Calkin et al v. City and County of San Francisco, California

Plaintiff: Donald Calkin, Gordon Clark, Silvia David, Sally Foster, John Higgins, Janet Lacampagne, Kenneth Sanchez, Colleen Sullivan and Lee Sullivan
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco, California
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv02584
Filed: May 18, 2012
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
 
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 26, 2012 33 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION 32 . Settlement Conference continued to 12/6/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 10/26/12. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2012)
November 8, 2012 35 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 34 STIPULATION to Continue Settlement Confereence filed by Donald Calkin, Lee Sullivan, Colleen Sullivan, Silvia David, Sally Foster, John Higgins, Janet Lacampagne, Gordon Clark, Kenneth Sanchez. Settlement Conference set for 1/10/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 11/7/2012. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
February 4, 2013 42 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING re 41 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Settlement Conference Date; Proposed Case Management Schedule filed by City and County of San Francisco, California. Updated Case Management Statement due by 6/7/2013. Further Case Management Conference re-set for 6/14/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing re-set for 10/4/2013 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel will be contacted by Judge Laporte's chambers to reschedule the settlement conference. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/4/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2013)
February 11, 2013 43 Featured Case ORDER CONTINUING THE FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Further Settlement Conference set for 5/31/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 2/11/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2013)
December 3, 2013 53 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING re 51 Stipulation To Continue Case Management Conference filed by City and County of San Francisco, California. Case Management Statement due by 2/7/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/14/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/3/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2013)
March 7, 2014 70 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING re 68 Stipulation of Dismissal only as to Plaintiffs Donald Calkin, Sally Foster, Janet Lacampagne, Kenneth Sanchez & Lee Sullivan & Dft CCSF with prejudice filed by City and County of San Francisco, California. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/7/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Calkin et al v. City and County of San Francisco, California
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Calkin
Represented By: Jocelyn Burton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gordon Clark
Represented By: Jocelyn Burton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silvia David
Represented By: Jocelyn Burton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally Foster
Represented By: Jocelyn Burton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Higgins
Represented By: Jocelyn Burton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Lacampagne
Represented By: Jocelyn Burton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Sanchez
Represented By: Jocelyn Burton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Sullivan
Represented By: Jocelyn Burton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Sullivan
Represented By: Jocelyn Burton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco, California
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]