Brixham Solutions LTD v. Juniper Networks, Inc.

Defendant: Juniper Networks, Inc.
Plaintiff: Brixham Solutions LTD
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00616
Filed: February 12, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 17, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DOCUMENT PRODUCTION PROTOCOL. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/17/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2013)
July 17, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING REDUCTION OF CLAIMS AND PRIOR ART. Signed by Judge Joseph C.Spero on 7/17/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2013)
January 7, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 54 Stipulation of Dismissal of Claims, Counterclaims, and Affirmative Defenses Under U.S. Patent No. '621 filed by Brixham Solutions LTD. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/6/2014. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2014)
January 22, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part 49 Motion to Dismiss with leave to amend (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2014).
April 28, 2014 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 70 Motion to Stay, vacating all dates in case and setting Case Management Conference for September 19, 2014 at 2:00 p.m. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Brixham Solutions LTD v. Juniper Networks, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juniper Networks, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brixham Solutions LTD
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Mark S. Carlson
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]