Gizzarelli v. City and County of San Francisco et al

Defendant: John Denny, Rebecca Katz, Vicious and Dangerous Dog Unit of the San Francisco Police Department, City and County of San Francisco and Animal Care and Control
Plaintiff: David Gizzarelli
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv06568
Filed: December 31, 2012
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 8, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE (60 days conditional dismissal). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/7/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2013)
December 31, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case Reassigned to Charles R. Breyer Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to this case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/31/12. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2012)
December 31, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 1/11/2013 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/31/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2012)
January 7, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING PARTIES TO ATTEND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/7/2013. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Gizzarelli v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Denny
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Katz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicious and Dangerous Dog Unit of the San Francisco Police Department
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Represented By: Margaret W. Baumgartner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Animal Care and Control
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Gizzarelli
Represented By: John Frederick Mounier, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]