Arko v. Group Long Term Disability Plan for Employees of Moor South/Pier Management Co. L.P. et al

Defendant: Plan Number 502, Moor South/Pier Management Co. L.P., Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company and Group Long Term Disability Plan for Employees of Moor South/Pier Management Co. L.P.
Plaintiff: Fred C. Arko
Case Number: 3:2013cv01044
Filed: March 7, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 11, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court TENTATIVE SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/15/2013 is CONTINUED to Monday, 7/22/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/11/2013. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2013)
July 12, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER; ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Discovery cutoff 1/31/2014. Mediation Cutoff is 11/15/13. Motions filing cutoff/Opening Trial Briefs by 2/28/2014. Motion Hearing set for 4/22/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. The Case Management Conference scheduled for 7/22/2013 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/12/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2013)
October 10, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 51 Defendant Hartford's Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Judgment is DENIED. Within five days of the entry of this Order, the parties will file a proposed form of judgment for this Court's approval. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2014)
October 31, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT, ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/31/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arko v. Group Long Term Disability Plan for Employees of Moor South/Pier Management Co. L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plan Number 502, Moor South/Pier Management Co. L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Group Long Term Disability Plan for Employees of Moor South/Pier Management Co. L.P.
Represented By: Kenneth L. Dziesinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred C. Arko
Represented By: Constantin Vincent Roboostoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.