Public.Resource.org v. Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Contractors' National Association, Inc. Featured Case

Defendant: Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Contractors' National Association, Inc.
Plaintiff: Public.Resource.org
Case Number: 3:2013cv00815
Filed: February 22, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Nevada
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2013 39 STIPULATED JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 07/09/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2013)
July 8, 2013 38 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Public.Resource.org. (Bridges, Andrew) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
June 25, 2013 37 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Time for Settlement Purposes. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 22 MOTION for Default Judgment. Replies due by 7/11/2013. Motion Hearing set for 7/26/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 06/25/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
June 24, 2013 36 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 35 Stipulation and Order, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings, 22 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendant Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Contractors' National Association, Inc. Extending Time for Settlement Purposes filed by Public.Resource.org, Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Contractors' National Association, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kathleen Lu in Support of Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Extend Time for Settlement Purposes)(Lu, Kathleen) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
June 20, 2013 35 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Time to Reply. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 22 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court. Replies due by 6/27/2013. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 06/19/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
June 18, 2013 34 Declaration of Kathleen Lu in Support of 33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 22 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendant Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Contractors' National Association, Inc. filed byPublic.Resource.org. (Related document(s) 33 ) (Lu, Kathleen) (Filed on 6/18/2013)
June 18, 2013 33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 22 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendant Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Contractors' National Association, Inc. filed by Public.Resource.org. (Lu, Kathleen) (Filed on 6/18/2013)
June 17, 2013 32 EXHIBITS re 30 Declaration in Support, of Vincent R. Sandusky filed bySheet Metal and Air Conditioning Contractors' National Association, Inc.. (Related document(s) 30 ) (Napolitan, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/17/2013)
June 17, 2013 31 Declaration of Jon L. Farnsworth in Support of 30 Declaration in Support, filed bySheet Metal and Air Conditioning Contractors' National Association, Inc.. (Related document(s) 30 ) (Napolitan, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/17/2013)
June 17, 2013 30 Declaration of Vincent R. Sandusky in Support of 29 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed bySheet Metal and Air Conditioning Contractors' National Association, Inc.. (Related document(s) 29 ) (Napolitan, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/17/2013)
June 17, 2013 29 RESPONSE (re 22 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendant Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Contractors' National Association, Inc. ) filed bySheet Metal and Air Conditioning Contractors' National Association, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A)(Napolitan, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/17/2013)
June 3, 2013 28 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting 24 Motion to Postpone Case Management Conference and Associated Deadlines.(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2013)
May 31, 2013 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Public.Resource.org re 23 Proposed Order, 22 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendant Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Contractors' National Association, Inc. on Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Contractors' National Association, Inc. (Varellas, James) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
May 31, 2013 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Public.Resource.org re 23 Proposed Order, 22 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendant Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Contractors' National Association, Inc. on Jon L. Farnsworth (Varellas, James) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
May 30, 2013 25 Proposed Order re 24 MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference and Associated Deadlines by Public.Resource.org. (Varellas, James) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
May 30, 2013 24 MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference and Associated Deadlines filed by Public.Resource.org. (Varellas, James) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
May 29, 2013 23 Proposed Order re 22 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendant Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Contractors' National Association, Inc. by Public.Resource.org. (Bridges, Andrew) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
May 29, 2013 22 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendant Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Contractors' National Association, Inc. filed by Public.Resource.org. Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Responses due by 6/12/2013. Replies due by 6/19/2013. (Bridges, Andrew) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
May 24, 2013 21 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Varellas, James) (Filed on 5/24/2013)
May 8, 2013 20 Clerks Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Contractors' National Association, Inc. All parties noticed via e-mail or U.S. mail. (Related documents(s) 19 )(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2013)
May 6, 2013 19 MOTION for Entry of Default Correction of Docket # 17 filed by Public.Resource.org. (Varellas, James) (Filed on 5/6/2013)
May 6, 2013 18 Declaration of Corynne McSherry in Support of 17 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Clerk as to Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Contractors' National Association, Inc. filed byPublic.Resource.org. (Related document(s) 17 ) (Varellas, James) (Filed on 5/6/2013)
May 6, 2013 17 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 19 . *** MOTION for Default Judgment by the Clerk as to Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Contractors' National Association, Inc. filed by Public.Resource.org. (Varellas, James) (Filed on 5/6/2013) Modified on 5/7/2013 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 16 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE. *** CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 6/7/2013. Case Management Conference set for 6/14/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) Modified on 5/6/2013 (tmi, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 15 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 6/7/2013. Case Management Conference set for 6/14/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013)
May 3, 2013 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Lu (Lu, Kathleen) (Filed on 5/3/2013)
May 3, 2013 13 NOTICE of Appearance by James John Varellas, III (Varellas, James) (Filed on 5/3/2013)
May 3, 2013 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew P. Bridges (Bridges, Andrew) (Filed on 5/3/2013)
March 20, 2013 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Public.Resource.org. Service waived by Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Contractors' National Association, Inc. waiver sent on 3/1/2013, answer due 4/30/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(McSherry, Corynne) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
March 18, 2013 10 CLERK'S NOTICE on Reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 5/31/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/7/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
March 14, 2013 9 Featured Case ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Samuel Conti. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/14/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
March 13, 2013 8 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2013)
March 13, 2013 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Public.Resource.org.. (McSherry, Corynne) (Filed on 3/13/2013)
February 26, 2013 6 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2013)
February 25, 2013 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7504800.) filed by Public.Resource.org. (Halperin, David) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
February 22, 2013 4 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT (cc: form mailed to register). (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2013)
February 22, 2013 3 Featured Case ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 5/16/2013. Case Management Conference set for 5/23/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/22/13. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2013)
February 22, 2013 2 Summons Issued as to Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Contractors' National Association, Inc.. (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2013)
February 22, 2013 1 COMPLAINT against Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Contractors' National Association, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611083462.). Filed byPublic.Resource.org. (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/25/2013: # 1 Complaint and Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B to O) (gaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Public.Resource.org v. Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Contractors' National Association, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Contractors' National Association, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Public.Resource.org
Represented By: Matthew Zimmerman
Represented By: Corynne McSherry
Represented By: James John Varellas, III
Represented By: Kathleen Lu
Represented By: David E Halperin
Represented By: Andrew P. Bridges
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]