Commodity Forwarders, Inc. v. Federal Express Corporation

Defendant: Federal Express Corporation
Plaintiff: Commodity Forwarders, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00502
Filed: February 5, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 25, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 11 Stipulation selecting Mediation (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2013)
August 28, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING MEDIATION AND DISCOVERY DEADLINES; ORDER VACATING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/28/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2013)
February 25, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Commodity Forwarders, Inc. v. Federal Express Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Express Corporation
Represented By: Robert R. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commodity Forwarders, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Marc Weinfield
Represented By: Ronald C. Chauvel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.