Pragmatus AV, LLC v. Yahoo!, Inc

Defendant: Yahoo!, Inc
Plaintiff: Pragmatus AV, LLC
Case Number: 3:2013cv01176
Filed: March 15, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 19, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 36 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Certain Deadlines filed by Yahoo!, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/19/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
April 4, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 47 Joint Request for Equipment in the Courtroom Necessary for Markman Tutorial. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/4/2014. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2014).
May 13, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/13/2014. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2014)
June 24, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 57 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Yahoo!, Inc Case Management Statement due by 7/3/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/10/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/24/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2014)
March 21, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Edward M. Chen. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/21/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
August 26, 2014 74 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 73 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE filed by Pragmatus AV, LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/26/2014. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2014)
April 3, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/3/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pragmatus AV, LLC v. Yahoo!, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yahoo!, Inc
Represented By: Mansi Hasendra Shah
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pragmatus AV, LLC
Represented By: Ian Neville Feinberg
Represented By: Elizabeth Day
Represented By: Marc Christopher Belloli
Represented By: David L. Alberti
Represented By: Yakov M. Zolotorev
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]