Henderson et al v. United Airlines

Plaintiff: Lanida Green and Johnny Henderson
Defendant: United Airlines
Case Number: 3:2012cv03655
Filed: July 12, 2012
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 2, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF 19 . Mediation completion date is extended to 7/30/2013. All non-expert discovery shall be completed by 7/12/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. All other deadlines, including pretrial and trial dates, remain unchanged. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/2/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
May 17, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 21 Discovery Letter Brief. Response due by 5/24/2013. Discovery Hearing set for 5/29/2013 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 05/17/2013. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
June 24, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 26 Letter filed by Lanida Green, Johnny Henderson. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 6/24/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
September 27, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court REMINDER NOTICE OF UPCOMING TRIAL AND FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 10/23/2013 02:00 PM. Jury Trial set for 11/4/2013 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 9/26/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
October 17, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATE. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/17/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
December 20, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE re 41 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 12/20/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson et al v. United Airlines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lanida Green
Represented By: Sanford M. Cipinko
Represented By: Yuliya Magomedov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Henderson
Represented By: Yuliya Magomedov
Represented By: Sanford M. Cipinko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines
Represented By: Gina Joelle Beltramo
Represented By: Richard Grotch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.