Munich Re Underwriting Limited v. Glacier Bay, Inc.

Defendant: Glacier Bay, Inc.
Plaintiff: Munich Re Underwriting Limited and Jimmy and Ann Belson
Case Number: 3:2013cv00762
Filed: February 20, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Marine Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING OCTOBER 4, 2013 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on September 24, 2013. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
June 20, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 06/20/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2014)
March 7, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Samuel Conti. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/7/13. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Munich Re Underwriting Limited v. Glacier Bay, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glacier Bay, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Munich Re Underwriting Limited
Represented By: Rupert P. Hansen
Represented By: Marc Avram Centor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy and Ann Belson
Represented By: Jared A. Washkowitz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]