United States of America v. Approximately $35,040 in United States Currency et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $35,040 in United States Currency and Approximately $36,085 in United States Currency
Claimant: Ahmed Almontaser and Hemiar Hidais
Case Number: 3:2012cv02703
Filed: May 25, 2012
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 27, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING AND SCHEDULE ON MOTION TO DISMISS as to 17 MOTION to Dismiss, 13 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 8/10/2012. Replies due by 8/17/2012. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/27/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2012)
October 1, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND VACATING HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/1/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2012)
January 4, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND GRANTING GOVERNMENT'S MOTION TO STRIKE CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/4/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2013)
March 14, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 30 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to (UNITED STATES' MOTION FOR A DEFAULT JUDGMENT) filed by United States of America. Plaintiff shall submit additional briefing by March 29, 2013, to address its entitlement to the entry of default judgment pursuant to the Eitel factors. Any opposition or statement of non-opposition is due no later than April 12, 2013. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2013 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 03/14/13. (dmrlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
April 18, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE . Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 04/18/13. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/18/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (igS, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White adopting Report and Recommendations and granting 30 Motion for Default Judgment. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
July 11, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/11/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $35,040 in United States Currency et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: David Countryman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $35,040 in United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $36,085 in United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ahmed Almontaser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Hemiar Hidais
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]