Perry v. AT&T Mobility LLC et al

Plaintiff: Sandra Perry
Defendant: AT&T Mobility LLC and Arise Virtual Solutions Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv01488
Filed: March 28, 2011
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 1, 2011 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF DEADLINES (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2011)
July 5, 2011 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting stipulation for filing dates for opposition and reply (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
July 6, 2011 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/7/2011 02:30 PM. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 7, 2011 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing cmc (with signature) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
September 12, 2011 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 28, 2011 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2011 02:30 PM. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2011)
April 9, 2012 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 77 Granting Stipulation for Leave to file filed by Sandra Perry. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/6/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
June 12, 2012 85 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT AT&T MOBILITY LLC ONLY WITHOUT PREJUDICE re 84 Stipulation filed by Sandra Perry, Armakia Mariner-Reed, AT&T Mobility LLC (a Delaware Corporation) terminated.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/12/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2012)
July 10, 2012 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 86 Stipulation for Leave for Plaintiffs to File a Third Amended Complaint AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT filed by Sandra Perry, Armakia Mariner-Reed. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/10/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
January 9, 2013 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge GONZALEZ ROGERS granting 90 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/9/2013: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit) (lrc, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perry v. AT&T Mobility LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Perry
Represented By: Kyle Roald Nordrehaug
Represented By: Norman B. Blumenthal
Represented By: Aparajit Bhowmik
Represented By: Mark Allen Osman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility LLC
Represented By: Douglas Evans Dexter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arise Virtual Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Chris A. Hollinger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]