Sugiharto v. Synarc, Inc et al

Defendant: Synarc, Inc and Aaron Timm
Plaintiff: Carolina Sugiharto
Case Number: 3:2013cv00921
Filed: February 28, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS The deadline to hold the mediation is October 1, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 31, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
November 7, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT STIPULATION BY THE PARTIES TO ALLOW PLAINTIFF TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; ORDER; DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 7, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2013)
December 20, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 20, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
February 10, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 2/7/2014. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
April 30, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 30, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2014)
June 30, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND RELATED STIPULATION PER FRCP 41(a)(l)(A)(ii); ORDER THEREON. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 30, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sugiharto v. Synarc, Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synarc, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Timm
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolina Sugiharto
Represented By: Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Mana Barari
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]