Gray v. Astrue

Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Plaintiff: Clyde Gray
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv04014
Filed: July 31, 2012
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
 
Nature of Suit: Retirement and Survivors Benefits
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 2, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. The Court directs plaintiff to show cause in writing, no later than January 22, 2013, why the action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 2, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2013)
January 29, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR FOR REMAND; NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF. Plaintiff is ordered to file, no later than February 28, 2013, a motion for summary judgment or remand. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 29, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/29/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (wsn, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; GRANTING DEFENDANT'S CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 19, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/19/2013: # 1 Certificate of Service) (tlS, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT: Grays motion for summary judgment is hereby DENIED, and the Commissioners cross-motion for summary judgment is hereby GRANTED. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
August 21, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO INFORM COURT WHETHER THEY CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES. The parties are directed to advise the Court, no later than September 4, 2012, as to whether they consent to have a magistrate judge conduct all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 21, 2012. (Attachment: # 1 Form) (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/21/2012: # 2 Certificate of Service) (tlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Gray v. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Represented By: Armand D. Roth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clyde Gray
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]