LOWE v. GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY et al

Plaintiff: BEVERLY JAMES LOWE
Defendant: General Electric Company, General Dynamics Corporation, Warren Pumps LLC and Northrop Grumman Shipbuilding Inc
Case Number: 3:2012cv05227
Filed: October 11, 2012
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Asbestos Litigation
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 6, 2013 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 98 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF ASBESTOS EXPOSURE CLAIMS OCCURRING ON OR AFTER DECEMBER 5, 1980 FROM DEFENDANT HUNTINGTON INGALLS INCORPORATED filed by BEVERLY JAMES LOWE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/3/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2013)
September 17, 2013 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 102 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER DISMISSAL OF HUNTINGTON INGALLS INCORPORATED, ONLY, WITH PREJUDICE. filed by BEVERLY JAMES LOWE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/16/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
October 2, 2013 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 99 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by General Dynamics Corporation, 101 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by General Dynamics Corporation, Attorney Edward R. Hugo for General Dynamics Corporation added. Attorney James J. O'Brien; Todd Marshall Thacker; Keri Avellini Donohue and Gabriel A. Jackson terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/30/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013)
January 28, 2014 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 110 STIPULATION For Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC filed by Warren Pumps LLC. Warren Pumps LLC terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/27/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
May 8, 2014 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT STATUS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/8/2014. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2014)
July 31, 2014 123 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/31/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2014)
August 12, 2014 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ALLOWING TRIAL EQUIPMENT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/12/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2014)
August 25, 2014 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 156 DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF ASBESTOS EXPOSURE CLAIMS OCCURRING ON OR AFTER DECEMBER 5, 1980 FROM DEFENDANT GENERAL DYNAMICS CORPORATION. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/25/2014. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2014)
January 3, 2013 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/3/2013. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LOWE v. GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEVERLY JAMES LOWE
Represented By: Lance Randall Stewart
Represented By: Jason Michael Rose
Represented By: Richard Martin Grant
Represented By: David R. Donadio
Represented By: KIMBERLY J.W.J. CHU
Represented By: Alan R. Brayton
Represented By: Frank J. Anders
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: CHARLES T. SHELDON
Represented By: ALLISON M. LOW
Represented By: Derek S. Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Dynamics Corporation
Represented By: JAMES J. O'BRIEN
Represented By: Lyudmila Fedorovna Logvin
Represented By: GABRIEL A. JACKSON
Represented By: KERI A. DONOHUE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Represented By: Gregory David Meronek
Represented By: James Patrick Cunningham
Represented By: JEFFREY THAYER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrop Grumman Shipbuilding Inc
Represented By: Daniel James Kelly
Represented By: JOHN K SON
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]