AMERICA INC.S RESPONSIVE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO 549 re 494 GOOGLES MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF COCKBURN REPORT ON DAMAGES byOracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A, C-F, H, L to Dearborn Declaration)(Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 1/11/2012)
January 10, 2012 687 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTIONS TO SEAL by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 571 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2012)
January 9, 2012 686 DIRECTIVE TO RULE 706 EXPERT re 685 Order on Motion in Limine,. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 9, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
January 9, 2012 685 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART GOOGLE'S MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER THREE TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF DR. COCKBURN'S REVISED DAMAGES REPORT by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 670 Motion in Limine.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
January 9, 2012 684 RESPONSE to re 681 Response ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S REPLY TO GOOGLES JANUARY 5, 2012 RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR FURTHER BRIEFING ON DAMAGES (DKT. NO. 657) by Oracle America, Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
January 9, 2012 683 Response re 682 Response ( Non Motion ) GOOGLE'S REPLY TO ORACLE'S RESPONSE TO COURT'S DECEMBER 27, 2011 REQUEST FOR FURTHER BRIEFING ON DAMAGES byGoogle Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
January 5, 2012 682 RESPONSE to ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S RESPONSE TO COURTS DECEMBER 27, 2011, REQUEST FOR FURTHER BREIFING ON DAMAGES (DKT. NO. 657) by Oracle America, Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
January 5, 2012 681 Response re 657 Order GOOGLE'S RESPONSE TO THE COURT'S DECEMBER 27, 2011 REQUEST FOR FURTHER BRIEFING ON DAMAGES EXPERT ISSUES byGoogle Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
January 4, 2012 680 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 677 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 32 to the 673 Declaration of Daniel Purcell in Support of 671 Motion in Limine No. 4, 668 Motion in Limine No. 1, 672 Motion in Limine No. 5, 669 Motion in Limine No. 2, 670 Motion in Limine No. 3 by Google Inc.. (Kamber, Matthias) (Filed on 1/4/2012)
January 4, 2012 679 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 677 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Oracle's Opposition to 672 Motion in Limine No. 5 by Google Inc.. (Kamber, Matthias) (Filed on 1/4/2012)
January 4, 2012 678 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 677 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 5-04 to the Declaration of Ruchika Agrawal in Opposition to 671 Motion in Limine No. 4, 668 Motion in Limine No. 1, 672 Motion in Limine No. 5, 669 Motion in Limine No. 2, 670 Motion in Limine No. 3 filed by Google, Inc. by Google Inc.. (Kamber, Matthias) (Filed on 1/4/2012)
January 4, 2012 677 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER BACKING UP ORDER # 659 by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 507 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2012)
January 4, 2012 676 Featured Case OMNIBUS ORDER ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 4, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2012)
January 4, 2012 675 Featured Case FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 4, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2012)
January 3, 2012 674 DECLARATION of RUCHIKA AGRAWAL in Opposition to 671 MOTION in Limine No. 4, 668 MOTION in Limine No. 1, 672 MOTION in Limine No. 5, 669 MOTION in Limine No. 2, 670 MOTION in Limine No. 3 filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-1, # 2 Exhibit 1-2, # 3 Exhibit 1-3, # 4 Exhibit 1-4, # 5 Exhibit 1-5, # 6 Exhibit 1-6, # 7 Exhibit 1-7, # 8 Exhibit 1-8, # 9 Exhibit 1-9, # 10 Exhibit 1-10, # 11 Exhibit 1-11, # 12 Exhibit 1-12, # 13 Exhibit 2-1, # 14 Exhibit 2-2, # 15 Exhibit 2-3, # 16 Exhibit 2-4, # 17 Exhibit 2-5, # 18 Exhibit 2-6, # 19 Exhibit 2-7, # 20 Exhibit 2-8, # 21 Exhibit 2-9, # 22 Exhibit 2-10, # 23 Exhibit 2-11, # 24 Exhibit 2-12, # 25 Exhibit 2-13, # 26 Exhibit 2-14, # 27 Exhibit 2-15, # 28 Exhibit 2-16, # 29 Exhibit 2-17, # 30 Exhibit 3-1, # 31 Exhibit 3-2, # 32 Exhibit 3-3, # 33 Exhibit 3-4, # 34 Exhibit 3-5, # 35 Exhibit 3-6, # 36 Exhibit 3-7, # 37 Exhibit 3-8, # 38 Exhibit 3-9, # 39 Exhibit 3-10, # 40 Exhibit 3-11, # 41 Exhibit 4-1, # 42 Exhibit 4-2, # 43 Exhibit 4-3, # 44 Exhibit 5-1, # 45 Exhibit 5-2, # 46 Exhibit 5-3, # 47 Exhibit 5-4)(Related document(s) 671 , 668 , 672 , 669 , 670 ) (Kamber, Matthias) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
January 3, 2012 673 Declaration of DANIEL PURCELL in Support of 671 MOTION in Limine No. 4, 668 MOTION in Limine No. 1, 672 MOTION in Limine No. 5, 669 MOTION in Limine No. 2, 670 MOTION in Limine No. 3 filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35, # 36 Exhibit 36, # 37 Exhibit 37, # 38 Exhibit 38, # 39 Exhibit 39, # 40 Exhibit 40)(Related document(s) 671 , 668 , 672 , 669 , 670 ) (Kamber, Matthias) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
January 3, 2012 672 MOTION in Limine No. 5 filed by Google Inc.. Responses due by 1/17/2012. Replies due by 1/24/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Oracle Opposition)(Kamber, Matthias) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
January 3, 2012 671 MOTION in Limine No. 4 filed by Google Inc.. Responses due by 1/17/2012. Replies due by 1/24/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Oracle Opposition)(Kamber, Matthias) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
January 3, 2012 670 MOTION in Limine No. 3 filed by Google Inc.. Responses due by 1/17/2012. Replies due by 1/24/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Oracle Opposition)(Kamber, Matthias) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
January 3, 2012 669 MOTION in Limine No. 2 filed by Google Inc.. Responses due by 1/17/2012. Replies due by 1/24/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Oracle Opposition)(Kamber, Matthias) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
January 3, 2012 668 MOTION in Limine No. 1 filed by Google Inc.. Responses due by 1/17/2012. Replies due by 1/24/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Oracle Opposition)(Kamber, Matthias) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
January 3, 2012 667 MOTION in Limine PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT CONTRARY TO STATEMENTS IN TIM LINDHOLMS AUGUST 6, 2010 EMAIL (UNREDACTED VERSION) filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Responses due by 1/17/2012. Replies due by 1/24/2012. (Attachments: # 1 GOOGLES OPPOSITION TO ORACLES MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT CONTRARY TO STATEMENTS IN TIM LINDHOLMS AUGUST 6, 2010 EMAIL)(Norton, William) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
January 3, 2012 666 Declaration of Daniel P. Muino in Support of 505 Exhibits, 503 Declaration in Support, 504 Exhibits, (UNREDACTED VERSION) Declaration of Daniel P. Muino in Support of Oracle America, Inc.'s Motions in Limine Nos. 1 through 5 filed by Oracle America, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R)(Related document(s) 505 , 503 , 504 ) (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 1/3/2012) Modified on 1/4/2012 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
January 3, 2012 665 Fourth MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument Regarding Oracle's Past Actions with Application Programming Interfaces (UNREDACTED VERSION) filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Responses due by 1/17/2012. Replies due by 1/24/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Google's Opposition to Oracle's Motion in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Evidence or Argument Regarding Oracle's Past Actions with Application Programming Interfaces)(Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
January 3, 2012 664 Third MOTION in Limine to Preclude Google From Offering Evidence or Argument that Third-Party OEMs Changed Infringing Components of Android (UNREDACTED VERSION) filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Responses due by 1/17/2012. Replies due by 1/24/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Google's Opposition to Oracle's Motion in Limine No. 3 to Preclude Google From Offering Evidence or Argument that Third-Party OEMs Changed Infringing Components of Android)(Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
January 3, 2012 663 Second MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument that Google Relied on Legal Advice in Making its Decisions to Develop and Release Android filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Responses due by 1/17/2012. Replies due by 1/24/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Google's Opposition to Oracle's Motion in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Evidence or Argument that Google Relied on Legal Advice in Making its Decisions to Develop and Release Android)(Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
January 3, 2012 662 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/21/11, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sahar Bartlett, CSR, RPR, Telephone number (415) 626-6060/sahar_bartlett@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/2/2012. (Bartlett, Sahar) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
December 30, 2011 661 Statement re 641 Order Joint Statement Regarding Supplemental Order Regarding Patenting Marking by Google Inc., Oracle America, Inc.. (Peters, Marc) (Filed on 12/30/2011)
December 28, 2011 660 Letter from Robert Van Nest to the Court in opposition to Oracle's Motion in Limine No. 1. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Case Attachment)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 12/28/2011)
December 27, 2011 659 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTIONS TO SEAL re 542 Response ( Non Motion ), filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc., 533 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portion of Trial Brief filed by Google Inc., 556 Notice (Other) filed by Google Inc., 507 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Oracle America, Inc., 540 Order,, 648 Declaration in Support, filed by Google Inc., 569 Notice (Other) filed by Oracle America, Inc., 537 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Oracle's Trial Brief filed by Oracle America, Inc., 532 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Oracle's Trial Brief and Exhibits B, C, D and E to Declaration of Marc David Peters in Support of Oracle's Trial Brief filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 27, 2011. (whalc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2011)
December 27, 2011 658 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DR. KEARL'S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 27, 2011. (whalc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2011)
December 27, 2011 657 Featured Case ORDER REQUESTING FURTHER BRIEFING re 642 Order,. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 27, 2011. (whalc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2011)
December 27, 2011 656 Letter Michael Jacob's letter to the Court in support of Oracle's Motion in Limine No. 1. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 12/27/2011)
December 23, 2011 655 Statement Joint Update on Re-Examination of 476 Patent by Oracle America, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 12/23/2011)
December 21, 2011 654 Minute Entry: Interim Pretrial Conference (Date Filed: 12/21/2011). (Court Reporter Sahar Bartlett.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/21/2011)
December 20, 2011 653 Statement re 641 Order Joint Statement Regarding Supplemental Order Regarding Patenting Marking by Oracle America, Inc.. (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 12/20/2011)
December 20, 2011 652 RESPONSE to re 642 Order, PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO TENTATIVE ORDER ON GOOGLES MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF COCKBURN REPORT ON DAMAGES by Oracle America, Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 12/20/2011)
December 20, 2011 651 Response re 642 Order, GOOGLE'S RESPONSE TO THE COURT'S DECEMBER 6, 2011 TENTATIVE ORDER STRIKING PORTIONS OF DR. COCKBURN'S REVISED DAMAGES REPORT byGoogle Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 12/20/2011)
December 20, 2011 650 NOTICE REGARDING JUROR HARDSHIP QUESTIONNAIRE. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 20, 2011. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Hardship Questionnaire)(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2011)
December 19, 2011 649 Pretrial Conference Statement by Oracle America, Inc. Second Supplemental Joint Pretrial Conference Statement. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 12/19/2011)
December 15, 2011 648 Declaration of Reid Mullen in Support of 507 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, 510 Declaration in Support (Revised) filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 507 , 510 ) (Mullen, Reid) (Filed on 12/15/2011)
December 9, 2011 647 OBJECTIONS to Oracle's Proposed Constructions by Google Inc.. (Anderson, Christa) (Filed on 12/9/2011)
December 9, 2011 646 Declaration of Marc David Peters in Support of 645 Objection to Google's Proposed Claim Constructions filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) 645 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 12/9/2011)
December 9, 2011 645 OBJECTIONS to re 637 Claim Construction Statement Oracle's Objections to Google's Proposed Claim Constructions by Oracle America, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 12/9/2011)
December 7, 2011 644 Pretrial Conference Statement by Oracle America, Inc. and Google Inc. (Supplemental). (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 12/7/2011)
December 7, 2011 643 Featured Case ORDER CLARIFYING TENTATIVE RULING re 642 Order,. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 7, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2011)
December 6, 2011 642 Featured Case TENTATIVE ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART GOOGLE'S MOTION IN LIMINE #3 TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF DR. COCKBURN'S REVISED DAMAGES REPORT re 494 MOTION in Limine No. 3 filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 6, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2011)
December 6, 2011 641 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER REGARDING PATENTING MARKING re 638 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Oracle America, Inc., 640 Statement filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 6, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2011)
December 5, 2011 640 Statement re 639 Order regarding Patent Marking by Google Inc.. (Francis, Mark) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
December 5, 2011 639 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER REGARDING PATENT MARKING re 638 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Oracle America, Inc., 636 Order. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 5, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
December 2, 2011 638 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Oracle America, Inc. Oracle letter in response to Order Regarding Patent Marking (ECF No. 636). (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 12/2/2011)
December 2, 2011 637 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT Joint Identification Of Additional Claim Terms For Construction filed by Google Inc.. (Paige, Eugene) (Filed on 12/2/2011)
December 1, 2011 636 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING PATENT MARKING re 635 Statement filed by Google Inc., 634 Statement filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 1, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
November 30, 2011 635 Statement re 621 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 11/30/2011)
November 30, 2011 634 Statement re 621 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Oracle letter regarding Oracle products practicing patents by Oracle America, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 11/30/2011)
November 30, 2011 633 Statement re 631 Order, Joint Proposed Color-Coded Handout by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 11/30/2011)
November 28, 2011 632 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORTS OF GREGORY K. LEONARD AND ALANA J. COXgranting in part and denying in part 585 Motion to Strike 558 MOTION to Strike ORACLE AMERICA INC.S MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORTS OF GREGORY K. LEONARD AND ALAN J. COX - REDACTED (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
November 22, 2011 631 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO SUBMIT COLOR-CODED HANDOUT OF CLAIMS TO BE TRIED re 630 Letter filed by Oracle America, Inc., 626 Letter filed by Google Inc., 587 Order. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 22, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2011)
November 21, 2011 630 Letter from Michael A. Jacobs re: Color-Coded Handout. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 11/21/2011)
November 21, 2011 629 Featured Case ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL JOINT STATEMENT TWO WEEKS BEFORE FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 21, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2011)
November 18, 2011 628 RESPONSE to re 564 Order re: Proposed Trial Plan by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 11/18/2011)
November 18, 2011 627 RESPONSE to re 564 Order Oracle America Inc.'s Critique of the Court's Proposed Trial Plan by Oracle America, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 11/18/2011)
November 18, 2011 626 Letter from Robert A. Van Nest re: Color-Coded Handout. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 11/18/2011)
November 18, 2011 625 Statement re 587 Order Joint Proposed Color-Coded Handout by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 11/18/2011)
November 18, 2011 624 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME FOR BRAY AND RIZZO DEPOSITIONS re 623 Stipulation filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 18, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2011)
November 17, 2011 623 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEPOSITIONS OF TIMOTHY BRAY AND JOHN RIZZO by Google Inc.. (Purcell, Daniel) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 15, 2011 622 Featured Case ORDER STRIKING IMPROPER REPLY EXPERT REPORTS by Judge Alsup granting 554 Motion to Strike (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
November 15, 2011 621 Featured Case ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT LIMITING DAMAGES BASED ON PATENT-MARKING STATUTE by Judge Alsup denying 552 Motion for Summary Judgment (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
November 14, 2011 620 Featured Case ORDER DENYING LEAVE TO FILE MOTION REGARDING COPYRIGHTABILITY re 601 Letter filed by Google Inc., 611 Response ( Non Motion ) filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 14, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2011)
November 14, 2011 617 Featured Case ORDER COMPELLING DEPOSITIONS AND PRODUCTION OF MATERIALS re 614 Letter filed by Oracle America, Inc., 615 Response ( Non Motion ) filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 14, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2011)
November 14, 2011 616 Featured Case ORDER SETTING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 14, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2011)
November 13, 2011 615 RESPONSE to re 614 Letter in Opposition to Oracle's Letter re 5 Depositions by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 11/13/2011)
November 11, 2011 614 Letter from Steven C. Holtzman re 5 depositions. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 11/11/2011)
November 10, 2011 619 Featured Case ORDER of USCA for the Federal Circuit: Oracle America, Inc. is directed to respond no later than November 28, 2011. Misc. No. 106. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2011)
November 10, 2011 618 USCA for the Federal Circuit Case Number: Misc. No. 106, U.S. Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit. Petition for writ of mandamus. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2011)
November 9, 2011 613 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 609 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal EXHIBITS A & B TO THE DECLARATION OF FRED NORTON IN SUPPORT OF ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S REPLY TO GOOGLE INC.S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORTS OF GREGORY K. LEONARD AND ALAN J. COX by Oracle America, Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
