Intelligent Smart Phone Concepts LLC v. Apple, Inc Featured Case

Plaintiff: Intelligent Smart Phone Concepts LLC
Defendant: Apple, Inc
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv05951
Filed: November 20, 2012
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
February 20, 2013 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Intelligent Smart Phone Concepts LLC (Daghighian, Sepehr) (Filed on 2/20/2013)
January 9, 2013 14 Featured Case ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/4/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/11/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/9/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
January 3, 2013 13 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant Apple Inc. to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement filed by Apple, Inc., Intelligent Smart Phone Concepts LLC. (Thayer, M.) (Filed on 1/3/2013) Modified on 1/4/2013 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
December 21, 2012 12 NOTICE of Appearance of M. Patricia Thayer, Philip W. Woo, and Aseem S. Gupta as Counsel, filed by Apple, Inc. (Thayer, M.) (Filed on 12/21/2012) Modified on 12/26/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 21, 2012 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Apple, Inc., filed by Intelligent Smart Phone Concepts LLC. (Daghighian, Sepehr) (Filed on 12/21/2012) Modified on 12/26/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 17, 2012 10 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Hon. Maxine M. Chesney no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/17/12. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2012)
December 14, 2012 9 Featured Case ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 14, 2012. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2012)
December 14, 2012 8 Featured Case ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/14/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2012)
December 14, 2012 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2012)
December 13, 2012 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Intelligent Smart Phone Concepts LLC.. (Daghighian, Sepehr) (Filed on 12/13/2012)
December 13, 2012 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Intelligent Smart Phone Concepts LLC. Apple, Inc served on 12/11/2012, answer due 1/2/2013. (Daghighian, Sepehr) (Filed on 12/13/2012)
November 27, 2012 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding:PATENT INFRINGEMENT (cc: form mailed to register). (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2012)
November 20, 2012 3 Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2012)
November 20, 2012 2 Featured Case ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 2/14/2013. Case Management Conference set for 2/21/2013 10:30 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 11/20/12. (Attachments: # 1 LB Standing Order, # 2 Standing Order)(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2012)
November 20, 2012 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT; JURY TRIAL DEMANDED; against Apple, Inc ( Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 34611080801.). Filed byIntelligent Smart Phone Concepts LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Intelligent Smart Phone Concepts LLC v. Apple, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intelligent Smart Phone Concepts LLC
Represented By: Sepehr Daghighian
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc
Represented By: Aseem Saran Gupta
Represented By: M. Patricia Thayer
Represented By: Philip W. Woo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]