Amaretto Ranch Breedables, LLC v. Ozimals, Inc.

Plaintiff: Amaretto Ranch Breedables, LLC
Defendant: Ozimals, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2010cv05696
Filed: December 15, 2010
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
 
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 8, 2011 104 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting in part and denying in part 96 Motion to Dismiss (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
February 2, 2012 114 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 108 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Paul Matthew Sykes terminated. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2012)
June 8, 2012 116 Featured Case ORDER for substitution of counsel re 115 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Creative Acorn Studio, Cameron Holt, Candice Sargent, Ozimals, Inc., Attorney Stephen S. Wu terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/6/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
July 9, 2012 120 Featured Case ORDER re request to appear telephonically at CMC. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/9/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
October 23, 2012 141 Featured Case ORDER. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on October 23, 2012. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2012)
October 30, 2012 143 Featured Case ORDER re oral argument. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/29/2012. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2012)
November 5, 2012 146 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting in part and denying in part 124 Motion for Summary Judgment. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2012)
November 15, 2012 151 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer re 150 Request for Entry of Judgment. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2012)
July 9, 2013 174 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 162 Motion for Summary Judgment. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2013)
July 11, 2013 177 Featured Case ORDER SETTING FEES MOTION DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/11/2013. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2013)
July 12, 2013 179 Featured Case ERRATA RE ORDER SETTING FEES MOTION DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/12/13. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2013)
July 29, 2013 183 Featured Case ORDER RE FEE BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/29/2013. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2013)
September 16, 2013 190 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 182 Motion for Attorney Fees (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2013)
December 20, 2010 20 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING BOND AMOUNT IF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER IS ISSUED. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on December 20, 2010. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2010)
December 21, 2010 29 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 3 Motion for TRO (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
January 11, 2011 53 Featured Case STANDING ORDER (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
January 26, 2011 66 Featured Case ORDER re 64 Stipulation filed by Amaretto Ranch Breedables, LLC. Motions terminated: 60 MOTION to Dismiss the Third, Fourth, Fifth, and Seventh Causes of Action of Plaintiff's Complaintfiled by Ozimals, Inc. First Amended Complaint due by 2/9/2011. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/25/2011. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
April 22, 2011 80 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting in part and denying in part 72 Motion to Dismiss (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Amaretto Ranch Breedables, LLC v. Ozimals, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amaretto Ranch Breedables, LLC
Represented By: Anne Elizabeth Kearns
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ozimals, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]