November 9, 2011 612 REPLY (re 558 MOTION to Strike ORACLE AMERICA INC.S MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORTS OF GREGORY K. LEONARD AND ALAN J. COX - REDACTED ) ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S REPLY TO GOOGLE INC.S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORTS OF GREGORY K. LEONARD AND ALAN J. COX filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT C TO THE DECLARATION OF FRED NORTON IN SUPPORT OF ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S REPLY TO GOOGLE INC.S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORTS OF GREGORY K. LEONARD AND ALAN J. COX)(Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
November 9, 2011 611 RESPONSE to re 601 Letter in Opposition to Google's Further Precis re Copyrightability by Oracle America, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
November 9, 2011 610 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION REGARDING RULE 706 EXPERT. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 9, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
November 8, 2011 609 Featured Case ORDER PARTIALLY GRANTING AND PARTIALLY DENYING REQUEST TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL, Order by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 592 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2011)
November 8, 2011 608 Declaration of David Zimmer in Support of 592 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF ITS REPLY TO GOOGLE INC.S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORTS OF GREGORY K. LEONARD AND ALAN J. COX filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 592 ) (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 11/8/2011)
November 8, 2011 607 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 602 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits D, E, F, G, and J to the Declaration of David Zimmer in Support of Google Inc.'s Opposition to Oracle America, Inc.'s Motion to Exclude Portions of the Expert Reports of Gregory K. Leonard and Alan J. Cox (Dkt. No. 581) by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 11/8/2011)
November 8, 2011 606 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 602 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Google's Opposition to Motion to Exclude Portions of the Expert Reports of Gregory K. Leonard and Alan J. Cox (Unredacted) by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 11/8/2011)
November 8, 2011 605 EXHIBITS re 581 Opposition/Response to Motion,, Exhibit K to Declaration of David Zimmer In Support Of Google's Opposition to Oracle's Motion to Strike Expert Reports of Gregory K. Leonard and Alan J. Cox filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 581 ) (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 11/8/2011)
November 8, 2011 604 RESPONSE (re 558 MOTION to Strike ORACLE AMERICA INC.S MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORTS OF GREGORY K. LEONARD AND ALAN J. COX - REDACTED ) (modified per 11/7/2011 Order (Dkt. 602)) filed byGoogle Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 11/8/2011)
November 8, 2011 603 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING CONSTRUCTION OF CLAIMS TO BE TRIED. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 8, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2011)
November 7, 2011 602 Featured Case ORDER PARTIALLY GRANTING AND PARTIALLY DENYING MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL, Order by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 580 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2011)
November 4, 2011 601 Letter from Robert A. Van Nest Further Precis Re Copyrightability. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 11/4/2011)
November 3, 2011 600 Declaration of Reid Mullen in Support of 571 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF ORACLES RESPONSIVE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO GOOGLES MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF COCKBURN REPORT filed byGoogle Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order SEALING EXHIBITS J AND M)(Related document(s) 571 ) (Mullen, Reid) (Filed on 11/3/2011) Modified on 11/4/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
November 3, 2011 599 Declaration in Support of 580 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DECLARATION OF MATTHEW SARBORARIA IN SUPPORT OF GOOGLE, INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL (DKT. NO. 580) filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING GOOGLE, INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL (DKT. NO. 580))(Related document(s) 580 ) (Dearborn, Meredith) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 598 NOTICE by Motorola Mobility, Inc. Of Withdrawal of Lawrence Riff as Counsel for Third-Party Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Bonneville, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 2, 2011 597 Minute Entry: Further settlement discussions held. Case did not settle. Further discussions to be scheduled in consultation with parties. (Date Filed: 11/2/2011). (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/2/2011)
November 2, 2011 596 Featured Case ORDER DENYING MOTION TO RETAIN CONFIDENTIALITY DESIGNATIONS AND VACATING HEARING by Judge Alsup denying 513 Motion to Retain Confidentiality Designations (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2011)
November 1, 2011 595 Declaration in Support of 593 Reply to Opposition/Response, DECLARATION OF STEVEN M. SHUGAN IN SUPPORT OF ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S REPLY TO GOOGLE INC.S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORTS OF GREGORY K. LEONARD AND ALAN J. COX filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Related document(s) 593 ) (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 11/1/2011)
November 1, 2011 594 Declaration of FRED NORTON in Support of 593 Reply to Opposition/Response, DECLARATION OF FRED NORTON IN SUPPORT OF ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S REPLY TO GOOGLE INC.S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORTS OF GREGORY K. LEONARD AND ALAN J. COX filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EXHIBITS A-D (EXS. A-C UNDER SEAL))(Related document(s) 593 ) (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 11/1/2011)
November 1, 2011 593 REPLY (re 558 MOTION to Strike ORACLE AMERICA INC.S MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORTS OF GREGORY K. LEONARD AND ALAN J. COX - REDACTED ) ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S REPLY TO GOOGLE INC.S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORTS OF GREGORY K. LEONARD AND ALAN J. COX (REDACTED) filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 11/1/2011)
November 1, 2011 592 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF ITS REPLY TO GOOGLE INC.S 593 OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORTS OF GREGORY K. LEONARD AND ALAN J. COX filed by Oracle America, Inc. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 11/1/2011) Modified on 11/2/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
November 1, 2011 591 REPLY (re 552 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) that Google is not Liable for Damages for Alleged Patent Infringement that Occurred before July 20, 2010) filed by Google Inc. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 11/1/2011) Modified on 11/2/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
November 1, 2011 590 REPLY (re 513 MOTION to Retain Confidentiality Designations ) filed byGoogle Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 11/1/2011)
November 1, 2011 589 REPLY (re 554 MOTION to Strike DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE TWO "REBUTTAL" DAMAGES REPORTS BY DR. KENNETH SERWIN ) filed byGoogle Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 11/1/2011)
November 1, 2011 588 Joint Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Oracle America, Inc. and Google Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 11/1/2011)
November 1, 2011 587 Featured Case ORDER TO SUBMIT COLOR-CODED HANDOUT OF CLAIMS TO BE TRIED. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 1, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2011)
October 31, 2011 586 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 583 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal EXHIBITS 1 & 2 TO THE DECLARATION OF MEREDITH DEARBORN IN SUPPORT OF ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORTS OF GREGORY K. LEONARD AND ALAN J. COX 559 by Oracle America, Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 10/31/2011)
October 31, 2011 585 MOTION to Strike 583 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ORACLE AMERICA INC.S MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORTS OF GREGORY K. LEONARD AND ALAN J. COX filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Responses due by 10/28/2011. Replies due by 11/1/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EXHIBITS 4-9 TO THE DECLARATION OF MEREDITH DEARBORN 559 )(Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 10/31/2011)
October 31, 2011 584 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING REQUESTS TO FILE MOTIONS re 562 Letter filed by Google Inc., 567 Letter filed by Oracle America, Inc., 566 Letter filed by Oracle America, Inc., 582 Letter filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 31, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2011)
October 30, 2011 583 Featured Case ORDER PARTIALLY GRANTING AND PARTIALLY DENYING MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL, Order by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 557 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2011)
October 30, 2011 582 Letter from Robert A. Van Nest in response to Oracle's precis re originality. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 10/30/2011)
October 28, 2011 581 RESPONSE (re 558 MOTION to Strike ORACLE AMERICA INC.S MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORTS OF GREGORY K. LEONARD AND ALAN J. COX - REDACTED ) filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in Support of Google's Opposition to Motion to Exclude Portions of the Expert Reports of Gregory K. Leonard and Alan J. Cox, # 2 Declaration of David Zimmer in Support of Google's Opposition to Motion to Exclude Portions of the Expert Reports of Gregory K. Leonard and Alan J. Cox, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 10/28/2011)
October 28, 2011 580 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Reid Mullen in Support of Google's Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order to Seal Portion of Google's Opposition to Motion to Exclude Portions of the Expert Reports of Gregory K. Leonard and Alan J. Cox and Exhibits to Declaration of David Zimmer in Support of Google's Opposition)(Purcell, Daniel) (Filed on 10/28/2011)
October 28, 2011 579 Declaration in Support of 578 Opposition/Response to Motion, DECLARATION OF BEKO RICHARDSON IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION OF ORACLE AMERICA, INC. TO GOOGLE INC.S MOTION TO STRIKE TWO REBUTTAL DAMAGES REPORTS BY DR. KENNETH SERWIN filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1)(Related document(s) 578 ) (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 10/28/2011)
October 28, 2011 578 RESPONSE (re 554 MOTION to Strike DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE TWO "REBUTTAL" DAMAGES REPORTS BY DR. KENNETH SERWIN ) filed by Oracle America, Inc. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 10/28/2011) Modified on 10/31/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
October 28, 2011 577 RESPONSE (re 552 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) that Google is not Liable for Damages for Alleged Patent Infringement that Occurred before July 20, 2010) filed by Oracle America, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Marc Peters, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 10/28/2011) Modified on 10/31/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
October 28, 2011 576 Declaration of Reid Mullen in Support of 557 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF ORACLES MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORTS OF GREGORY K. LEONARD AND ALAN J. COX filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 557 ) (Mullen, Reid) (Filed on 10/28/2011)
October 28, 2011 575 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME FOR RULE 706 EXPERT TO FILE REPORT re 574 Letter filed by John Lee Cooper. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 28, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2011)
October 28, 2011 574 Letter from John Cooper on behalf of Dr. James Kearl dated October 28, 2011. (Cooper, John) (Filed on 10/28/2011)
October 28, 2011 573 DECLARATION of MEREDITH DEARBORN in Opposition to 572 Opposition/Response to Motion, DECLARATION OF MEREDITH DEARBORN IN SUPPORT OF ORACLE AMERICA INC.S RESPONSIVE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO GOOGLES MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF COCKBURN REPORT ON DAMAGES filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EXHIBITS A-M)(Related document(s) 572 ) (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 10/28/2011)
October 27, 2011 572 RESPONSE (re 494 MOTION in Limine No. 3 ) ORACLE AMERICA INC.S RESPONSIVE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO GOOGLES MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF COCKBURN REPORT ON DAMAGES (REDACTED) filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 10/27/2011)
October 27, 2011 571 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF ORACLES RESPONSIVE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO GOOGLES MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF COCKBURN REPORT ON DAMAGES filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 10/27/2011)
October 27, 2011 570 Declaration in Support of 548 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DECLARATION OF MATTHEW SARBORARIA IN SUPPORT OF GOOGLE, INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 548 ) (Dearborn, Meredith) (Filed on 10/27/2011)
October 27, 2011 569 NOTICE by Oracle America, Inc. re 533 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portion of Trial Brief (Peters, Marc) (Filed on 10/27/2011)
October 27, 2011 568 TRIAL BRIEF Oracle's Trial Brief UNREDACTED VERSION by Oracle America, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 10/27/2011)
October 27, 2011 567 Letter from Michael A. Jacobs Oracle Precis regarding MSJ Of Originality Of Selection And Arrangement. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 10/27/2011)
October 27, 2011 566 Letter from Michael A. Jacobs Oracle Opposition To Google Precis Re Copyright. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 10/27/2011)
October 26, 2011 565 NOTICE by Google Inc. re 561 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice, Truman H. Fenton (Sabnis, Cheryl) (Filed on 10/26/2011)
October 26, 2011 564 PROPOSED TRIAL PLAN. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 26, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2011)
October 25, 2011 563 RESPONSE (re 513 MOTION to Retain Confidentiality Designations ) filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Alanna C. Rutherford In Support Of Oracle's Opposition to Google's Mortion to Retain Confidential Designations)(Rutherford, Alanna) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
October 25, 2011 562 Letter from Robert A. Van Nest Precis re Copyrightability. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
October 24, 2011 561 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY FENTON PRO HAC VICE by Judge Alsup finding as moot 547 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting 551 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2011)
October 21, 2011 560 Declaration of STEVEN M. SHUGAN in Support of 558 MOTION to Strike ORACLE AMERICA INC.S MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORTS OF GREGORY K. LEONARD AND ALAN J. COX - REDACTED filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Related document(s) 558 ) (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 10/21/2011)
October 21, 2011 559 Declaration in Support of 558 MOTION to Strike ORACLE AMERICA INC.S MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORTS OF GREGORY K. LEONARD AND ALAN J. COX - REDACTED DECLARATION OF MEREDITH DEARBORN IN SUPPORT OF ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORTS OF GREGORY K. LEONARD AND ALAN J. COX filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EXHIBITS 1-9)(Related document(s) 558 ) (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 10/21/2011)
October 21, 2011 558 MOTION to Strike ORACLE AMERICA INC.S MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORTS OF GREGORY K. LEONARD AND ALAN J. COX - REDACTED filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Responses due by 10/28/2011. Replies due by 11/1/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 10/21/2011)
October 21, 2011 557 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF ORACLES MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORTS OF GREGORY K. LEONARD AND ALAN J. COX filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 10/21/2011)
October 21, 2011 556 NOTICE by Google Inc. Re: Oracle America, Inc.'s Administrative Motions to File Under Seal (Dkt. Nos. 532 and 537) (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 10/21/2011)
October 21, 2011 555 Declaration of DANIEL PURCELL in Support of 554 MOTION to Strike DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE TWO "REBUTTAL" DAMAGES REPORTS BY DR. KENNETH SERWIN filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 554 ) (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 10/21/2011)
October 21, 2011 554 MOTION to Strike DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE TWO "REBUTTAL" DAMAGES REPORTS BY DR. KENNETH SERWIN filed by Google Inc.. Responses due by 10/28/2011. Replies due by 11/1/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 10/21/2011)
October 21, 2011 552 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) that Google is not Liable for Damages for Alleged Patent Infringement that Occurred before July 20, 2010 filed by Google Inc.. Responses due by 11/4/2011. Replies due by 11/14/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert Van Nest, # 2 Exhibit A to Van Nest Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Van Nest Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Van Nest Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D to Van Nest Declaration, # 6 Exhibit E to Van Nest Declaration, # 7 Proposed Order)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 10/21/2011)
October 21, 2011 551 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Truman H. Fenton ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611066044.) filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sabnis, Cheryl) (Filed on 10/21/2011)
October 20, 2011 550 Declaration of Daniel Purcell in Support of 549 Brief filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex to DPurcell Decl ISO of Suppl Brief, # 2 Exhibit Ex to DPurcell Decl ISO of Suppl Brief, # 3 Exhibit Ex to DPurcell Decl ISO of Suppl Brief, # 4 Exhibit Ex to DPurcell Decl ISO of Suppl Brief, # 5 Exhibit Ex to DPurcell Decl ISO of Suppl Brief)(Related document(s) 549 ) (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 10/20/2011)
October 20, 2011 549 Brief re 494 MOTION in Limine No. 3 [SUPPLEMENTAL] filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 494 ) (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 10/20/2011)
October 20, 2011 548 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Purcell, Daniel) (Filed on 10/20/2011)
October 20, 2011 547 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Truman H. Fenton ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611066044) filed by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2011)
October 20, 2011 546 Featured Case ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE, Order by Hon. William Alsup denying 441 Motion for Relief from Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2011)
October 19, 2011 553 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 10/19/2011 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 10/19/2011), Motion Hearing held on 10/19/2011 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 10/19/2011) re 441 MOTION For Relief From Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge filed by Google Inc.. (Court Reporter Sahar Bartlett.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/19/2011)
October 19, 2011 545 Featured Case ORDER VACATING DATES FOR FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 19, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2011)
October 18, 2011 544 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Oracle Statement For 10-19-2011 Case Management Conference filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 10/18/2011)
October 18, 2011 543 Exhibit List Joint Submission of Exhibit List and Parties' Objections by Google Inc., Oracle America, Inc... (Peters, Marc) (Filed on 10/18/2011)
