Yu v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company et al

Defendant: General Insurance Company of America, Safeco Insurance Company of America and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Jengtuan Yu
Case Number: 3:2013cv00585
Filed: February 11, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 20, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/20/13. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
June 18, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 22 Stipulation for partial dismissal (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2013)
August 6, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 8/6/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yu v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Stacy Monahan Tucker
Represented By: Pamela E. Cogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Stacy Monahan Tucker
Represented By: Pamela E. Cogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Stacy Monahan Tucker
Represented By: Pamela E. Cogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jengtuan Yu
Represented By: Andrew Ryan Neilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.