Irish Help at Home LLC. et al v. Melville et al

Plaintiff: Irish Help at Home LLC. and Bridget McDermott
Defendant: Rosemary Melville, Alexander Mayorkas, U.S. Department of Homeland Security and Janet Napolitano
Case Number: 3:2013cv00943
Filed: March 1, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petition
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 21, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Unopposed Motion to Vacate Stay and Request for Order Changing Time re 11 Notice (Other), filed by Rosemary Melville, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Alexander Mayorkas, Janet Napolitano. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/21/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2013)
May 2, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 17 Status Report filed by Rosemary Melville, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Alexander Mayorkas, Janet Napolitano. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/2/2014. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
June 18, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 20 Status Report filed by Rosemary Melville, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Alexander Mayorkas, Janet Napolitano. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/18/2014. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2014)
November 6, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Granting 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment. Motions due by 11/24/2014. Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2015. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/6/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2014)
January 21, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: preparation for hearing on cross-motions for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on January 21, 2015. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2015)
February 24, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 28 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and denying 29 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2015)
June 3, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2013)
September 4, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 6 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Irish Help at Home LLC. et al v. Melville et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irish Help at Home LLC.
Represented By: James M. Byrne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridget McDermott
Represented By: James M. Byrne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosemary Melville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.