Leonberger v. Wells Fargo Bank et al

Defendant: Kevin Robertson, Wells Fargo Bank and Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation
Plaintiff: Lidia Leonberger
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01114
Filed: March 12, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 25, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 6 Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
September 19, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 22 Motion to Dismiss (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/19/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (nah, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 9/19/2013. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/19/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (nah, COURT STAFF).
November 13, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 27 Motion for Attorney Fees (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Leonberger v. Wells Fargo Bank et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Robertson
Represented By: Christopher Alan Carr
Represented By: Tim Gordon Ceperley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Represented By: Tim Gordon Ceperley
Represented By: Christopher Alan Carr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation
Represented By: Tim Gordon Ceperley
Represented By: Christopher Alan Carr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lidia Leonberger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]