October 17, 2011 542 RESPONSE to the 507 Joint Administrative Request to File Documents Under Seal (Docket No. 507) - Declaration of Thomas G. Pasternak by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bonneville, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/17/2011) Modified on 10/18/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2011 541 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Brenda Bonneville of Third-Party Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Bonneville, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/17/2011)
October 16, 2011 540 NOTICE REGARDING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL re 533 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portion of Trial Brief filed by Google Inc., 507 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Oracle America, Inc., 537 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Oracle's Trial Brief filed by Oracle America, Inc., 532 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Oracle's Trial Brief and Exhibits B, C, D and E to Declaration of Marc David Peters in Support of Oracle's Trial Brief filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 16, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2011)
October 15, 2011 539 Proposed Jury Instructions by Oracle America, Inc. Parties' Joint Proposed Jury Instructions. (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 10/15/2011)
October 15, 2011 538 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM Oracle America, Inc.'s Memorandum of Law in Support of Disputed Jury Instructions by Oracle America, Inc.. (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 10/15/2011)
October 15, 2011 537 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Oracle's Trial Brief filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 10/15/2011)
October 14, 2011 536 TRIAL BRIEF (REDACTED) by Oracle America, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
October 14, 2011 535 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM Defendant Google Inc.'s Memorandum In Support of Its Disputed Jury Instructions by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
October 14, 2011 534 TRIAL BRIEF [PUBLIC VERSION] by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
October 14, 2011 533 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portion of Trial Brief filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel Purcell, # 2 Proposed Order)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
October 14, 2011 532 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Oracle's Trial Brief and Exhibits B, C, D and E to Declaration of Marc David Peters in Support of Oracle's Trial Brief filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
October 14, 2011 531 Proposed Form of Verdict by Oracle America, Inc. Joint Submission of Proposed Special Verdict Forms. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A (Oracle's Special Verdict Forms-Liability & Damages), # 2 Appendix B (Google's Special Verdict Forms-Liability & Damages))(Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
October 14, 2011 530 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE MOTION TO STRIKE "REBUTTAL" REPORTS re 522 Letter filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 14, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
October 14, 2011 529 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE MOTION REGARDING PATENT MARKING re 521 Letter filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 14, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
October 14, 2011 528 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DAUBERT MOTION re 511 Letter filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 14, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
October 14, 2011 527 Letter from Fred Norton Precis re Rebuttal Reports. (Norton, William) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
October 14, 2011 526 Letter from Michael A. Jacobs Oracle's Opposition to Google's Renewed Precis re Marking. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
October 13, 2011 525 Proposed Pretrial Order CORRECTED Joint Proposed Pretrial Order by Oracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A (Joint Trial Exhibit List), # 2 Appendix B (Oracle Witness List), # 3 Appendix C (Google Witness List))(Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 10/13/2011)
October 12, 2011 524 Letter from Steven C. Holtzman re Precis. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
October 12, 2011 523 Proposed Pretrial Order Joint Proposed Pretrial Order by Oracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A (Joint Trial Exhibit List), # 2 Appendix B (Oracle Witness List), # 3 Appendix C (Google Witness List))(Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
October 12, 2011 522 Letter from Robert A. Van Nest Precis re Rebuttal Reports. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
October 12, 2011 521 Letter from Robert A. Van Nest Renewed Precis re Marking. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
October 12, 2011 520 Proposed Voir Dire by Oracle America, Inc. Joint Submission of Proposed Voir Dire Questions. (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
October 12, 2011 519 Letter from Robert Van Nest PRECIS OPPOSING REQUEST TO FILE DAUBERT MOTIONS. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
October 12, 2011 518 Featured Case ORDER CONTINUING MOTION HEARING AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 12, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
October 12, 2011 517 Featured Case ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED REQUEST FOR SECOND EXTENSION OF TIME FOR PRETRIAL FILINGS re 516 Stipulation filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 12, 2011. There will be no more extensions. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
October 12, 2011 516 STIPULATION STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE JURY INSTRUCTIONS, VERDICT FORMS, AND TRIAL BRIEFS by Oracle America, Inc. (Norton, William) (Filed on 10/12/2011). CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 515 . Modified on 10/12/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
October 11, 2011 515 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 516 *** STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE JURY INSTRUCTIONS, VERDICT FORMS, AND TRIAL BRIEFS by Oracle America, Inc.. (Norton, William) (Filed on 10/11/2011) Modified on 10/12/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
October 11, 2011 514 Declaration of Mark Francis in Support of 513 MOTION to Retain Confidentiality Designations filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 513 ) (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 10/11/2011)
October 11, 2011 513 MOTION to Retain Confidentiality Designations filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2011 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 10/25/2011. Replies due by 11/1/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 10/11/2011)
October 11, 2011 512 Featured Case ORDER PARTIALLY GRANTING AND PARTIALLY DENYING SECOND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF MITCHELL REPORT AND VACATING HEARING by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part 473 Motion to Strike (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2011)
October 10, 2011 511 Letter from Steven C. Holtzman Precis re Daubert Motions. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 10/10/2011)
October 8, 2011 510 Declaration of REID MULLEN in Support of 507 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 507 ) (Kamber, Matthias) (Filed on 10/8/2011)
October 7, 2011 509 DECLARATION of RUCHIKA AGRAWAL in Opposition to 496 MOTION in Limine No. 5, 494 MOTION in Limine No. 3, 492 MOTION in Limine No. 1, 493 MOTION in Limine NO. 2, 495 MOTION in Limine No. 4 filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-1, # 2 Exhibit 1-2, # 3 Exhibit 1-3, # 4 Exhibit 1-4, # 5 Exhibit 1-5, # 6 Exhibit 1-6, # 7 Exhibit 1-7, # 8 Exhibit 1-8, # 9 Exhibit 1-9, # 10 Exhibit 1-10, # 11 Exhibit 1-11, # 12 Exhibit 1-12, # 13 Exhibit 2-1, # 14 Exhibit 2-2, # 15 Exhibit 2-3, # 16 Exhibit 2-4, # 17 Exhibit 2-5, # 18 Exhibit 2-6, # 19 Exhibit 2-7, # 20 Exhibit 2-8, # 21 Exhibit 2-9, # 22 Exhibit 2-10, # 23 Exhibit 2-11, # 24 Exhibit 2-12, # 25 Exhibit 2-13, # 26 Exhibit 2-14, # 27 Exhibit 2-15, # 28 Exhibit 2-16, # 29 Exhibit 2-17, # 30 Exhibit 3-1, # 31 Exhibit 3-2, # 32 Exhibit 3-3, # 33 Exhibit 3-4, # 34 Exhibit 3-5, # 35 Exhibit 3-6, # 36 Exhibit 3-7, # 37 Exhibit 3-8, # 38 Exhibit 3-9, # 39 Exhibit 3-10, # 40 Exhibit 3-11, # 41 Exhibit 4-1, # 42 Exhibit 4-2, # 43 Exhibit 4-3, # 44 Exhibit 5-1, # 45 Exhibit 5-2, # 46 Exhibit 5-3, # 47 Supplement 5-4)(Related document(s) 496 , 494 , 492 , 493 , 495 ) (Kamber, Matthias) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
October 7, 2011 508 Exhibit List Joint Trial Exhibit LIst by Oracle America, Inc... (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
October 7, 2011 507 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel P. Muino, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Request to File Documents Under Seal, # 3 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Request to File Documents Under Seal, # 4 Proposed Order Granting Motorola's Request to File Documents Under Seal)(Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
October 7, 2011 506 DECLARATION of Reid Mullen in Opposition to 498 First MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument Regarding Patent Reexaminations (MIL No. 1)First MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument Regarding Patent Reexaminations (MIL No. 1), 500 Third MOTION in Limine to Preclude Google from Offering Evidence or Argument That Third-Party OEMs Changed Infringing Components of Android (MIL No. 3)Third MOTION in Limine to Preclude Google from Offering Evidence or Argument That Third-Party OEMs Changed Infringing Components of Android (MIL No. 3), 501 Fourth MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument Regarding Oracle's Past Actions With Application Programming Interfaces (MIL No. 4)Fourth MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument Regarding Oracle's Past Actions With Application Programming Interfaces (MIL No. 4), 502 Fifth MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument Contrary to Statements in Tim Lindholm's August 6, 2010 Email (MIL No. 5)Fifth MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument Contrary to Statements in Tim Lindholm's August 6, 2010 Email (MIL No. 5), 499 Second MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument That Google Relied on Legal Advice in Making Its Decisions to Develop and Release Android (MIL No. 2)Second MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument That Google Relied on Legal Advice in Making Its Decisions to Develop and Release Android (MIL No. 2) (Mullen Declaration in Support of Google's Oppositions to Oracle's MILs 1-5) filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Related document(s) 498 , 500 , 501 , 502 , 499 ) (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
October 7, 2011 505 EXHIBITS re 503 Declaration in Support, (Exhibits L through R) filed by Oracle America, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit M, # 2 Exhibit N, # 3 Exhibit O, # 4 Exhibit P, # 5 Exhibit Q, # 6 Exhibit R)(Related document(s) 503 ) (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 10/7/2011) Modified on 10/11/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
October 7, 2011 504 EXHIBITS re 503 Declaration in Support, (Exhibits G through K) filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit H, # 2 Exhibit I, # 3 Exhibit J, # 4 Exhibit K)(Related document(s) 503 ) (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 10/7/2011) Modified on 10/11/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
October 7, 2011 503 Declaration of Daniel P. Muino in Support of 498 First MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument Regarding Patent Reexaminations (MIL No. 1)First MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument Regarding Patent Reexaminations (MIL No. 1), 500 Third MOTION in Limine to Preclude Google from Offering Evidence or Argument That Third-Party OEMs Changed Infringing Components of Android (MIL No. 3)Third MOTION in Limine to Preclude Google from Offering Evidence or Argument That Third-Party OEMs Changed Infringing Components of Android (MIL No. 3), 501 Fourth MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument Regarding Oracle's Past Actions With Application Programming Interfaces (MIL No. 4)Fourth MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument Regarding Oracle's Past Actions With Application Programming Interfaces (MIL No. 4), 502 Fifth MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument Contrary to Statements in Tim Lindholm's August 6, 2010 Email (MIL No. 5)Fifth MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument Contrary to Statements in Tim Lindholm's August 6, 2010 Email (MIL No. 5), 499 Second MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument That Google Relied on Legal Advice in Making Its Decisions to Develop and Release Android (MIL No. 2)Second MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument That Google Relied on Legal Advice in Making Its Decisions to Develop and Release Android (MIL No. 2) (Exhibits A through F) filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) 498 , 500 , 501 , 502 , 499 ) (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
October 7, 2011 502 Fifth MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument Contrary to Statements in Tim Lindholm's August 6, 2010 Email (MIL No. 5) filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/24/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 10/21/2011. Replies due by 10/28/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Google Opposition)(Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
October 7, 2011 501 Fourth MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument Regarding Oracle's Past Actions With Application Programming Interfaces (MIL No. 4) filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/24/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 10/21/2011. Replies due by 10/28/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Google Opposition)(Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
October 7, 2011 500 Third MOTION in Limine to Preclude Google from Offering Evidence or Argument That Third-Party OEMs Changed Infringing Components of Android (MIL No. 3) filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/24/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 10/21/2011. Replies due by 10/28/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Google Opposition)(Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
October 7, 2011 499 Second MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument That Google Relied on Legal Advice in Making Its Decisions to Develop and Release Android (MIL No. 2) filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/24/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 10/21/2011. Replies due by 10/28/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Google Opposition)(Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
October 7, 2011 498 First MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument Regarding Patent Reexaminations (MIL No. 1) filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/24/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 10/21/2011. Replies due by 10/28/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Google Opposition)(Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
October 7, 2011 497 Declaration of DANIEL PURCELL in Support of 496 MOTION in Limine No. 5, 494 MOTION in Limine No. 3, 492 MOTION in Limine No. 1, 493 MOTION in Limine NO. 2, 495 MOTION in Limine No. 4 filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35, # 36 Exhibit 36, # 37 Exhibit 37, # 38 Exhibit 38, # 39 Exhibit 39, # 40 Exhibit 40)(Related document(s) 496 , 494 , 492 , 493 , 495 ) (Kamber, Matthias) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
October 7, 2011 496 MOTION in Limine No. 5 filed by Google Inc.. Responses due by 10/21/2011. Replies due by 10/28/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Oracle Opposition)(Kamber, Matthias) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
October 7, 2011 495 MOTION in Limine No. 4 filed by Google Inc.. Responses due by 10/21/2011. Replies due by 10/28/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Oracle Opposition)(Kamber, Matthias) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
October 7, 2011 494 MOTION in Limine No. 3 filed by Google Inc.. Responses due by 10/21/2011. Replies due by 10/28/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Oracle Opposition)(Kamber, Matthias) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
October 7, 2011 493 MOTION in Limine NO. 2 filed by Google Inc.. Responses due by 10/21/2011. Replies due by 10/28/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Oracle Opposition)(Kamber, Matthias) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
October 7, 2011 492 MOTION in Limine No. 1 filed by Google Inc.. Responses due by 10/21/2011. Replies due by 10/28/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Oracle Opposition)(Kamber, Matthias) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
October 7, 2011 491 Witness List by Oracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A (Oracle's Witness List), # 2 Appendix B (Google's Witness List))(Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
October 7, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 441 MOTION For Relief From Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge, 473 Second MOTION to Strike Portions of the Mitchell Patent Report. Motion Hearing set for 10/13/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
October 7, 2011 490 CLERKS NOTICE Rescheduling Hearing Time. Motions set for 10/13/2011 2:00 PM. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
October 6, 2011 489 REPLY (re 473 Second MOTION to Strike Portions of the Mitchell Patent Report ) filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Banner Decl, # 2 Exhibit F)(Francis, Mark) (Filed on 10/6/2011)
October 6, 2011 488 Featured Case ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE CERTAIN PRE-TRIAL MATERIALS re 487 Stipulation filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 6, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2011)
October 5, 2011 487 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE CERTAIN PRE-TRIAL MATERIALS by Google Inc.. (Kamber, Matthias) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
October 5, 2011 486 Featured Case ORDER DENYING PRECIS REQUEST re 479 Letter filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 5, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
October 5, 2011 485 Letter from Scott T. Weingaertner in Opposition to Oracle's Precis letter for leave to file a motion for reconsideration or supplement its infringement contentions. (Sabnis, Cheryl) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
October 5, 2011 484 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING ATTENDANCE AT FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 5, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
October 5, 2011 483 NOTICE RE FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 5, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
October 4, 2011 482 RESPONSE (re 473 Second MOTION to Strike Portions of the Mitchell Patent Report ) filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Peters Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 10/4/2011)
October 4, 2011 481 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Oracle's Response to the Court's Order Regarding Reexamination, Stay, and Time for Trial filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 10/4/2011)
October 4, 2011 480 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Google's Response to the Court's Order Regarding Reexamination, Stay, and Time for Trial filed by Google Inc.. (Banner, Brian) (Filed on 10/4/2011)
October 3, 2011 479 Letter from Michael A. Jacobs Oracle Precis Requesting Leave to file Motion for Reconsideration of Order Striking Android Devices. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 10/3/2011)
October 3, 2011 478 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 477 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Oracle America, Inc.. (Norton, William) (Filed on 10/3/2011)
October 3, 2011 477 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO FILE OPPOSITION BRIEF UNDER SEAL, Order by Hon. William Alsup granting 466 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2011)
October 3, 2011 476 Declaration of Daniel Purcell in Support of 466 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 466 ) (Purcell, Daniel) (Filed on 10/3/2011)
October 3, 2011 475 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Google's Response to the Court's Order Requesting Case Management Statements filed by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 10/3/2011)
