Ellis et al v. Bradbury et al

Plaintiff: Steve Ellis, Tom Theobald, Bill Rhodes, Center for Environmental Health, Pesticide Action Network North America, Center for Food Safety, Beyond Pesticides, Sierra Club and Jim Doan
Defendant: Steven P. Bradbury and Bob Perciasepe
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01266
Filed: March 21, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0701 Maritime Subsidy Board
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 17, 2014 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 17, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2014)
March 24, 2014 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENTS IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 24, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
April 18, 2014 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART EPA'S MOTION TO DISMISS; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART INTERVENORS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS; AFFORDING PLAINTIFFS LEAVE TO AMEND. To the extent the motio ns seek dismissal of the Third and Fourth Claims, the motions are granted, and said Claims are dismissed with leave to amend. To the extent the motions seek dismissal of the Fifth, Sixth, Seventh, and Eighth Claims, the motions are granted, and said Claims are DISMISSED without leave to amend. To the extent the motions seek dismissal of the Thirteenth and Fourteenth Claims, the motions are granted in part. In all other respects, the motions are denied. Any Second Amended Complaint shall be filed no later than May 9, 2014. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 18, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2014)
October 20, 2014 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION REGARDING THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 20, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2014)
July 12, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 12, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2013)
July 22, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION IN PART AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The parties' stipulation, filed July 18, 2013, is approved, with the exception that the motion and opposition, respectively, shall be no more than 35 pages in length, the reply shall be no more than 20 pages in length, and the Case Management Conference is continued to December 13, 2013, at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 22, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2013)
August 6, 2013 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION ON AMENDED BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Defendants' motion to dismiss is continued to December 6, 2013. Proposed defendants/intervenors' motion to dismiss shall be filed no later than Septe mber 16, 2013, and noticed for hearing on December 6, 2013. Plaintiffs' opposition to the respective motions to dismiss shall be filed no later than October 14, 2013; the Court declines to adopt defendants' proposal as to the manner in whi ch plaintiffs may file their opposition to the respective motions to dismiss. The replies shall be filed no later than November 1, 2013. The parties' stipulation with respect to page limits as to the defendants/intervenors' motion is not approved. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 6, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2013)
August 6, 2013 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE OF BAYER CROPSCIENCE LP, SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION, LLC, AND VALENT U.S.A. CORPORATION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 6, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2013)
September 3, 2013 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON CROPLIFE AMERICA AND RISE'S MOTION TO INTERVENE; DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANTS' REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 3, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2013)
September 6, 2013 73 Opinion or Order of the Court GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART CROPLIFE AMERICA AND RISE'S MOTION TO INTERVENE; DIRECTIONS TO INTERVENING DEFENDANTS. To the extent the motion seeks an order allowing CropLife America to intervene as a defendant, the motion is gra nted. To the extent the motion seeks an order allowing RISE to intervene as a defendant, the motion is denied. All intervening defendants are directed to file a joint motion to dismiss and a joint reply. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 6, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2013)
October 11, 2013 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME; GRANTING LIMITED INTERIM EXTENSION TO FILE OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS TO DISMISS. The Court, pending ruling on the motion to enlarge time, grants plaintiffs a limited interim extension to October 18, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 11, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
October 11, 2013 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS. All proceedings are stayed. Federal Defendants shall promptly notify the Court and parties as soon as Congress has appropriated funds for EPA and the Department of Justice. The parties sh all file a joint status report within seven days of Federal Defendants' notice stating the parties' proposal(s) for a new litigation schedule. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 11, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ellis et al v. Bradbury et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Ellis
Represented By: Sylvia Shih-Yau Wu
Represented By: Paige Michele Tomaselli
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Theobald
Represented By: Sylvia Shih-Yau Wu
Represented By: Paige Michele Tomaselli
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Rhodes
Represented By: Sylvia Shih-Yau Wu
Represented By: Paige Michele Tomaselli
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Environmental Health
Represented By: Paige Michele Tomaselli
Represented By: Sylvia Shih-Yau Wu
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pesticide Action Network North America
Represented By: Sylvia Shih-Yau Wu
Represented By: Paige Michele Tomaselli
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Food Safety
Represented By: Sylvia Shih-Yau Wu
Represented By: Paige Michele Tomaselli
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beyond Pesticides
Represented By: Sylvia Shih-Yau Wu
Represented By: Paige Michele Tomaselli
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Sylvia Shih-Yau Wu
Represented By: Paige Michele Tomaselli
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Doan
Represented By: Sylvia Shih-Yau Wu
Represented By: Paige Michele Tomaselli
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven P. Bradbury
Represented By: Leslie M. Hill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Perciasepe
Represented By: Leslie M. Hill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]