Waves Audio Ltd et al v. Motorola Mobility LLC et al

Defendant: Motorola Mobility LLC and Motorola Trademark Holdings, LLC
Plaintiff: Waves Audio Ltd and Waves Inc
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01091
Filed: March 11, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 3, 2013 21 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 20 selecting Mediation by Waves Audio Ltd and Defendants filed by Waves Audio Ltd, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/3/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2013)
June 24, 2013 29 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 24 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Enlarging Time for Initial Disclosures filed by Waves Audio Ltd. Signed by Judge EDWARD M. CHEN on 6/21/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
December 3, 2013 40 Featured Case CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/03/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Waves Audio Ltd et al v. Motorola Mobility LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorola Mobility LLC
Represented By: Kevin Joon Oh
Represented By: Thomas Mark Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorola Trademark Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Kevin Joon Oh
Represented By: Thomas Mark Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waves Audio Ltd
Represented By: Bradley Dalton Coburn
Represented By: Perry Reed Clark
Represented By: John Scott Denko
Represented By: R. Floyd Walker
Represented By: Sherri A. Wilson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waves Inc
Represented By: Perry Reed Clark
Represented By: Bradley Dalton Coburn
Represented By: John Scott Denko
Represented By: R. Floyd Walker
Represented By: Sherri A. Wilson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]