Hightower et al v. City and County of San Francisco et al

Defendant: Angela Calvillo, City and County of San Francisco, David Chiu and Scott Weiner
Plaintiff: Mitch Hightower, Oxane "Gypsy" Taub, George Davis and Russell Mills
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv05841
Filed: November 14, 2012
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 20, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 5 Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order And Order to Show Cause why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue. Responses due by 12/20/2012. Replies due by 1/3/2013. Motion Hearing set for 1/17/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/20/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2012)
November 27, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER VACATING HEARING ON 13 MOTION to Certify Class . Parties to reset for a later time. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/27/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2012)
January 29, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 15 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; and Denying 5 Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
February 28, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING JOHN SINGLETON'S REQUEST TO RECONSIDER ITS ORDER OF 1/29/13. Copy e-mailed to John Singleton. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/28/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2013)
March 12, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 28 To Continue Initial Case Management Conference filed by Scott Weiner, City and County of San Francisco, Angela Calvillo, David Chiu Case Management Statement due by 5/30/2013. Case Management Conference set for 6/6/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/12/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2013)
March 21, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen denying 31 Plaintiffs' Application for Temporary Restraining Order (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
June 17, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/17/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013)
March 18, 2014 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE for 60 DAYS, STIPULATION AND ORDER re 75 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS AND TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF RUSSELL MILLS FROM THIS ACTION filed by George Davis, Oxane "Gypsy" Taub Case Manage ment Statement due by 7/17/2014. Further Case Management Conference/Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file second amended complaint set for 7/24/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/18/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
July 21, 2014 90 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 89 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONCERNING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by City and County of San Francisco, San Francisco Police Department, S et/Reset Deadlines as to 89 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONCERNING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, 86 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. Responses due by 8/6/2014. Replies due by 8/19/2014. Motion Hearing set for 9/11/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M.Chen on 7/21/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hightower et al v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Calvillo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Chiu
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Weiner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitch Hightower
Represented By: Christina Ann-Marie DiEdoardo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oxane "Gypsy" Taub
Represented By: Christina Ann-Marie DiEdoardo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Davis
Represented By: Christina Ann-Marie DiEdoardo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Mills
Represented By: Christina Ann-Marie DiEdoardo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]