September 30, 2011 474 Minute Entry: Further Settlement Conference held. Further settlement discussions to be scheduled. (Date Filed: 9/30/2011). (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/30/2011)
September 29, 2011 473 Second MOTION to Strike Portions of the Mitchell Patent Report filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/13/2011 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 10/4/2011. Replies due by 10/6/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Banner Decl., # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sabnis, Cheryl) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
September 29, 2011 472 REPLY (re 441 MOTION For Relief From Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge ) filed byGoogle Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
September 29, 2011 471 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Oracle Case Management Statement Re Selecting Claims for Trial) filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
September 27, 2011 470 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING PRECIS REQUEST TO FILE DAUBERT MOTION CONCERNING SECOND DAMAGES REPORT re 450 Letter filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 27, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
September 26, 2011 469 Letter from Robert Van Nest in Response to Holtzman Letter re Daubert. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 9/26/2011)
September 26, 2011 468 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 459 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 13 to Swoopes Declaration in Support of Oracle's Opposition to Google's Motion for Summary Judgment on Count VIII of Second Amended Complaint by Oracle America, Inc.. (Swoopes, Roman) (Filed on 9/26/2011)
September 26, 2011 467 RESPONSE (re 441 MOTION For Relief From Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge ) PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE [REDACTED] filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Norton, William) (Filed on 9/26/2011)
September 26, 2011 466 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS 441 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE filed by Oracle America, Inc. (Norton, William) (Filed on 9/26/2011) Modified on 9/27/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2011 465 Featured Case ORDER RESCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: 10/1/11 Further Settlement Conference rescheduled for 9/30/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 9/26/2011. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2011)
September 26, 2011 464 Featured Case ORDER PARTIALLY GRANTING AND PARTIALLY DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF MITCHELL REPORT AND VACATING HEARING, Order by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 410 Motion to Strike.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2011)
September 26, 2011 463 Letter from Steven C. Holtzman. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 9/26/2011)
September 26, 2011 462 Featured Case ORDER DENYING PRECIS REQUEST PENDING MEET-AND-CONFER SESSION re 449 Letter filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 26, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2011)
September 26, 2011 461 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING 35 U.S.C. 271(f) THEORY, Order by Hon. William Alsup granting 409 Motion for Summary Judgment.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2011)
September 26, 2011 460 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE RESPONSE UNDER SEAL, Order by Hon. William Alsup granting 427 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2011)
September 26, 2011 459 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO FILE EXHIBIT UNDER SEAL, Order by Hon. William Alsup granting 426 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2011)
September 26, 2011 458 Featured Case ORDER REQUESTING CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTS. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 26, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2011)
September 23, 2011 457 Featured Case ORDER SETTING FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 9/23/2011. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2011)
September 23, 2011 456 Featured Case ORDER REQUESTING SUBMISSION OF REVISED DAMAGES REPORT re 450 Letter filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 23, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2011)
September 22, 2011 455 RESPONSE (re 409 MOTION for Summary Judgment Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication Re: Google's Non-Liability Under 35 U.S.C. § 271(f)) (Statement of Non-Opposition) filed by Oracle America, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kuwayti, Kenneth) (Filed on 9/22/2011) Modified on 9/23/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2011 454 NOTICE of Appearance by Yuka Teraguchi (Teraguchi, Yuka) (Filed on 9/22/2011)
September 22, 2011 453 Letter from Alanna Rutherford Oracle's Response to Google's Letter Precis. (Rutherford, Alanna) (Filed on 9/22/2011)
September 22, 2011 452 Letter from Steven C. Holtzman Oracle's Response to Google's Letter Precis. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 9/22/2011)
September 21, 2011 451 Minute Entry: Further Settlement Conference held. Lead counsel shall contact the courtroom deputy to the undersigned to schedule a call tomorrow regarding when further discussions will take place and whether the further attendance of Mr. Ellison and Mr. Page will be required. (Date Filed: 9/21/2011). (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/21/2011)
September 20, 2011 450 Letter from Robert Van Nest. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 9/20/2011)
September 20, 2011 449 Letter from Robert Van Nest. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 9/20/2011)
September 20, 2011 448 DECLARATION of Luis Villa, IV In Response in Opposition to 426 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re: Dkt. 398-10 filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to File Redacted Materials)(Related document(s) 426 ) (Villa, Luis) (Filed on 9/20/2011)
September 19, 2011 447 REPLY (re 410 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Mitchell Patent Report ) filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Ex. G)(Sabnis, Cheryl) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
September 19, 2011 446 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held. (Date Filed: 9/19/2011). (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/19/2011)
September 19, 2011 445 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9-15-11, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, Telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/19/2011. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
September 19, 2011 444 Proposed Order re 443 Declaration in Support, of Oracle America, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Oracle's Response Precis by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
September 19, 2011 443 Declaration of Daniel Purcell in Support of 427 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF ORACLES RESPONSE PRECIS filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 427 ) (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
September 19, 2011 442 Proposed Order re 441 MOTION For Relief From Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
September 19, 2011 441 MOTION For Relief From Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/13/2011 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 9/26/2011. Replies due by 9/29/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
September 19, 2011 440 CLERK'S NOTICE Retrieval of Submitted Documents. In accordance with Civil L.R. 79-5(e), the submitting party is hereby notified to retrieve lodged documents within three days of this notice: Unredacted version of prcis requesting leave to file excerpts of the Astrachan deposition. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
September 16, 2011 439 Letter from Michael A. Jacobs REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE PORTIONS OF DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT (unredacted pursuant to Order--Dkt. 438). (Swoopes, Roman) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
September 16, 2011 438 Featured Case ORDER DENYING MOTION TO FILE PRECIS UNDER SEAL, Order by Hon. William Alsup denying 419 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
September 16, 2011 437 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST TO EXTEND DISCOVERY CUT-OFF FOR DEPOSITION OF DAVID AUGUST re 432 Stipulation filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 16, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
September 15, 2011 436 DECLARATION of Marc David Peters in Opposition to 435 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Related document(s) 435 ) (Peters, Marc) (Filed on 9/15/2011)
September 15, 2011 435 RESPONSE (re 410 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Mitchell Patent Report ) Oracle Opposition To Motion To Strike Portions of Mitchell Report filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Peters, Marc) (Filed on 9/15/2011)
September 15, 2011 434 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/15/2011 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 9/15/2011) re 260 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count VIII of Plaintiff Oracle America's Amended Complaint filed by Google Inc.. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/15/2011)
September 15, 2011 433 Featured Case ORDER PARTIALLY GRANTING AND PARTIALLY DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON COPYRIGHT CLAIM by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part 260 Motion for Summary Judgment (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2011)
September 15, 2011 432 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND THE NON-DAMAGES EXPERT DISCOVERY CUT-OFF FOR THE DEPOSITION OF DAVID AUGUST by Oracle America, Inc.. (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 9/15/2011)
September 15, 2011 431 DECLARATION of Michael S. Kwun in Opposition to 419 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal RE: REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE PORTIONS OF DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 419 ) (Kwun, Michael) (Filed on 9/15/2011)
September 14, 2011 430 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO FILE RULE 72 MOTION re 418 Letter Brief filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 14, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2011)
September 14, 2011 429 Letter Norton Letter re Lindholm. (Norton, William) (Filed on 9/14/2011)
September 14, 2011 428 EXHIBITS re 398 Exhibits,, 426 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re: Dkt. 398-10 Revised Exhibit 13 to the Declaration of Roman A. Swoopes in Support of Oracle's Opposition to Google's Motion for Summary Judgment on Count VIII of Oracle's Second Amended Complaint filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Related document(s) 398 , 426 ) (Swoopes, Roman) (Filed on 9/14/2011)
September 14, 2011 427 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF ORACLES RESPONSE PRECIS filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Norton, William) (Filed on 9/14/2011)
September 14, 2011 426 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re: Dkt. 398-10 filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Swoopes, Roman) (Filed on 9/14/2011)
September 14, 2011 425 Featured Case ORDER DENYING PRECIS REQUESTS REGARDING SUPPLEMENTAL FILINGS re 420 Letter filed by Oracle America, Inc., 424 Letter filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 14, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2011)
September 13, 2011 424 Letter from Michael S. Kwun in Opposition to Oracle's Request for Leave to File Portions of Deposition Transcript. (Kwun, Michael) (Filed on 9/13/2011)
September 13, 2011 423 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Oracle America, Inc. (Swoopes, Roman) (Filed on 9/13/2011)
September 13, 2011 422 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO USE EQUIPMENT AT SEPTEMBER 15 HEARING, Order by Hon. William Alsup granting 421 Motion to Use Equipment.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2011)
September 13, 2011 421 MOTION Request and [Proposed] Order Regarding Courtroom Equipment for September 15, 2011 Summary Judgment Hearing re 260 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count VIII of Plaintiff Oracle America's Amended Complaint filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/15/2011 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 8/19/2011. Replies due by 8/26/2011. (Swoopes, Roman) (Filed on 9/13/2011)
September 12, 2011 420 Letter from Michael A. Jacobs REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE PORTIONS OF DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT. (Swoopes, Roman) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 12, 2011 419 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal RE: REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE PORTIONS OF DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Swoopes, Roman) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 12, 2011 418 Letter Brief from Robert Van Nest filed byGoogle Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 12, 2011 417 CLERKS NOTICE Rescheduling Hearing. Motion for Summary Judgment set for 9/15/2011 8:00 AM. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 9, 2011 416 Featured Case ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Pre-Conference Tutorial Hearing as to Oracle set for 9/14/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. Pre-Conference Tutorial Hearing as to Google set for 9/14/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. Settlement Conference set for 9/19/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 9/9/2011. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
September 9, 2011 415 Featured Case ***E-FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET 416 *** ORDER RE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on September 9, 2011. (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2011) Modified on 9/9/2011 (ofr, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2011 414 Minute Entry: Telephonic Pre-Settlement conference held. Court to issue scheduling order. (Date Filed: 9/9/2011). (Court Reporter FTR: (10:01 to 10:21.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/9/2011)
September 9, 2011 413 Featured Case ORDER SETTING ASSIGNMENT FOR RULE 706 EXPERT re 407 Proposed Order filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 9, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
September 9, 2011 412 Featured Case ORDER STRIKING UNAUTHORIZED RULE 72 MOTION by Judge Alsup striking 408 Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
September 8, 2011 411 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Google Inc.'s 410 Motion to Strike Portions of the Mitchell Patent Report by Google Inc. (Sabnis, Cheryl) (Filed on 9/8/2011) Modified on 9/9/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2011 410 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Mitchell Patent Report filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/29/2011 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 9/15/2011. Replies due by 9/22/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Sabnis, Cheryl) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
September 8, 2011 409 MOTION for Summary Judgment Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication Re: Google's Non-Liability Under 35 U.S.C. § 271(f) filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/13/2011 08:00 AM before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 9/22/2011. Replies due by 9/29/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Patrick Brady, # 2 Proposed Order)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
September 8, 2011 408 *** STRICKEN PER DKT. NO. 412 . *** MOTION for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge re 361 Order filed by Google Inc.. Responses due by 9/22/2011. Replies due by 9/29/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Proposed Order)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 9/8/2011) Modified on 9/9/2011 (whalc1, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2011 407 Proposed Order re 394 Order [PROPOSED] ORDER RE RULE 706 EXPERTS by Oracle America, Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
September 8, 2011 406 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc David Peters Notice of Appearance by Mark E. Ungerman (Peters, Marc) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
September 8, 2011 405 Featured Case ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 8, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
September 7, 2011 404 RESPONSE to re 386 Order Oracle's Supplemental Comment on Order regarding Mediation by Oracle America, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 9/7/2011)
September 7, 2011 403 NOTICE of Appearance by John L. Cooper Regarding Counsel for Rule 706 Expert (Cooper, John) (Filed on 9/7/2011)
September 7, 2011 402 RESPONSE to re 386 Order Re Mediation by Google Inc.. (Sabnis, Cheryl) (Filed on 9/7/2011)
September 7, 2011 401 RESPONSE to re 386 Order ORACLES COMMENT ON ORDER REGARDING MEDIATION [Dkt. 386] by Oracle America, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 9/7/2011)
September 7, 2011 400 Featured Case ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTIONS TO JURY SELECTION PROCEDURE re 392 Objection filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 7, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2011)
September 6, 2011 399 NOTICE of Appearance by Rudolph Kim for Oracle (Kim, Rudolph) (Filed on 9/6/2011)
September 6, 2011 398 EXHIBITS re 343 Declaration in Opposition,, Unredacted Versions of Exhibits 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 8, 9, 11, 12, and 13 to the Declaration of Roman A. Swoopes in Support of Oracle's Opposition to Google's Motion for Summary Judgment on Count VIII of Oracle's Second Amended Complaint filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 8, # 7 Exhibit 9, # 8 Exhibit 11, # 9 Exhibit 12, # 10 Exhibit 13; Locked by Court - to be re-filed)(Related document(s) 343 ) (Kuwayti, Kenneth) (Filed on 9/6/2011) Modified on 9/12/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
September 6, 2011 397 EXHIBITS re 341 Declaration in Support, Unredacted Versions of Exhibits 1 and 2 to the Declaration of John C. Mitchell in Support of Oracle's Opposition to Google's Motion for Summary Judgment on Count VIII of Oracle's Second Amended Complaint filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 341 ) (Kuwayti, Kenneth) (Filed on 9/6/2011)
September 6, 2011 396 RESPONSE (re 260 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count VIII of Plaintiff Oracle America's Amended Complaint ) UNREDACTED VERSION filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Kuwayti, Kenneth) (Filed on 9/6/2011)
September 6, 2011 395 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 375 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 10, 14, 15, and 16 to the Declaration of Roman Swoopes in Support of Oracle's Opposition to Google's Motion for Summary Judgment on Count VIII of Oracle's Amended Complaint by Oracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 10, # 2 Exhibit 14, # 3 Exhibit 15, # 4 Exhibit 16)(Kuwayti, Kenneth) (Filed on 9/6/2011)
September 6, 2011 394 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING PROPOSED ASSIGNMENT ORDER FOR RULE 706 EXPERT re 393 Proposed Order filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 6, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2011)
September 6, 2011 393 Proposed Order RE RULE 706 EXPERTS by Google Inc.. (Purcell, Daniel) (Filed on 9/6/2011)
September 6, 2011 392 OBJECTIONS to re 376 Order GOOGLE INC'S OBJECTIONS TO ORDER CLARIFYING ORDER REGARDING JURY SELECTION by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 9/6/2011)
September 6, 2011 391 EXHIBITS re 371 Declaration in Support, Exhibit 3 to Reply Declaration of Owen Astrachan in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment on Count VIII of Plaintiff Oracle America's Amended Complaint--Publicly Filed Version--Redacted filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 371 ) (Kwun, Michael) (Filed on 9/6/2011)
September 6, 2011 390 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 388 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 3 to Reply Declaration of Owen Astrachan in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment on Count VIII of Plaintiff Oracle America's Amended Complaint by Google Inc.. (Kwun, Michael) (Filed on 9/6/2011)
September 6, 2011 389 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER RE ASSIGNOR ESTOPPEL re 387 Stipulation filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 6, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2011)
