Reeves & Associates, PLC v. Muller

Plaintiff: Reeves & Associates, PLC
Defendant: Matthew D. Muller
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv04762
Filed: September 23, 2011
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
 
Nature of Suit: Commercial/ICC Rates/etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 26, 2011 30 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO LIFT THE SEALING ORDER, by Judge William Alsup, granting 25 Motion Lift Sealing Order. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/26/2011: # 1 Certificate of Service) (wsn, COURT STAFF).
December 3, 2012 35 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING EX PARTE APPLICATION [re 34 Ex Parte Application For An Order To Show Case Why Defendant Should Not Be Held In Contempt Of The Court's October 14, 2011 Stipulated Order Granting Injuctive Relief and Protective Order filed by Reeves & Associates, PLC]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 12/3/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
December 24, 2012 41 Featured Case ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANT TO SHOW CAUSE RE CONTEMPT OF COURT by Hon. William Alsup granting in part 34 Ex Parte Application.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/24/2012: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2013 44 Featured Case ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE FROM DEFENDANT AND RESETTING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 1/24/2013 08:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 1/17/2013.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/10/13. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/10/2013: # 1 Certificate of Service) (tlS, COURT STAFF).
February 7, 2013 50 Featured Case ORDER SETTING HEARING DATE AND DEADLINES (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/7/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2013 58 Featured Case ORDER DENYING MOTION TO HOLD DEFENDANT IN CONTEMPT re 34 Ex Parte Application For An Order To Show Case Why Defendant Should Not Be Held In Contempt Of The Court's October 14, 2011 Stipulated Order Granting Injuctive Relief and Protective Order filed by Reeves & Associates, PLC, 41 Order on Ex Parte Application, (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2013)
April 17, 2013 66 Featured Case Posted in Error, Please DisregardORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 4/24/2013.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/17/2013. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2013) Modified on 4/17/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
April 17, 2013 67 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 4/24/2013.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/17/2013. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
May 31, 2013 75 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION RE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ENFORCE re 74 Reply to Opposition/Response filed by Reeves & Associates, PLC (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Reeves & Associates, PLC v. Muller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reeves & Associates, PLC
Represented By: Claudia J. Castillo
Represented By: Kerry McInerney Freeman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew D. Muller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]