Snowden v. Sprint Nextel Corporation

Plaintiff: Kim Snowden
Defendant: Sprint Nextel Corporation
Case Number: 3:2013cv00653
Filed: February 13, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 27, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER, Case referred to Private ADR. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/13/2014 10:00 AM; Pretrial Conference set for 8/14/2014 10:00 AM; Jury Selection set for 8/25/2014 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 8/25/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/27/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2013)
December 16, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND NON-EXPERT DISCOVERY DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/16/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
March 13, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER, Case referred to mediation. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/13/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2014)
May 1, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/1/14. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snowden v. Sprint Nextel Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Snowden
Represented By: Joseph C. Wilson
Represented By: Michelle Therese Duval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint Nextel Corporation
Represented By: Harold M. Brody
Represented By: Julia Brodsky
Represented By: George Samuel Cleaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.