Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. KFx Medical Corporation

Defendant: KFx Medical Corporation
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Case Number: 3:2013cv00710
Filed: February 19, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 17, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 33 Stipulation to Modify Briefing Schedule on KFx' Reply on 17 Motion to Dismiss. Replies due by 4/26/2013.Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on April 17, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
April 22, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 35 STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Motions and Case Management Conference. Motion Hearing set for 7/12/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Case Management Statement due by 7/3/2013. Case Management Conference set for 7/12/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/22/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2013)
July 11, 2013 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/11/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2013)
July 12, 2013 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING 17 MOtion to Dismiss and 22 , 28 , 47 Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on July 12, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2013)
August 9, 2013 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 65 Request to Continue Case Management Conference: Case Management Statement due by 11/8/2013. Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/9/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
March 13, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/13/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. KFx Medical Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KFx Medical Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: Dean J. McElroy
Represented By: Bruce D. Celebrezze
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]