September 6, 2011 388 Featured Case ORDER PARTIALLY GRANTING AND PARTIALLY DENYING MOTION TO FILE REPLY MATERIALS UNDER SEAL, Order by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 372 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2011)
September 2, 2011 387 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Oracle America, Inc.'s First Affirmative Defense-Assignor Estoppel by Google Inc.. (Kamber, Matthias) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
September 2, 2011 386 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 2, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
September 2, 2011 385 Featured Case ORDER SHORTENING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION TO STRIKE re 382 Order. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 2, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
September 2, 2011 384 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING PRETRIAL FILINGS. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 2, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
September 1, 2011 383 Letter Brief requesting oral argument on Google's motion for summary judgment scheduled for September 15, 2011 filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
September 1, 2011 382 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE LIMITED MOTION TO STRIKE re 377 Letter filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 1, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
September 1, 2011 381 Featured Case ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR THREE DEPOSITIONS re 378 Stipulation filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 1, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
September 1, 2011 380 Letter Brief re 377 Letter opposition to Google's request for leave to move to strike portions of the Opening Expert Report of John C. Mitchell filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Related document(s) 377 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
September 1, 2011 379 Declaration in Support of 372 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 3 to the Reply Astrachan Declaration in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment on Count VIII of Plaintiff Oracle America's Amended Complaint Declaration of George P. Simion in Support of Google's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1 (revised redacted version of Exhibit 3 to the Reply Astrachan Declaration), # 2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Google's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal)(Related document(s) 372 ) (Swoopes, Roman) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
September 1, 2011 378 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND THE CUT-OFF FOR THE DEPOSITIONS OF MOTOROLA MOBILITY, INC., DIPCHAND NISHAR, AND THOMTHY LINDHOLM by Oracle America, Inc.. (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
August 30, 2011 377 Letter from Scott T. Weingaertner requesting leave to file motion to strike portions of the Mitchell expert report on patent infringement. (Francis, Mark) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
August 30, 2011 376 Featured Case ORDER CLARIFYING ORDER REGARDING JURY SELECTION re 366 Order. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 30, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
August 30, 2011 375 Featured Case ORDER PARTIALLY GRANTING AND PARTIALLY DENYING MOTION TO FILE OPPOSITION MATERIALS UNDER SEAL, Order by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 340 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
August 30, 2011 374 Featured Case ORDER APPOINTING RULE 706 EXPERT AND COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 30, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
August 29, 2011 373 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc. (Exhibit 3 to 371 Reply Declaration of Owen Astrachan in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment on Count VIII of Plaintiff Oracle America's Amended Complaint [Proposed] Publicly Filed Version--Redacted; and Unredacted Version (Kwun, Michael) (Filed on 8/29/2011) Modified on 8/30/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
August 29, 2011 372 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 3 to the Reply Astrachan Declaration in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment on Count VIII of Plaintiff Oracle America's Amended Complaint filed by Google Inc.. (Kwun, Michael) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
August 29, 2011 371 Declaration of OWEN ASTRACHAN in Support of 368 Reply to Opposition/Response to Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment on Count VIII of Plaintiff Oracle America's Amended Complaint filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 368 ) (Kwun, Michael) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
August 29, 2011 370 Declaration of DANIEL BORNSTEIN in Support of 368 Reply to Opposition/Response to Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment on Count VIII of Plaintiff Oracle America's Amended Complaint filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 368 ) (Kwun, Michael) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
August 29, 2011 369 Declaration of MICHAEL S. KWUN in Support of 368 Reply to Opposition/Response to Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment on Count VIII of Plaintiff Oracle America's Amended Complaint filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EE, # 2 Exhibit FF, # 3 Exhibit GG)(Related document(s) 368 ) (Kwun, Michael) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
August 29, 2011 368 REPLY (re 260 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count VIII of Plaintiff Oracle America's Amended Complaint ) filed byGoogle Inc.. (Kwun, Michael) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
August 29, 2011 367 DECLARATION in Opposition to 360 Order filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Unredacted Exhibit 1 to F. Norton's Second Declaration In Response to Declarations Submitted On Behalf Of Google)(Related document(s) 360 ) (Norton, William) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
August 29, 2011 366 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING JURY SELECTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 29, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
August 29, 2011 365 Featured Case ORDER denying 280 as untimely filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 9/8/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
August 29, 2011 364 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST TO EXTEND DUE DATES FOR EXPERT REBUTTAL AND REPLY REPORTS ON PATENT-RELATED ISSUES re 348 Stipulation filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 29, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
August 26, 2011 363 STATUS REPORT UDPATE RE: RE-EXAMINATION by Google Inc.. (Sabnis, Cheryl) (Filed on 8/26/2011)
August 26, 2011 362 DECLARATION of Luis Villa, IV In Response to Oracle America, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Sealing Defendant Google Inc.'s Confidential Material)(Villa, Luis) (Filed on 8/26/2011)
August 26, 2011 361 Featured Case ORDER re 277 granting Oracle's motion to compel discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/26/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2011)
August 26, 2011 360 Featured Case ORDER re 358 denying Defendant's motion for reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/26/11. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2011)
August 26, 2011 359 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 356 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 4 to Fred Norton's 2nd Declaration in Response to Declarations filed by Google by Oracle America, Inc.. (Norton, William) (Filed on 8/26/2011)
August 26, 2011 358 Declaration of Daniel Purcell in Support of Oracle America, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 1 and 4 and Portions of the Second Declaration of Fred Norton filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Purcell, Daniel) (Filed on 8/26/2011)
August 25, 2011 357 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 278 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(dmrlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2011)
August 25, 2011 356 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part 335 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(dmrlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2011)
August 25, 2011 355 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 297 Motion to Redact 293 Transcript.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2011)
August 25, 2011 354 Featured Case ORDER re 353 Discovery Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/25/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2011)
August 25, 2011 353 Minute Entry: Discovery Motion Hearing HELD on 8/25/2011 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant to produce Tim Lindholm's e-mail and drafts GRANTED. Written Order from the Court to follow. (Court Reporter Sahar Bartlett.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/25/2011)
August 23, 2011 352 Featured Case ORDER re 295 Document E-Filed Under Seal filed by Oracle America, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/23/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2011)
August 23, 2011 351 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Google Inc. Declaration of Eugene M. Paige In Response To August 16, 2011 306 Order To Show Cause. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Paige, Eugene) (Filed on 8/23/2011) Modified on 8/24/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2011 350 Transcript of Proceedings held on 8-19-11, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, Telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/21/2011. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2011)
August 22, 2011 348 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Due Dates for Expert Rebuttal and Reply Reports on Patent-Related Issues by Google Inc.. (Kamber, Matthias) (Filed on 8/22/2011)
August 20, 2011 347 EXHIBITS re 343 Declaration in Opposition, to Google's Motion for Summary Judgment on Count VIII of Oracle's Amended Complaint filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 24, # 2 Exhibit 25, # 3 Exhibit 26, # 4 Exhibit 27)(Related document(s) 343 ) (Kuwayti, Kenneth) (Filed on 8/20/2011)
August 20, 2011 346 EXHIBITS re 343 Declaration in Opposition, to Google's Motion for Summary Judgment on Count VIII of Oracle's Amended Complaint (Exs. 21-22) filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 22)(Related document(s) 343 ) (Kuwayti, Kenneth) (Filed on 8/20/2011)
August 20, 2011 345 EXHIBITS re 343 Declaration in Opposition, to Google's Moiton for Summary Judgment on Count VIII of Oracle's Amended Complaint (Exs. 19-20) filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 20)(Related document(s) 343 ) (Kuwayti, Kenneth) (Filed on 8/20/2011)
August 20, 2011 344 EXHIBITS re 343 Declaration in Opposition, to Google's Motion for Summary Judgment on Count VIII of Oracle's Amended Complaint (Exs. 17-18) filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 18 (part one), # 2 Exhibit 18 (part two))(Related document(s) 343 ) (Kuwayti, Kenneth) (Filed on 8/20/2011)
August 20, 2011 343 DECLARATION of Roman A. Swoopes in Support of 339 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16)(Related document(s) 339 ) (Kuwayti, Kenneth) (Filed on 8/20/2011) Modified on 8/22/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2011 342 Declaration of Alan Purdy in Support of 339 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 339 ) (Peters, Marc) (Filed on 8/20/2011)
August 20, 2011 341 Declaration of John C. Mitchell in Support of 339 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) 339 ) (Peters, Marc) (Filed on 8/20/2011)
August 20, 2011 340 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Swoopes, Roman) (Filed on 8/20/2011)
August 20, 2011 339 RESPONSE (re 260 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count VIII of Plaintiff Oracle America's Amended Complaint ) filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Kuwayti, Kenneth) (Filed on 8/20/2011)
August 19, 2011 349 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing HELD on 8/19/2011 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Plaintiff's request for Non-mobile Data and Projections GRANTED IN PART. (See copy of minutes for more particulars). (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/19/2011)
August 19, 2011 338 OBJECTIONS to re 261 Declaration in Support, 262 Declaration in Support, Oracle's Objections to Google's evidence in support of Google's motion for summary judgment on Count VIII of Oracle's Amended Complaint by Oracle America, Inc.. (Peters, Marc) (Filed on 8/19/2011)
August 19, 2011 337 Declaration of George P. Simion in Support of 277 Letter, 336 Declaration in Support, 335 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 4 to the Second Declaration of Fred Norton, 286 Order filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Related document(s) 277 , 336 , 335 , 286 ) (Norton, William) (Filed on 8/19/2011)
August 19, 2011 336 Declaration of Fred Norton in Support of 277 Letter, 335 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 4 to the Second Declaration of Fred Norton, 286 Order filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-4)(Related document(s) 277 , 335 , 286 ) (Norton, William) (Filed on 8/19/2011)
August 19, 2011 335 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 4 to the 336 Second Declaration of Fred Norton filed by Oracle America, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Simion Declaration In Support Of Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to Seal Exhibit 4, # 2 Proposed Order)(Norton, William) (Filed on 8/19/2011) Modified on 8/22/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2011 334 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 329 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Fred Norton In Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Oracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A through W)(Norton, William) (Filed on 8/19/2011) Modified on 8/19/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2011 332 Declaration of Matt Cutts in Support of 277 Letter, 286 Order Response to Declaration of Fred Norton filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 277 , 286 ) (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 8/19/2011)
August 19, 2011 331 Declaration of Tim Lindholm in Support of 277 Letter, 286 Order Response to Declaration of Fred Norton filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 277 , 286 ) (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 8/19/2011)
August 19, 2011 330 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING CONFERENCE WITH EXPERT CANDIDATES. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 19, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2011)
August 19, 2011 329 Featured Case ORDER granting motion to file under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/19/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2011)CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 324
August 19, 2011 328 Featured Case ORDER PARTIALLY GRANTING AND PARTIALLY DENYING LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON INDIRECT INFRINGEMENT re 312 Letter filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 19, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2011)
August 19, 2011 327 Featured Case ORDER DENYING LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON '104 PATENT re 311 Letter filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 19, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2011)
August 19, 2011 326 Featured Case ORDER DENYING LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PATENT MARKING re 310 Letter filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 19, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2011)
August 19, 2011 325 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ASSIGNOR ESTOPPEL re 309 Letter filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 19, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2011)
August 19, 2011 324 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 329 *** Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 304 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2011) Modified on 8/19/2011 (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2011 323 Letter Brief re 312 Letter, 321 Letter Brief, Letter in response to Google's request for leave to file motion for summary judgment of noninfringement under 35 U.S.C. seciton 271(c) and (f) filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Related document(s) 312 , 321 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/18/2011)
August 18, 2011 322 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION re 321 Letter Brief, filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 18, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2011)
August 18, 2011 321 Letter Brief re 312 Letter in response to Google's request for leave to file motion for summary judgment of noninfringement under 35 U.S.C. section 271(c) and (f) filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Related document(s) 312 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/18/2011)
August 18, 2011 320 Letter from Michael A. Jacobs in Response to Google's request for leave to file motion for summary judgment on affirmative defense of assignor estoppel. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/18/2011)
August 18, 2011 319 Letter from Michael A. Jacobs in Opposition to Google's Request for leave to file motion for summary judgment on limitation of damages due to failure to mark. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/18/2011)
August 18, 2011 318 Letter from Michael A. Jacobs in Opposition to Google's Request for leave to file motion for summary judgment of 104 patent invalidity due to improper broadening reissue. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 8/18/2011)
August 17, 2011 317 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Google Inc.. Amendment to 300 Declaration in Support. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 8/17/2011)
August 17, 2011 316 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Google Inc.. Amendment to 299 Declaration in Support. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 8/17/2011)
August 17, 2011 315 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Google Inc.. Amendment to 301 Declaration in Support. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 8/17/2011)
August 17, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 260 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count VIII of Plaintiff Oracle America's Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 9/15/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2011)
August 17, 2011 314 Featured Case ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion. Motion Hearing set for 8/19/2011 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/17/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2011)
August 17, 2011 313 RESPONSE to re 308 Objection ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S REPLY TO GOOGLE INC.S OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF FRED NORTON IN SUPPORT OF ORACLES MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, REQUEST TO RESPOND TO LEGAL ARGUMENT by Oracle America, Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 8/17/2011)
August 16, 2011 312 Letter from Robert A. Van Nest requesting leave to file motion for summary judgment of noninfringement under 35 U.S.C. section 271(c) and (f). (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 8/16/2011)
August 16, 2011 311 Letter from Robert A. Van Nest requesting leave to file motion for summary judgment of invalidity due to improper broadening reissue. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 8/16/2011)
August 16, 2011 310 Letter from Robert A. Van Nest requesting leave to file motion for summary judgment on limitation of damages due to failure to mark. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 8/16/2011)
August 16, 2011 309 Letter from Robert A. Van Nest requesting leave to file motion for summary judgment on affirmative defense of assignor estoppel. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 8/16/2011)
August 16, 2011 308 OBJECTIONS to re 305 Declaration in Support, by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 8/16/2011)
August 16, 2011 307 Featured Case ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 277 . Motion Hearing set for 8/25/2011 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/16/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2011)
