Buckley v. Kessler et al

Defendant: R. A. Kessler, Anthony Hedgpeth, Matthew Cate and J. D. Lozano
Plaintiff: Antonio Cortez Buckley
Case Number: 3:2013cv01238
Filed: March 20, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Monterey
Referring Judge: PSLC MSH
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 5, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 5, 2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2013)
October 21, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 21, 2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2013)
July 10, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE COMPLETED NON-PRISONER IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION; DIRECTIONS TO CLERK; granting 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Antonio Cortez Buckley; re 6 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 10, 2013. (Attachments: # 1 Application to Proceed IFP, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buckley v. Kessler et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. A. Kessler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Hedgpeth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Cate
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. D. Lozano
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Cortez Buckley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]