L. et al v. Oakland Unified School District

Defendant: Oakland Unified School District
Plaintiff: N. L. and Yvonne Rutherford
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00488
Filed: February 4, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1401 Education: Handicapped Child Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 10, 2013 14 Featured Case CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re 12 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by N. L., Yvonne Rutherford. Mandy G. Leigh is substituted as counsel of record in place of LaJoyce L. Porter. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 06/10/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
July 31, 2013 38 Featured Case ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO FILE SURREPLY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/31/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
September 23, 2013 45 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER TO VACATE HEARING DATE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/23/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2013)
December 12, 2013 48 Featured Case STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 1/16/2014 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 1/13/2014. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/12/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2013)
January 13, 2014 50 Featured Case ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/13/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
March 7, 2013 8 Featured Case ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/7/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: L. et al v. Oakland Unified School District
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakland Unified School District
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N. L.
Represented By: LaJoyce Lachelle Porter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Rutherford
Represented By: LaJoyce Lachelle Porter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]