Quintal Research Group, Inc. -v- Nintendo

Defendant: Nintendo Company, Ltd. and Nintendo of America
Plaintiff: Quintal Research Group, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00888
Filed: February 27, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 11, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER, Case referred to mediation.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 6/11/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
August 9, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 38 Stipulation Selecting Mediation (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
October 2, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 44 Motion for Leave to File Physical Exhibits. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013)
October 29, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING.Set/Reset Hearing as to Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing set for 1/14/2014 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 10/29/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2013)
May 22, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 63 Stipulation Changing Time re 43 Scheduling Order. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2014)
August 14, 2014 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge re 67 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 8/14/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2014)
August 28, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to William R. Hill, Carolyn E. Barreno, and Donahue Fitzgerald LLP to provide declaration for in camera review; setting hearing for September 11, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on August 28, 2014. (jsclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2014)
March 12, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/12/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Quintal Research Group, Inc. -v- Nintendo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nintendo Company, Ltd.
Represented By: Grant Edward Kinsel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nintendo of America
Represented By: Grant Edward Kinsel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quintal Research Group, Inc.
Represented By: Christian John Martinez
Represented By: William R. Hill
Represented By: Carolyn Elyse Barreno
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]