August 16, 2011 306 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why 278 was untimely filed. Show Cause Response due by 8/23/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/16/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2011) Modified on 8/17/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2011 305 Declaration of Fred Norton in Support of 277 Letter, 286 Order Requesting Supplemental Information filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through W)(Related document(s) 277 , 286 ) (Norton, William) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
August 15, 2011 304 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the Declaration of Fred Norton In Support of Oracle America, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Production of Documents filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Norton, William) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
August 15, 2011 303 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Andrew Petersen (Petersen, Benjamin) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
August 15, 2011 302 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Alexander Kuwayti (Kuwayti, Kenneth) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
August 15, 2011 301 Declaration of Benjamin Lee in Support of 277 Letter, 286 Order Requesting Supplemental Information filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 277 , 286 ) (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
August 15, 2011 300 Declaration of Kristin Zmrhal in Support of 277 Letter, 286 Order Requesting Supplemental Information filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 277 , 286 ) (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
August 15, 2011 299 Declaration of Tim Lindholm in Support of 277 Letter, 286 Order Requesting Supplemental Information filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 277 , 286 ) (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
August 12, 2011 298 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Google, Inc's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the Parties' Joing Letter (Dkt. No. 280 ) filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 8/12/2011) Modified on 8/15/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
August 12, 2011 297 MOTION to Redact 293 Transcript,,, Google Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Redact and Seal Portions of Hearing Transcript; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
August 11, 2011 296 Letter Regarding Non-Mobile Data (REDACTED). (Norton, William) (Filed on 8/11/2011)
August 11, 2011 295 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 294 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Parties' Joint Letter Regarding Non-Mobile Data by Oracle America, Inc.. (Norton, William) (Filed on 8/11/2011)
August 11, 2011 294 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 292 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2011)
August 11, 2011 293 Transcript of Proceedings held on July 21, 2011, before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Court Reporter Diane Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 9/1/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/12/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2011. (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 8/11/2011)
August 10, 2011 292 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Parties' Joint Letter Regarding Non-Mobile Data filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Norton, William) (Filed on 8/10/2011)
August 10, 2011 291 Featured Case ORDER re 290 Letter filed by Oracle America, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/10/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2011)
August 10, 2011 290 Letter from Daniel P. Muino & Daniel Purcell Joint Letter to Magistrate Judge Ryu Regarding Awareness of Sun IP Rights [REDACTED]. (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 8/10/2011)
August 10, 2011 289 Featured Case ORDER re 288 Letter filed by Oracle America, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/10/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2011)
August 10, 2011 288 Letter from Steven C. Holtzman & Daniel Purcell Joint Letter to Magistrate Judge Ryu Regarding Nishar Deposition. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 8/10/2011)
August 9, 2011 287 NOTICE of Appearance by Wendy Michelle Mantell for Defendant Google Inc. (Mantell, Wendy) (Filed on 8/9/2011)
August 9, 2011 286 Featured Case ORDER requesting supplemental information re 277 Letter filed by Oracle America, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/9/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2011)
August 9, 2011 285 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 283 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Letter Re Awareness of Sun IP Rights by Oracle America, Inc.. (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 8/9/2011)
August 9, 2011 284 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 282 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Letter regarding Nishar Deposition by Oracle America, Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 8/9/2011)
August 9, 2011 283 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 276 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2011)
August 9, 2011 282 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 274 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2011)
August 8, 2011 281 Featured Case ORDER PARTIALLY GRANTING AND PARTIALLY DENYING MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS AND VACATING HEARING by Judge Alsup finding as moot 208 Motion for Leave to File; granting in part and denying in part 214 Motion for Leave to File (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2011)
August 8, 2011 280 Letter from Beko Reblitz-Richardson and Scott T. Weingaertner re Kehring and Creven Redactions. (Sabnis, Cheryl) (Filed on 8/8/2011)
August 8, 2011 279 Featured Case ORDER VACATING AUGUST 18 HEARING re 214 Amended MOTION for Leave to File Supplement Invalidity Contentions filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 8, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2011)
August 6, 2011 278 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Sabnis, Cheryl) (Filed on 8/6/2011)
August 6, 2011 277 Letter from Oracle America, Inc. Regarding Lindholm. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 8/6/2011)
August 5, 2011 276 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the Parties' Joint Letter Regarding Awareness of Sun IP Rights filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 8/5/2011)
August 5, 2011 275 Letter from the parties to Mag. Judge Ryu regarding ongoing discovery disputes. (Sabnis, Cheryl) (Filed on 8/5/2011)
August 5, 2011 274 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Letter Regarding Nishar Deposition filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 8/5/2011)
August 5, 2011 273 Featured Case ORDER SETTING CONFERENCE WITH DAMAGES EXPERT CANDIDATES. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 5, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2011)
August 4, 2011 272 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING COUNSEL FOR RULE 706 EXPERT. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 4, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
August 4, 2011 271 Featured Case ORDER DENYING PRECIS REQUESTS re 269 Letter filed by Oracle America, Inc., 265 Letter filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 4, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
August 3, 2011 270 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 236 ORDER RE SEARCH FOR RULE 706 EXPERTS; JOINT SUBMISSION IN RESPONSE TO ORDER RE SEARCH FOR RULE 706 EXPERTS by Oracle America, Inc. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 8/3/2011) Modified on 8/8/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
August 3, 2011 269 Letter from Steven C. Holtzman on belahlf of Plaintiff Oracle America, Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
August 3, 2011 268 REPLY (re 214 Amended MOTION for Leave to File Supplement Invalidity Contentions ) filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF MARK H. FRANCIS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.S AMENDED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS)(Purcell, Daniel) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
August 3, 2011 267 Letter from Fred Norton and Bruce Baber To Judge Ryu Re Oracles Request For Non-Mobile Data And Projections-CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 266 . (Norton, William) (Filed on 8/3/2011) Modified on 8/3/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
August 3, 2011 266 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT 267 . *** Letter from Fred Norton and Bruce Barber to Judge Ryu Re Oracles Request For Non-Mobile Data And Projections. (Norton, William) (Filed on 8/3/2011) Modified on 8/3/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
August 3, 2011 265 Letter from Robert A. Van Nest on behalf of defendant Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
August 1, 2011 264 Proposed Order re 260 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count VIII of Plaintiff Oracle America's Amended Complaint by Google Inc.. (Kwun, Michael) (Filed on 8/1/2011)
August 1, 2011 263 Declaration of MICHAEL S. KWUN in Support of 260 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count VIII of Plaintiff Oracle America's Amended Complaint filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O)(Related document(s) 260 ) (Kwun, Michael) (Filed on 8/1/2011)
August 1, 2011 262 Declaration of OWEN ASTRACHAN in Support of 260 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count VIII of Plaintiff Oracle America's Amended Complaint filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 260 ) (Kwun, Michael) (Filed on 8/1/2011)
August 1, 2011 261 Declaration of DANIEL BORNSTEIN in Support of 260 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count VIII of Plaintiff Oracle America's Amended Complaint filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 260 ) (Kwun, Michael) (Filed on 8/1/2011)
August 1, 2011 260 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count VIII of Plaintiff Oracle America's Amended Complaint filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/15/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 8/15/2011. Replies due by 8/22/2011. (Kwun, Michael) (Filed on 8/1/2011)
August 1, 2011 259 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 254 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal KEY TO JOINT FILING RE RULE 706 EXPERT WITNESSES by Oracle America, Inc.. (Dearborn, Meredith) (Filed on 8/1/2011)
August 1, 2011 258 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 8/1/2011 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu (Date Filed: 8/1/2011). (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/1/2011)
August 1, 2011 257 Featured Case ORDER EXTENDING FACT DISCOVERY CUT-OFF AND DUE DATES FOR EXPERT REPORTS re 246 Stipulation filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 1, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2011)
August 1, 2011 256 Featured Case *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DKT No. 257 . *** ORDER EXTENDING FACT DISCOVERY CUT-OFF AND DUE DATES FOR EXPERT REPORTS re 246 Stipulation filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 1, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2011) Modified on 8/1/2011 (whalc1, COURT STAFF).
August 1, 2011 255 Featured Case ORDER DENYING LEAVE TO FILE MOTIONS TO SEAL AND REDACT DAUBERT RECORD re 247 Letter filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 1, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2011)
August 1, 2011 254 Featured Case ORDER SEALING KEY TO JOINT FILING RE RULE 706 EXPERT WITNESS, Order by Hon. William Alsup granting 249 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2011)
July 29, 2011 253 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 252 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint letter by Oracle America, Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
July 29, 2011 252 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 241 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(dmrlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
July 29, 2011 251 NOTICE of Change of Address by Robert Addy Van Nest (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
July 29, 2011 250 Letter from Robert Van Nest in response to 247 Oracle's opposition to Google's precis letter. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 7/29/2011) Modified on 8/1/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2011 249 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal KEY TO JOINT FILING RE RULE 706 EXPERT WITNESSES (DKT. NO. 234) filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order SEALING KEY TO JOINT FILING RE RULE 706 EXPERT WITNESSES)(Dearborn, Meredith) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
July 29, 2011 248 RESPONSE to re 247 Letter by Oracle America, Inc.. (Norton, William) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
July 28, 2011 247 Letter from Robert Van Nest re Leave to File Two Short Motions. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 7/28/2011)
July 28, 2011 246 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Fact Discovery Cut-Off and Due Dates for Expert Reports by Oracle America, Inc.. (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 7/28/2011)
July 28, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 214 Amended MOTION for Leave to File Supplement Invalidity Contentions. Motion Hearing set for 8/18/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2011)
July 28, 2011 245 Featured Case ORDER Setting Hearing re Parties' 7/27/2011 Joint Discovery Letter. Discovery Hearing set for 8/1/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 07/28/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2011)
July 28, 2011 244 Proposed Order re 241 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the Parties' Joint Letter by Google Inc.. (Kamber, Matthias) (Filed on 7/28/2011)
July 28, 2011 243 Declaration of Matthias A. Kamber in Support of 241 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the Parties' Joint Letter filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 241 ) (Kamber, Matthias) (Filed on 7/28/2011)
July 27, 2011 242 Letter from Robert A. Van Nest re July 21 Hearing. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 7/27/2011)
July 27, 2011 241 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the Parties' Joint Letter filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 7/27/2011)
July 27, 2011 240 RESPONSE (re 214 Amended MOTION for Leave to File Supplement Invalidity Contentions ) filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Marc Peters in Support of Oracle's Opposition to Google's Motion for Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions)(Peters, Marc) (Filed on 7/27/2011)
July 27, 2011 239 NOTICE RE SUBPOENAS FOR TRIAL WITNESSES. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 27, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2011)
July 27, 2011 238 Featured Case STIPULATED ORDER REGARDING EXCHANGE OF EXPERT DEMONSTRATIVE EXHIBITS re 237 Stipulation filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 27, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2011)
July 27, 2011 237 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Exchange of Expert Demonstrative Exhibits by Oracle America, Inc.. (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 7/27/2011)
July 27, 2011 236 Featured Case ORDER RE SEARCH FOR RULE 706 EXPERTS re 234 Response ( Non Motion ) filed by Google Inc., 235 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 27, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2011)
July 26, 2011 235 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Google Inc. DECLARATION OF ROBERT VAN NEST RE RULE 706 EXPERTS. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 7/26/2011)
July 26, 2011 234 RESPONSE to re 195 Order JOINT SUBMISSION REGARDING RULE 706 EXPERTS by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 7/26/2011)
July 25, 2011 233 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/21/2011 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 7/25/2011) re 171 MOTION To Exclude Expert Opinions and Testimony (Daubert) filed by Google Inc. Motion taken under submission. (Court Reporter Sahar Bartlett.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/25/2011)
July 22, 2011 232 Featured Case ORDER re 227 Letter filed by Oracle America, Inc. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/22/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 22, 2011 231 Transcript of Proceedings held on 7/21/11, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sahar Bartlett, CSR, RPR, Telephone number (415) 626-6060/sahar_bartlett@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/20/2011. (Bartlett, Sahar) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 22, 2011 230 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION TO STRIKE DAMAGE REPORT OF PLAINTIFF EXPERT IAIN COCKBURN by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part 171 Motion to Strike Expert Report (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 21, 2011 229 Featured Case ORDER re 215 Plaintiff's Request for Additional Depositions and 228 , granting in part and denying in part Request. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/21/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2011)
July 21, 2011 228 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER re 215 Letter filed by Oracle America, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/21/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2011)
July 21, 2011 227 Letter from Steven C. Holtzman and Scott T. Weingaertner re Non-Mobile Data. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 7/21/2011)
July 20, 2011 226 NOTICE of Appearance by Beko Osiris Ra Reblitz-Richardson (Reblitz-Richardson, Beko) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
July 20, 2011 225 NOTICE of Appearance by William Fred Norton, Jr (Norton, William) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
July 20, 2011 224 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith Richardson Dearborn (Dearborn, Meredith) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
July 20, 2011 223 RESPONSE to re 209 Order Joint Summary of the Status of the PTO Reexaminations and Update on the Parties' Views Regarding Stay by Google Inc., Oracle America, Inc.. (Peters, Marc) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
July 20, 2011 222 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 212 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal portions of Google's Daubert Reply Brief by Google Inc.. (Sabnis, Cheryl) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
July 19, 2011 221 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 190 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Leonard Declaration by Google Inc.. (Sabnis, Cheryl) (Filed on 7/19/2011)
July 19, 2011 220 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 186 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh H part 1 to Weingaertner Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Exh H part 2 to Weingaertner Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Exh H part 3 to Weingaertner Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Exh H part 4 to Weingaertner Declaration, # 5 Exhibit Exh H part 5 to Weingaertner Declaration, # 6 Exhibit Exh I to Weingaertner Declaration, # 7 Exhibit Exh J part 1 to Weingaertner Declaration, # 8 Exhibit Exh J part 2 to Weingaertner Declaration, # 9 Exhibit Exh J part 3 to Weingaertner Declaration, # 10 Exhibit Exh J part 4 to Weingaertner Declaration, # 11 Exhibit Exh J part 5 to Weingaertner Declaration, # 12 Exhibit Exh L to Weingaertner Declaration, # 13 Exhibit Exh M part 1 to Weingaertner Declaration, # 14 Exhibit Exh M part 2 to Weingaertner Declaration, # 15 Exhibit Exh M part 3 to Weingaertner Declaration, # 16 Exhibit Exh M part 4 to Weingaertner Declaration, # 17 Exhibit Exh P to Weingaertner Declaration, # 18 Exhibit Exh Q to Weingaertner Declaration, # 19 Exhibit Exh R to Weingaertner Declaration, # 20 Exhibit Exh W to Weingaertner Declaration)(Sabnis, Cheryl) (Filed on 7/19/2011)
July 19, 2011 219 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 220 *** DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 186 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit H to Weingaertner Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit I to Weingaertner Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit J to Weingaertner Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit L to Weingaertner Declaration, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit M to Weingaertner Declaration, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit O to Weingaertner Declaration, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit Q to Weingaertner Declaration, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit R to Weingaertner Declaration, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit W to Weingaertner Declaration)(Sabnis, Cheryl) (Filed on 7/19/2011) Modified on 7/20/2011 (wsnS, COURTSTAFF).
