United States Of America v. Snider

Petitioner: United States Of America
Respondent: Joseph R. Snider
Case Number: 3:2012cv05175
Filed: October 5, 2012
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402 IRS: Petition to Enforce IRS Summons
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 11, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/11/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
January 8, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO ENFORCE IRS SUMMONS re 12 Order on Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/8/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
January 14, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO ENFORCE IRS SUMMONS re 15 Proposed Order filed by United States Of America. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/14/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
October 19, 2012 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 12/6/2012 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/19/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Of America v. Snider
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States Of America
Represented By: Michael G. Pitman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joseph R. Snider
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]