Perry et al v. Fantasy Records et al

Defendant: Paul Zaentz, Fantasy Records and Saul Zaentz Company
Plaintiff: Barney Perry and Perryal Music Company
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01158
Filed: March 14, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 25, 2014 110 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING 107 MOTION TO REOPEN THE CASE. (terminating 102 Motion for Leave to File). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2014)
June 5, 2014 114 Featured Case ORDER. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 6/5/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
April 18, 2013 21 Featured Case REFERRAL TO LEGAL HELP CENTER. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 4/18/13. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
April 18, 2013 22 Featured Case SUA SPONTE JUDICIAL REFERRAL FOR PURPOSES OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP OF CASES. This case is referred to Judge Sandra Brown Armstrong to determine whether it is related to Perry v. Zaentz, et al, Case No. 4:95-cv-03881 SBA. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 4/18/13. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
May 13, 2013 31 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE 30 . Plaintiff must contact the Courtroom Deputy at 415.522.2039 to provide a contact number for this appearance. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/13/13. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
May 17, 2013 35 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE 32 . Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/11/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/17/13. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
March 18, 2013 5 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in forma pauperis 3 and that the Clerk issue summons. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 3/18/13. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
February 14, 2014 91 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 14 MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 2/13/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Perry et al v. Fantasy Records et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Zaentz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fantasy Records
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saul Zaentz Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barney Perry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perryal Music Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]