Carter et al v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation et al

Defendant: County of Alameda, City of Newark, State of California, Union Pacific Railroad Company, National Railroad Passenger Corporation, City of Fremont, Ohlone Community College District and East Bay Dischargers Authority
Plaintiff: Kimberly Carter and G. Carter
Case Number: 3:2013cv00809
Filed: February 21, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 20, 2014 113 Opinion or Order of the Court Discovery Order re 111 joint letter. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on May 20, 2014. (jcslc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2014)
July 18, 2014 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 145 Letter filed by Kimberly Carter, G. Carter. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on July 18, 2014. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2014)
August 8, 2014 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part 118 Motion for Summary Judgment (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2014)
September 18, 2014 152 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/18/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
June 28, 2013 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 46 Motion to Dismiss with leave to amend; granting 47 Motion to Dismiss with leave to amend; granting 57 Motion to Dismiss with leave to amend. (jcslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2013)
February 27, 2014 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 98 Proposed Order/Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Expert Disclosures filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/27/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter et al v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Alameda
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Newark
Represented By: Erika Jean Scott
Represented By: Gregg Anthony Thornton, Esq.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Represented By: Barbara Jean Wills-Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: B. Clyde Hutchinson
Represented By: Scott Owen LaFranchi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: Scott Owen LaFranchi
Represented By: B. Clyde Hutchinson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Fremont
Represented By: Gregory Mellon Fox
Represented By: Meaghan Ann Snyder
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohlone Community College District
Represented By: Joshua Karl Clendenin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Bay Dischargers Authority
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Carter
Represented By: Jennifer L. Fiore
Represented By: Mary E. Alexander
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G. Carter
Represented By: Jennifer L. Fiore
Represented By: Mary E. Alexander
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]