July 19, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 171 MOTION To Exclude Expert Opinions and Testimony (Daubert). Motion Hearing set for 7/21/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2011)
July 19, 2011 218 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 212 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Daubert Reply Brief by Google Inc.. (Sabnis, Cheryl) (Filed on 7/19/2011)
July 19, 2011 217 Featured Case ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion on 215 . Motion Hearing set for 7/21/2011 11:30 AM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/19/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2011)
July 18, 2011 216 NOTICE REGARDING JULY 21 HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 18, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2011)
July 14, 2011 215 Letter from Steven C. Holtzman & Robert A. Van Nest Joint Letter Regarding Oracles Request for Four Additional Depositions. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
July 13, 2011 214 Amended MOTION for Leave to File Supplement Invalidity Contentions filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Mark Francis in support of Amended Motion for Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Google Inc's Amended Motion for Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions)(Banner, Brian) (Filed on 7/13/2011)
July 13, 2011 213 REPLY (re 171 MOTION To Exclude Expert Opinions and Testimony (Daubert) ) In Support of Daubert Motion [Redacted Version] filed byGoogle Inc.. (Purcell, Daniel) (Filed on 7/13/2011)
July 12, 2011 212 Featured Case ORDER PARTIALLY GRANTING MOTION TO FILE REPLY BRIEF UNDER SEAL, Order by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 196 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2011)
July 12, 2011 211 Declaration in Support of 196 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DECLARATION OF MATTHEW SARBORARIA IN SUPPORT OF GOOGLE, INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF GOOGLES DAUBERT REPLY BRIEF filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER SEALING ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION FROM GOOGLE, INC.S DAUBERT REPLY BRIEF)(Related document(s) 196 ) (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 7/12/2011)
July 12, 2011 210 NOTICE REGARDING ADDITIONAL QUESTIONS FOR JULY 21 HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 12, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2011)
July 11, 2011 209 REQUEST FOR UPDATE RE RE-EXAMINATION. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 11, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 8, 2011 208 MOTION for Leave to File Supplement Invalidity Contentions filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Mark Francis in support of Motion for Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Google Inc's Motion for Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions)(Sabnis, Cheryl) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 207 NOTICE RE QUESTION FOR JULY 21 HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 8, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 6, 2011 206 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 190 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal unredacted versions of Daubert motion and supporting Leonard Declaration by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Sabnis, Cheryl) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 205 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 203 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DECLARATION OF FRED NORTON IN SUPPORT OF ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S OPPOSITION TO GOOGLES DAUBERT MOTION by Oracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits C, D, K & M)(Rutherford, Alanna) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 204 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 203 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ORACLE AMERICA, INC.S OPPOSITION TO GOOGLES DAUBERT MOTION by Oracle America, Inc.. (Rutherford, Alanna) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 203 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL, Order by Hon. William Alsup granting 192 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 5, 2011 202 Proposed Order re 192 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF OPPOSITION TO GOOGLES DAUBERT MOTION AND EXHIBITS by Google Inc.. (Purcell, Daniel) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
July 5, 2011 201 Declaration of Christopher Carnaval in Support of 192 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF OPPOSITION TO GOOGLES DAUBERT MOTION AND EXHIBITS filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 192 ) (Purcell, Daniel) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
July 5, 2011 200 Proposed Order re 196 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Google Inc.. (Purcell, Daniel) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
July 5, 2011 199 Declaration of Daniel Purcell in Support of 198 Reply to Opposition/Response Daubert Motion filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 198 ) (Purcell, Daniel) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
July 5, 2011 198 REPLY (re 171 MOTION To Exclude Expert Opinions and Testimony (Daubert), 196 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) Reply Brief in Support of Daubert Motion filed byGoogle Inc.. (Purcell, Daniel) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
July 5, 2011 197 Declaration of Daniel Purcell in Support of 196 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 196 ) (Purcell, Daniel) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
July 5, 2011 196 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Google Inc.. (Purcell, Daniel) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
July 5, 2011 195 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING RULE 706 EXPERTS. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 5, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
July 1, 2011 194 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Letter filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 7/1/2011)
June 29, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 171 MOTION To Exclude Expert Opinions and Testimony (Daubert). Motion Hearing set for 7/21/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2011) Modified on 6/29/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
June 29, 2011 193 CLERKS NOTICE Rescheduling Hearing Time. Motion set for 7/21/2011 2:00 PM. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2011)
June 28, 2011 192 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF OPPOSITION TO GOOGLES DAUBERT MOTION AND EXHIBITS filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Rutherford, Alanna) (Filed on 6/28/2011)
June 28, 2011 191 RESPONSE (re 171 MOTION To Exclude Expert Opinions and Testimony (Daubert) ) filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit)(Rutherford, Alanna) (Filed on 6/28/2011)
June 27, 2011 190 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL, Order by Hon. William Alsup granting 170 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2011)
June 24, 2011 189 Declaration of Gregory K. Leonard, Ph.D. in Support of 171 MOTION To Exclude Expert Opinions and Testimony (Daubert) (Revised Redactions) filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 171 ) (Sabnis, Cheryl) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 24, 2011 188 Brief re 171 MOTION To Exclude Expert Opinions and Testimony (Daubert) (Revised Redactions) filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 171 ) (Sabnis, Cheryl) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 24, 2011 187 Declaration of Scott T. Weingaertner (Supplemental) in Support of Google, Inc.'s 170 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Google Inc.. (Sabnis, Cheryl) (Filed on 6/24/2011) Modified on 6/27/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
June 21, 2011 186 Featured Case ORDER PARTIALLY GRANTING MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL, Order by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 170 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2011)
June 21, 2011 185 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE MOTION re 181 Letter filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 21, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2011)
June 21, 2011 184 Declaration of MATTHEW SARBORARIA in Support of 170 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Related document(s) 170 ) (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 6/21/2011)
June 21, 2011 183 Letter in Opposition to Google's Request for Leave to File a Motion to Supplement Its Invalidity Contentions. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 6/21/2011)
June 17, 2011 182 Letter from Google counsel Scott T. Weingaertner dated June 6, 2011 requesting leave to file Daubert or other motion (unredacted), filed pursuant to Order Denying Motion To File Precis Under Seal entered June 16, 2011. (Baber, Bruce) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
June 17, 2011 181 Letter from Scott T. Weingaertner, Counsel for Defendant Google Inc.. (Sabnis, Cheryl) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
June 17, 2011 180 CLERK'S NOTICE Retrieval of Submitted Documents. In accordance with Civil L.R. 79-5(e), the submitting party is hereby notified to retrieve lodged documents within three days of this notice: Portions of Googles prcis requesting leave to file a Daubert or other motion directed at the damages report of Oracle America, Inc.s expert Iain Cockburn under seal pursuant to Civil L. R. 79-5. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
June 16, 2011 179 Featured Case ORDER DENYING MOTION TO FILE PRECIS UNDER SEAL, Order by Hon. William Alsup denying 164 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 16, 2011 178 RESPONSE (re 164 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 15, 2011 177 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO LOCK ERRONEOUSLY FILED DOCUMENT PERMANENTLY, Order by Hon. William Alsup granting 176 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
June 15, 2011 176 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document DOCKET NUMBER 173 filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sabnis, Cheryl) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
June 14, 2011 175 Declaration of Gregory K. Leonard in Support of 171 MOTION To Exclude Expert Opinions and Testimony (Daubert) CORRECTION OF DOCKET #173 filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 171 ) (Sabnis, Cheryl) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
June 14, 2011 174 Proposed Order re 171 MOTION To Exclude Expert Opinions and Testimony (Daubert) by Google Inc.. (Sabnis, Cheryl) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
June 14, 2011 173 *** THIS ENTRY REMOVED BY ORDER OF THE COURT. SEE DOCKET # 177 . *** Modified on 6/16/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
June 14, 2011 172 Declaration of Scott Weingaertner in Support of 171 MOTION To Exclude Expert Opinions and Testimony (Daubert) filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Affidavit, # 4 Affidavit)(Related document(s) 171 ) (Sabnis, Cheryl) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
June 14, 2011 171 MOTION To Exclude Expert Opinions and Testimony (Daubert) filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/21/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 6/28/2011. Replies due by 7/5/2011. (Sabnis, Cheryl) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
June 14, 2011 170 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Sabnis, Cheryl) (Filed on 6/14/2011) Modified on 6/27/2011 (whalc1, COURT STAFF).
June 14, 2011 169 Featured Case ORDER RE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL re 164 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 14, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
June 13, 2011 168 Featured Case ORDER re: Discovery Procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/13/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 10, 2011 167 STIPULATION re 67 Response ( Non Motion ), 26 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, 141 Order Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Privilege Logs by Oracle America, Inc.. (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 6/10/2011)
June 7, 2011 166 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DAUBERT MOTION re 160 Stipulation filed by Google Inc., 165 Letter filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 7, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
June 6, 2011 165 Letter from Google re precis requesting leave to file a Daubert or Other Motion. (Sabnis, Cheryl) (Filed on 6/6/2011) Modified on 6/8/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2011 164 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Sabnis, Cheryl) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
June 6, 2011 163 Featured Case ORDER re 145 Letter filed by Oracle America, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/6/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
June 3, 2011 162 Letter Brief re 159 Declaration in Support, Response to Supplemental Declaration of Andrew Temkin filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 159 ) (Zimmer, Donald) (Filed on 6/3/2011)
June 2, 2011 161 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING PROPOSED DAUBERT BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 160 Stipulation filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 2, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
June 1, 2011 160 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Regarding Briefing Schedule by Google Inc.. (Baber, Bruce) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
June 1, 2011 159 Declaration of Andrew C. Temkin in Support of 145 Letter, 155 Terminate Motion and Deadlines/Hearings,,,,, Discovery Hearing,,,,, Terminate Motions,,,, Supplemental Declaration of Andrew C. Temkin In Support of 145 Oracle's Request for Access to Attorneys' Eyes Only Information in response to 155 Minute Order requesting more information filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Related document(s) 145 , 155 ) (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
June 1, 2011 158 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 157 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Exhibits A, B and D to Declaration of Dorian Daley In Support of Oracle's Request for Access to Attorneys' Eyes Only Information by Oracle America, Inc.. (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
May 31, 2011 157 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 150 Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits A, B, & D to Declaration of Dorian Daley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu 5/31/2011. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2011)
May 31, 2011 156 Featured Case Please disregard dockety entry #156 and see docket entry #157 for corrected entry ORDER GRANTING re 150 Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits A, B and D to Declaration of Dorian Daley . Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/31/11. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2011) Modified on 6/1/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/1/2011 (ig, COURT STAFF).
May 31, 2011 155 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing HELD on 5/31/2011 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to file Under Seal Exhibits A, b, & D to Declaration of Dorian Daley GRANTED. Plaintiff's request to grant the following Designated House Counsel access to attorneys' eyes only ("AEO") information pursuant to the Protective Order: A. Dorian Daley - DENIED; B. Deborah Kay Miller - GRANTED ACCESS TO AEO INFORMATION, BUT NO ACCESS TO CONTRACTS WITH CARRIERS OR HARDWARE MANUFACTURERS; C. Matthew Sarboraria - GRANTED ACCESS TO AEO INFORMATION, BUT NO ACCESS TO CONTRACTS WITH CARRIERS OR HARDWARE MANUFACTURERS; D. Andrew Temkin - FURTHER INFORMATION REQUIRED. Please see minutes for more particulars. (Date Filed: 5/31/2011). ***Motions terminated: 150 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits A, B and D to Declaration of Dorian Daley filed by Oracle America, Inc. (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/31/2011) Modified on 6/1/2011 (ig, COURT STAFF).
May 26, 2011 154 Declaration of Andrew C. Temkin in Support of 145 Letter, 146 Order scheduling hearing on Oracle's Request for Access to Attorneys' Eyes Only Information filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Related document(s) 145 , 146 ) (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
May 26, 2011 153 Declaration of Matthew Sarboraria in Support of 145 Letter, 146 Order setting hearing on Oracle's Request for Access to Attorneys' Eyes Only Information filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Related document(s) 145 , 146 ) (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
May 26, 2011 152 Declaration of Deborah K. Miller in Support of 145 Letter, 146 Order setting hearing on Oracle's Request for Access to Attorneys' Eyes Only Information filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Related document(s) 145 , 146 ) (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
May 26, 2011 151 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Oracle America, Inc. re 150 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits A, B and D to Declaration of Dorian Daley 149 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits A, B and D to Declaration of Dorian Daley 149 (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
May 26, 2011 150 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits A, B and D to Declaration of Dorian Daley 149 filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/31/2011 11:30 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Daniel Muino, # 2 Proposed Order)(Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 5/26/2011) Modified on 6/1/2011 (ig, COURT STAFF).
May 26, 2011 149 Declaration of Dorian Daley in Support of 145 Letter, 146 Order setting hearing on Oracle's Request for Access to Attorneys' Eyes Only Information filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C - Special Master Report)(Related document(s) 145 , 146 ) (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
May 24, 2011 148 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Addy Van Nest , Christa M. Anderson, Michael S. Kwun, Daniel Purcell, Eugene M. Paige, and Matthias A. Kamber (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
May 23, 2011 147 COURT'S RESPONSE TO JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT MEMORANDUM [re 144 Response (Non Motion) filed by Oracle America, Inc.]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/23/2011. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2011)
May 20, 2011 146 Featured Case ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING ON COMPETITIVE DECISION MAKERS. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/20/11. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2011)
May 18, 2011 145 Letter Oracle's Request to Seek Permission to Provide Designated In-House Counsel With Access to AEO Information. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 5/18/2011)
May 18, 2011 144 RESPONSE to re 143 Order Joint Memorandum Regarding the Court's Tentative Case Plan by Oracle America, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 5/18/2011)
May 11, 2011 143 NOTICE RE TENTATIVE PLAN. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 11, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2011)
May 11, 2011 142 Minute Entry: Case Management Conference held on 5/11/2011 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 5/11/2011). Hearing held in chambers per dkt. 136 . (Court Reporter None.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/11/2011) Modified on 5/12/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
May 10, 2011 141 Notice of Reference and Order re Discovery Procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 05/10/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2011)
May 10, 2011 140 NOTICE RE MAY 11 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 136 Order. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 10, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2011)
May 9, 2011 139 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING ALL DISCOVERY DISPUTES FOR ASSIGNMENT TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 138 Letter filed by Oracle America, Inc., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 9, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2011)
May 9, 2011 138 Letter from Plaintiff Oracle America, Inc. Regarding Discovery Master. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 5/9/2011)
May 9, 2011 137 Featured Case CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 9, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2011)
May 9, 2011 136 NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 9, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2011)
May 6, 2011 135 Statement on the 128 Court's Tentative Claim Construction Order by Google Inc.. (Sabnis, Cheryl) (Filed on 5/6/2011) Modified on 5/9/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2011 134 Statement in Response to the Court's 131 Order Re Schedule For Narrowing Issues For Trial by Google Inc. (Sabnis, Cheryl) (Filed on 5/6/2011) Modified on 5/9/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2011 133 RESPONSE to re 131 Order Re Schedule for Narrowing Issues for Trial by Oracle America, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
May 6, 2011 132 RESPONSE to re 128 Order Oracle's response to Court's Tentative Claim Construction Order and Request for Critique by Oracle America, Inc.. (Peters, Marc) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
May 3, 2011 131 Featured Case ORDER RE SCHEDULE FOR NARROWING ISSUES FOR TRIAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 3, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2011)
April 29, 2011 130 Brief SETTING FORTH PLAN TO REDUCE CLAIMS TO A TRIABLE NUMBER filed byGoogle Inc.. (Sabnis, Cheryl) (Filed on 4/29/2011)
April 29, 2011 129 RESPONSE to re 124 Order Oracle's memorandum describing its plan for streamlining the case for trial by Oracle America, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 4/29/2011)
April 28, 2011 128 Featured Case TENTATIVE CLAIM-CONSTRUCTION ORDER AND REQUEST FOR CRITIQUE re-filed with signature re 127 Order. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 27, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2011)
April 27, 2011 127 Featured Case *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. *** TENTATIVE CLAIM-CONSTRUCTION ORDER AND REQUEST FOR CRITIQUE. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 27, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2011) Modified on 4/28/2011 (whalc1, COURT STAFF).
