By The Glass, LLC v. Franmara, Inc.

Defendant: Franmara, Inc.
Plaintiff: By The Glass, LLC
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00879
Filed: February 27, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 8, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 Stipulated Protective Order filed by Franmara, Inc.. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on July 8, 2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
April 21, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 5/7/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 04/21/2014. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
May 2, 2014 62 Opinion or Order of the Court Order denying, without prejudice, 61 Stipulated Dismissal of Entire Action. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 5/2/2014.(blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: By The Glass, LLC v. Franmara, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franmara, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Warren Payne
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: By The Glass, LLC
Represented By: Stuart Orin Lowry
Represented By: Scott Matthew Lowry
Represented By: Chris Kao
Represented By: Richard Steven Swope
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]