Smith v. United States Of America

Respondent: United States Of America
Petitioner: Ronald Smith
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv01358
Filed: March 19, 2012
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 8, 2012 11 Featured Case ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/8/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
October 1, 2012 23 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/1/12. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Certificate of Service)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2012)
October 1, 2012 24 Featured Case ORDER VACATING PRIOR ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/1/12. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Certificate of Service)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2012)
September 4, 2013 42 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER adopting 39 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/04/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
February 13, 2014 58 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Show Cause Response due by 2/21/2014. This Order will be vacated, however, if Smith files an opposition brief by February 21, 2014. Donahoe is ORDERED to serve this Order to Smith within one day. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/13/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/13/2014: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
March 6, 2014 70 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 52 Motion for Summary Judgment. The undisputed facts show that Mr. Smith filed his complaint with the Merit Systems Protection Board well after the time period that the law allows for him to do so. Accordingly, the defendants motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. The defendants motion for judgment on the pleadings is DENIED as moot.(jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Smith v. United States Of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Of America
Represented By: Richard R. Nelson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ronald Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]