Frid v. First Republic Bank et al

Defendant: Samdani Shaik and First Republic Bank
Plaintiff: Olga Frid
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00806
Filed: February 17, 2012
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
 
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 4, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 13 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/6/11. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2012)
May 2, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STAY ORDER AND VACATING HEARING AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge William Alsup [granting 7 Motion to Compel]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2012)
May 2, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE. Case Management Statement due by 1/24/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/31/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/2/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2012)
January 24, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Hon. William Alsup [granting 21 Stipulation]. Case management conference set for 5/2/2013 at 11:00 AM. Joint case management statement due 4/25/2013. THERE WILL BE NO FURTHER CONTINUANCES. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
March 18, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH REASSIGNMENT ORDER AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 3/25/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/8/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 18, 2013. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order, # 2 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
July 11, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CMC AND ORDER TO FILE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL re 30 Joint Case Management Statement filed by First Republic Bank, Olga Frid, Samdani Shaik. Dismissal or Joint Statement due by 9/6/2013. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 11, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2013)
September 9, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 32 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to File Joint Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice and [Proposed] Order filed by First Republic Bank, Samdani Shaik. Dismissal due by 10/7/2013. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 9, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2013)
October 9, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Setting Forth Briefing Schedule for Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate filed by First Republic Bank, Olga Frid, Samdani Shaik. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 9, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
January 30, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING re 36 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Award filed by Olga Frid. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 30, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
April 7, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD by Judge Jon S. Tigar, denying 36 Motion to Vacate. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
May 21, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 44 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 42 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award to Extend Time For Plaintiff to File Opposition filed by Olga Frid. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 21, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Frid v. First Republic Bank et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samdani Shaik
Represented By: Jahmal T. Davis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Republic Bank
Represented By: Jahmal T. Davis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olga Frid
Represented By: Spencer Freeman Smith
Represented By: Dow Wakefield Patten
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]