Jones v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Paul A. Jones
Case Number: 3:2013cv00903
Filed: February 28, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 29, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins granting 12 Motion to Dismiss. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
July 23, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 7/23/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
August 2, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins Denying 27 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Kenneth Allen Franklin
Represented By: Robert Arthur Bailey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul A. Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]