April 26, 2011 126 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY BALLINGER by Judge Alsup granting 125 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Richard Steven Ballinger terminated (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2011)
April 26, 2011 125 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Motion to Relieve Richard S. Ballinger as Counsel of Record for Oracle America, Inc. Pursuant to L.R. 11-5 filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ballinger, Richard) (Filed on 4/26/2011)
April 25, 2011 124 Featured Case ORDER REQUESTING MEMORANDA. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 25, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2011)
April 25, 2011 123 Letter from Marc David Peters (counsel for Oracle America) regarding construction of "reduced class file". (Peters, Marc) (Filed on 4/25/2011)
April 25, 2011 122 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Richard Steven Ballinger (Ballinger, Richard) (Filed on 4/25/2011)
April 25, 2011 121 Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/20/2011, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/25/2011. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 4/25/2011)
April 21, 2011 120 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY RUTHERFORD PRO HAC VICE by Judge Alsup granting 119 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2011)
April 20, 2011 119 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Alanna Rutherford ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611058881) filed by Oracle America, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2011)
April 20, 2011 118 Minute Entry: Claims Construction / Markman Hearing held on 4/20/2011 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 4/20/2011). (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/20/2011)
April 19, 2011 117 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO BRING EQUIPMENT INTO COURTROOM by Judge Alsup granting 116 Motion Equipment (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2011)
April 18, 2011 116 MOTION Request and Proposed Order Regarding Courtroom Equipment for April 20th Claim Construction Hearing filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Swoopes, Roman) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
April 18, 2011 115 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY BANNER PRO HAC VICE by Judge Alsup granting 114 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
April 15, 2011 114 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Brian C. Banner ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611058729), filed by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2011)
April 14, 2011 113 NOTICE REGARDING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 14, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2011)
April 11, 2011 112 NOTICE of Appearance by Roman A Swoopes (Swoopes, Roman) (Filed on 4/11/2011)
April 8, 2011 111 NOTICE of Appearance by Valerie Wing Ho (Ho, Valerie) (Filed on 4/8/2011)
April 8, 2011 110 Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/06/2011, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2011. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 4/8/2011)
April 6, 2011 109 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 4/6/2011 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 4/6/2011), Tutorial Hearing held on 4/6/2011 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 4/6/2011). (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/6/2011)
April 5, 2011 108 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING COURTROOM EQUIPMENT FOR APRIL 6 TUTORIAL by Judge Alsup finding as moot 105 Motion EquipmentEquipment; granting 107 Motion EquipmentEquipment (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2011)
April 5, 2011 107 MOTION Supplemental Request and [Proposed] Order Regarding Courtroom Equipment For April 6, 2011 Tutorial re 105 MOTION Request to Bring Equipment into Courtroom for April 6, 2011 Claim Construction Tutorial and proposed order filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/6/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (Ballinger, Richard) (Filed on 4/5/2011)
April 5, 2011 106 Featured Case ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S APRIL 4, 2011, LETTER [re 104 Letter Brief filed by Google Inc.]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/5/2011. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2011)
April 4, 2011 105 MOTION Request to Bring Equipment into Courtroom for April 6, 2011 Claim Construction Tutorial and proposed order filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Peters, Marc) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
April 4, 2011 104 Letter Brief in Response to 98 Oracle's Second Motion to Compel filed by Google Inc. (Zimmer, Donald) (Filed on 4/4/2011) Modified on 4/5/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
March 31, 2011 103 Declaration of Truman Fenton in Support of 102 Claim Construction Statement Google's Responsive Claim Construction Brief filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 102 ) (Baber, Bruce) (Filed on 3/31/2011)
March 31, 2011 102 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT Google's Responsive Claim Construction Brief filed by Google Inc.. (Baber, Bruce) (Filed on 3/31/2011)
March 31, 2011 101 Declaration of Marc David Peters in Support of 100 Claim Construction Statement (Oracle's Responsive Claim Construction Brief) filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 9, # 2 Exhibit 10, # 3 Exhibit 11 - manual filing notice)(Related document(s) 100 ) (Peters, Marc) (Filed on 3/31/2011)
March 31, 2011 100 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT - Oracle's Responsive Claim Construction Brief filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 3/31/2011)
March 30, 2011 99 Featured Case ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 98 Letter filed by Oracle America, Inc.]. Meet-and-confer set starting at 10:00 AM and ending at 1:30 PM on 4/6/2011 in Court's jury room. Defendant's response due noon on 4/4/2011. Discovery Hearing set for 4/6/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/30/2011. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2011)
March 30, 2011 98 Letter from Michael A. Jacobs regarding Google's failure to supplement its responses to Interrogatories 4-16. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 3/30/2011)
March 17, 2011 97 Declaration of Truman Fenton in Support of Google Inc. 97 Opening Claim Construction Brief, filed by Google Inc. (Baber, Bruce) (Filed on 3/17/2011) Modified on 3/18/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
March 17, 2011 96 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT Google Inc. Opening Claim Construction Brief filed by Google Inc.. (Baber, Bruce) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
March 17, 2011 95 Declaration of Marc David Peters in Support of 94 Claim Construction Statement (Oracle's Opening Claim Construction Brief) filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Related document(s) 94 ) (Peters, Marc) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
March 17, 2011 94 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT - Oracle's Opening Claim Construction Brief - filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
March 8, 2011 93 NOTICE of Appearance by Ruchika Agrawal (Agrawal, Ruchika) (Filed on 3/8/2011)
March 8, 2011 92 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Pierre Muino (Muino, Daniel) (Filed on 3/8/2011)
February 22, 2011 91 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT filed by Google Inc., Oracle America, Inc.. (Peters, Marc) (Filed on 2/22/2011)
February 18, 2011 90 Featured Case ORDER DENYING LEAVE TO FILE SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION by Judge Alsup denying 88 Motion for Leave to File (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
February 18, 2011 89 RESPONSE (re 88 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment ) filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
February 16, 2011 88 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Google Inc.. (Baber, Bruce) (Filed on 2/16/2011)
February 10, 2011 87 Transcript of Proceedings held on 2-9-11, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, Telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/11/2011. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
February 9, 2011 86 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 9, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2011) Modified on 2/11/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
February 9, 2011 85 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DISCLOSURE DISPUTES re 77 First MOTION to Compel Google's Responses To Interrogatory Nos. 4-16 filed by Oracle America, Inc., 79 MOTION to Compel Regarding Oracle's Patent Local Rule 3-1 Disclosures filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 9, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2011)
February 9, 2011 84 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 2/9/2011 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 2/9/2011). (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/9/2011)
February 8, 2011 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Cheryl A. Sabnis of Counsel of Renny F. Hwang (Sabnis, Cheryl) (Filed on 2/8/2011)
February 7, 2011 82 Memorandum in Opposition re 79 MOTION to Compel Regarding Oracle's Patent Local Rule 3-1 Disclosures filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Peters, Marc) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
February 4, 2011 81 Letter from Counsel for Google Inc. in Response to Oracle's Motion to Compel Google's Responses To Interrogatory Nos. 4-16. (Zimmer, Donald) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
February 3, 2011 80 Featured Case ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 79 MOTION to Compel Regarding Oracle's Patent Local Rule 3-1 Disclosures, 77 First MOTION to Compel Google's Responses To Interrogatory Nos. 4-16 : Motion Hearing set for 2/9/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 3, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011)
February 2, 2011 79 MOTION to Compel Regarding Oracle's Patent Local Rule 3-1 Disclosures filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Sabnis, Cheryl) (Filed on 2/2/2011)
February 2, 2011 78 Featured Case ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE re 77 First MOTION to Compel Google's Responses To Interrogatory Nos. 4-16 : Motion Hearing set for 2/9/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 2, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2011) Modified on 2/3/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
February 1, 2011 77 First MOTION to Compel Google's Responses To Interrogatory Nos. 4-16 filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Google responses to first interrogatories)(Peters, Marc) (Filed on 2/1/2011)
January 18, 2011 76 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge Alsup granting 73 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
January 18, 2011 75 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge Alsup granting 71 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
January 13, 2011 74 Proposed Order re 73 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Mark H. Francis by Google Inc. (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2011)
January 13, 2011 73 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Mark H. Francis ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611055014.) filed by Google Inc. (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2011)
January 13, 2011 72 Proposed Order re 71 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Christopher C. Carnaval by Google Inc. (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2011)
January 13, 2011 71 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Christopher C. Carnaval ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611055015.) filed by Google Inc. (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2011)
December 29, 2010 70 RESPONSE to re 56 Case Management Scheduling Order, Case Referred to Private ADR, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Joint Notice Regarding Mediation by Google Inc., Oracle America, Inc. (Peters, Marc) (Filed on 12/29/2010) Modified on 12/30/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
December 20, 2010 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Janine Meeker on Behalf of Google Inc. (Meeker, Heather) (Filed on 12/20/2010)
December 20, 2010 68 Featured Case ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 20, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2010)
December 17, 2010 67 RESPONSE to re 56 Case Management Scheduling Order, Case Referred to Private ADR, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines,,,,,, Joint ESI Agreement by Oracle America, Inc.. (Ballinger, Richard) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
December 17, 2010 66 STIPULATION Joint [PROPOSED] Protective Order by Google Inc., Oracle America, Inc.. (Peters, Marc) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
December 14, 2010 65 Featured Case ORDER RE PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDERS re 64 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by Google Inc., Oracle America, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 14, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2010)
December 10, 2010 64 NOTICE by Google Inc., Oracle America, Inc. Joint Notice Regarding Proposed Protective Orders (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Oracle's proposed protective order, # 2 Exhibit B - Google's proposed protective order, # 3 Exhibit C - table of disputed provisions)(Peters, Marc) (Filed on 12/10/2010)
December 3, 2010 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Dana K Powers on Behalf of Google Inc. (Powers, Dana) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
December 2, 2010 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Richard Wetzel on Behalf of Google Inc. (Wetzel, Joseph) (Filed on 12/2/2010)
December 2, 2010 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian Ballon on Behalf of Google Inc. (Ballon, Ian) (Filed on 12/2/2010)
November 29, 2010 60 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM 51 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim byOracle America, Inc.. (Peters, Marc) (Filed on 11/29/2010)
November 29, 2010 59 Featured Case ORDER ENTERING JOINT PROPOSED CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 29, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2010)
November 24, 2010 58 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Proposed Claim Construction Briefing Schedule filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Ballinger, Richard) (Filed on 11/24/2010)
November 19, 2010 56 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to private mediator. Private mediation must be completed thirty days after Markman order. Mediator must be on board by 12/31/2010. A tutorial for the Court (to be conducted by counsel only) shall be set for 4/6/2011 at 1:30 PM. Claims Construction Hearing set for 4/20/2011 01:30 PM. Discovery due by 7/29/2011. Jury Trial set for 10/31/2011 07:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motions due by 9/8/2011. Pretrial Conference set for 10/17/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/18/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2010)
November 18, 2010 57 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 11/18/2010 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 11/18/2010), Case referred to Private ADR. Jury Selection set for 10/31/2011 07:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Trial set for 10/31/2011 07:30 AM. (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/18/2010)
November 17, 2010 55 Featured Case ORDER DENYING ORACLE'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND STRIKE AND VACATING HEARING by Judge Alsup denying 35 Motion to Dismiss; denying 35 Motion to Strike (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2010)
November 16, 2010 54 Reply Memorandum re 35 MOTION to Dismiss invalidity counterclaims MOTION to Strike 32 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim (motion to strike certain affirmative defenses and impertinent matter) filed by Oracle America, Inc. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 11/16/2010) Modified on 11/17/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
November 16, 2010 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by RWS on 11/16/10. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2010)
November 11, 2010 53 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Google Inc., Oracle America, Inc.. (Ballinger, Richard) (Filed on 11/11/2010)
November 10, 2010 52 Memorandum in Opposition to Oracle's 35 Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike filed by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Proposed Order)(Zimmer, Donald) (Filed on 11/10/2010) Modified on 11/12/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
November 10, 2010 51 Google Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint for Patent and Copyright Infringement, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Oracle America, Inc. byGoogle Inc.. (Zimmer, Donald) (Filed on 11/10/2010)
November 10, 2010 50 Featured Case TENTATIVE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Please review and critique in the joint case management statement and at the conference. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/10/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2010)
November 8, 2010 49 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 11/16/10 at 10:00 a.m. Pacific time. Please take note that at the appointed time, all parties shall call 641-715-3200 and use access code 1007836 to join the call. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
November 3, 2010 48 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF SNYDER by Judge Alsup granting 47 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2010)
November 3, 2010 47 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Steven T. Snyder ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611008405.) filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Zimmer, Donald) (Filed on 11/3/2010)
November 1, 2010 45 Featured Case ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT AND VACATING HEARING by Judge Alsup finding as moot 33 Motion to Dismiss (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
November 1, 2010 44 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Google Inc.. (Zimmer, Donald) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
November 1, 2010 43 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT 44 . *** RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Google Inc.. (Zimmer, Donald) (Filed on 11/1/2010) Modified on 11/1/2010 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2010 46 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Steven T. Snyder ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611008405) filed by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
October 28, 2010 42 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE PENDING MOTION TO DISMISS SHOULD NOT BE DENIED AS MOOT Show Cause Response due by 11/1/2010.. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 28, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2010)
October 28, 2010 41 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM 32 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Oracle America, Inc.'s Reply to Defendant Google Inc.'s Answer to Complaint for Patent and Copyright Infringement and Counterclaims byOracle America, Inc.. (Ballinger, Richard) (Filed on 10/28/2010)
October 28, 2010 40 Memorandum in Opposition re 33 MOTION to Dismiss Count VIII of Plaintiff's Complaint or, In the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ballinger, Richard) (Filed on 10/28/2010)
October 28, 2010 39 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Ballinger, Richard) (Filed on 10/28/2010)
October 28, 2010 38 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Zimmer, Donald) (Filed on 10/28/2010)
October 27, 2010 37 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Oracle America ADR Certification by Party and Counsel (Ballinger, Richard) (Filed on 10/27/2010)
October 27, 2010 36 AMENDED COMPLAINT for patent and copyright infringement against Google Inc.. Filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Peters, Marc) (Filed on 10/27/2010)
October 26, 2010 35 MOTION to Dismiss invalidity counterclaims, MOTION to Strike 32 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim (motion to strike certain affirmative defenses and impertinent matter) filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2010 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Peters