Internet Patents Corporation v. EBAGs, Inc et al

Defendant: EBAGs, Inc and Tellapart, Inc
Plaintiff: Internet Patents Corporation
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv03385
Filed: June 29, 2012
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 13, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE of referral and ORDER re discovery procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 2/13/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
May 7, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 48 Stipulation (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2013)
August 28, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ***DISREGARD, SEE DOCKET NO. 56 .*** ORDER GRANTING 47 MOTION TO STAY PENDING REEXAMINATION. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge 8/28/2013 on Saundra Brown Armstrong. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2013) Modified on 8/28/2013 (ndr, COURT STAFF).
August 28, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 47 MOTION TO STAY PENDING REEXAMINATION. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Saundra Brwon Armstrong on 8/28/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2013)
October 3, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Motion to Continue 5 . Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/30/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/3/12. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Internet Patents Corporation v. EBAGs, Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EBAGs, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tellapart, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Internet Patents Corporation
Represented By: L. Eric Loewe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]