Abreu v. Slide, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Christalee Abreu
Defendant: Slide, Inc. and Google, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00412
Filed: January 26, 2012
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 6, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVAULATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 6, 2012. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2012)
February 14, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 14 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/12/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2012)
April 3, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO REMAND AND VACATING HEARING by Hon. William Alsup denying 17 Motion to Remand.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2012)
May 23, 2012 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING AS MOOT MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT by Hon. William Alsup finding as moot 38 Motion to Compel.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2012)
July 12, 2012 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Judge William Alsup [granting 47 Motion to Compel]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Abreu v. Slide, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christalee Abreu
Represented By: Jay Edelson
Represented By: Rafey Sarkis Balabanian
Represented By: Bradley Michael Baglien
Represented By: Sean Patrick Reis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Slide, Inc.
Represented By: Benedict Y Hur
Represented By: Steven Keeley Taylor
Represented By: Robert Addy Van Nest
Represented By: Audrey Helena Walton-Hadlock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: Benedict Y Hur
Represented By: Steven Keeley Taylor
Represented By: Robert Addy Van Nest
Represented By: Audrey Helena Walton-Hadlock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]