Suelen v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al

Defendant: Golden West Savings Association Service Co., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation
Plaintiff: Geraldine P. Suelen
Case Number: 3:2013cv00002
Filed: January 2, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 11, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Status Report re: service on Defendant Cal-Western due by 2/19/2013.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/11/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2013)
February 21, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Show Cause Response due by 2/27/2013.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/21/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2013)
February 28, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Show Cause Response due by 3/5/2013.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/28/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2013)
February 28, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE ATTACHED NOTICE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/28/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/28/2013: # 1 Clerk's Notice) (cdnS, COURT STAFF).
March 7, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING SECOND OSC; ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ADR UNIT FOR ASSESSMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/7/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
March 7, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CMC AND RELATED DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/7/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
April 1, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REMANDING CASE;finding as moot 8 Motion to Dismiss; granting 11 Motion to Remand (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suelen v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden West Savings Association Service Co.
Represented By: Elizabeth Christine Hehir
Represented By: Robert Arthur Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Elizabeth Christine Hehir
Represented By: Robert Arthur Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geraldine P. Suelen
Represented By: William E. Gilg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.