Faraldi v. Morss et al

Defendant: Harold Anderson, Dragon Aviation, Inc., Robert Duncan Jeffrey and David Morss
Plaintiff: Donna L. Faraldi
Case Number: 3:2013cv00853
Filed: February 25, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 4, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED. Plaintiff is ordered to show cause, in writing and no later than April 26, 2013, why the instant action should not be dismissed without prejudice to plaintiffs pursuing her claims in the Middle District of Tennessee. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 4, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2013)
April 9, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT MORSS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENT IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 9, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2013)
April 30, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFFORDING DEFENDANT MORSS OPPORTUNITY TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR STAY; CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Defendant's response to plaintiff's request for a 90-day stay, if any, shall be filed no later than May 15, 2013. The hearing on defendant's motion is continued from May 10, 2013 to June 14, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 30, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
May 17, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DEEMING DEFENDANT'S 10 MOTION TO DISMISS WITHDRAWN. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 17, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
May 17, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE; SETTING DATE FOR FURTHER RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Proceedings in the above-titled action are stayed until July 26, 2013, on or before which date plaintiff shall file a further response to the above-referenced Order to Show Cause. The May 31, 2013 Case Management Conference is continued to August 30, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 17, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
July 29, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING STAY; SETTING DATE FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OR FURTHER RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The stay is extended to October 11, 2013, on or before which date plaintiff shall file either a dismissal of the action or further response to the Order to Show Cause. The August 30, 2013 case management conference is vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 29, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2013)
March 7, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/7/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faraldi v. Morss et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dragon Aviation, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Duncan Jeffrey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Morss
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna L. Faraldi
Represented By: Timothy John Ryan
Represented By: Rebekka R. Martorano
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]