Raymat Materials, Inc. v. A&C Catalysts, Inc.

Plaintiff: Raymat Materials, Inc.
Defendant: A&C Catalysts, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00567
Filed: February 8, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 2, 2014 107 Featured Case ORDER RE RAYMATS MOTION FOR AN ORDER FINDING A&C CATALYSTS AND COUNSEL IN CIVIL CONTEMPT. Response due by noon on May 6, 2014.. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 2, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
May 8, 2014 110 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS FEES FOR OPPOSING CIVIL CONTEMPT MOTION re 75 MOTION for Sanctions MOTION FOR AN ORDER FINDING DEFENDANT A&C CATALYSTS, INC. AND ITS COUNSEL IN CIVIL CONTEMPT filed by Raymat Materials, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 8, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2014)
May 9, 2014 114 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING TWO MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE DISCLOSURE AGREEMENTS AND DENYING ALL OTHERS re 65 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Protameen Chemicals, Inc., 64 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Raymat Materials, Inc.. Signed by Judge William Alsup on May 9, 2014. (whalc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 28, 2014 120 Featured Case ORDER. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/27/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
May 30, 2014 122 Featured Case ORDER RE SEALED TRANSCRIPT re 121 Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/30/14. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2014)
June 9, 2014 125 Featured Case NOTICE REGARDING UPCOMING TRIAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 9, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2014)
May 20, 2013 18 Featured Case ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS by Hon. William Alsup finding as moot 5 Motion to Dismiss.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
July 12, 2013 24 Featured Case ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge William Alsup [denying 19 Motion to Dismiss]. Answer is due by noon on 7/22/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2013)
July 26, 2013 28 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION by Hon. William Alsup granting 23 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2013)
October 31, 2013 39 Featured Case ORDER DENYING THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Hon. William Alsup denying 33 Motion to Dismiss.(whalc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2013)
December 2, 2013 43 Featured Case ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER 42 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Protective Order filed by Protameen Chemicals, Inc., Raymat Materials, Inc. SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 2, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
February 12, 2014 45 Featured Case ORDER SETTING HEARING RE PLAINTIFF AND THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 44 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Raymat Materials, Inc.]. Responses due by noon on 2/14/2014. One-and-one-half hour meet-and-confer from 9:00--10:30 A.M. 2/18/2014 in Court's jury room. Discovery Hearing set for 2/18/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 2/12/2014. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2014)
February 25, 2014 51 Featured Case ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEY'S FEES re 50 Declaration in Support, filed by A&C Catalysts, Inc., Motions terminated: 44 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Raymat Materials, Inc... Signed by Judge Alsup on February 25, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
February 27, 2014 53 Featured Case ORDER VACATING FEBRUARY 25 ORDER AND GRANTING LEAVE TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS DECLARATIONS BY FEBRUARY 28 re 50 Declaration in Support, filed by A&C Catalysts, Inc., vacating 51 Order Awarding Attorney's Fees, Responses due by noon on 3/3/2014.. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 27, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
March 6, 2014 55 Featured Case ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEYS FEES re 50 Declaration in Support, filed by A&C Catalysts, Inc., 54 Letter filed by Raymat Materials, Inc., 44 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Raymat Materials, Inc., 53 Order,, Set Deadlines,. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 6, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
March 25, 2014 62 Featured Case ORDER DENYING AS MOOT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR AMENDED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECONDAMENDED COMPLAINT AND REQUEST TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER re 56 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Raymat Materials, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 25, 2014. Opposition due April 7 and Reply due April 14.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
April 8, 2014 70 Featured Case ORDER SETTING HEARING RE A&C CATALYSTS DISCOVERY DISPUTE AND REQUESTING AMENDED CHAMBERS COPIES re 68 Discovery Letter Brief regarding Defendant A&C's Motion to Compel Emmanuel Balsamides, Sr., Alexis Wade, and Protameen Chemicals, I nc. to Appear for Completion of Deposition (Dkt. 67) filed by A&C Catalysts, Inc. Responses due by 4/11/2014. Three hour meet-and-confer from 7:30--10:30 A.M. 4/15/2014 in Court's jury room. Motion Hearing set for 4/15/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 8, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
April 9, 2014 72 Featured Case ORDER RESETTING DISCOVERY HEARING TO APRIL 22 AND MODIFYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 70 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, 71 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CHANGING RESPONSE TIME AND HEARING TIME filed by A&C Catalysts, Inc. Discovery Hearing set for 4/22/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.Responses due by noon on 4/15/2014. Three hour meet-and-confer from 7:30--10:30 A.M. 4/22/2014 in Court's jury room. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 8, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2014)
April 22, 2014 91 Featured Case ORDER DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL, ISSUING COURT ORDERED INTERROGATORIES, VACATING HEARING, AND DENYING MOTION TO EXTEND SCHEDULE OR SERVE FURTHER DISCOVERY REQUESTS by Judge Alsup denying 67 Motion to Compel; denying 68 Discovery Letter Brief; denying 77 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2014)
April 22, 2014 92 Featured Case ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, DENYING REQUEST TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER, AND VACATING HEARING by Judge Alsup denying 61 Motion for Leave to File (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2014)
April 30, 2013 9 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/2012. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Raymat Materials, Inc. v. A&C Catalysts, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymat Materials, Inc.
Represented By: J. James Li
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A&C Catalysts, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]