Allen v. ConAgra Foods, Inc.

Plaintiff: Erin Allen
Defendant: ConAgra Foods, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01279
Filed: March 21, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 20, 2014 101 Featured Case Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 100 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2014)
September 3, 2013 41 Featured Case ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS AND, ALTERNATIVELY, TO TRANSFER by Judge Jon S. Tigar, denying 17 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2013)
September 24, 2013 48 Featured Case ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION REQUESTING CERTIFICATION OF ISSUE FOR IMMEDIATE APPEAL re 47 MOTION Defendant ConAgra Foods, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion Requesting Certification of Issue for Immediate Appeal Under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) ConAgra Foods, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 24, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
November 12, 2013 55 Featured Case ORDER DENYING MOTION REQUESTING CERTIFICATION OF ISSUE FOR IMMEDIATE APPEAL by Judge Jon S. Tigar, denying 47 Motion Requesting Certification of Issue for Immediate Appeal. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
February 24, 2014 66 Featured Case ORDER TO MEET AND CONFER RE DKT. NO. 64 . Within seven days of this order, the parties must either submit their stipulated ESI protocol, or submit competing ESI protocols for the Court to rule on. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 2/24/14. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
May 5, 2014 72 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 71 Stipulation and Scheduling Order filed by Erin Allen. Discovery due by 3/30/2015. Motions due by 8/11/2014. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/2/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
June 12, 2014 82 Featured Case Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 80 Motion for Pro Hac Vice- Taylor.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2014)
June 13, 2014 83 Featured Case ORDER REQUESTING FURTHER BRIEFING FROM PLAINTIFFS ON DISCOVERY DISPUTES. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on June 13, 2014. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2014)
August 8, 2014 88 Featured Case Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 87 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Allen v. ConAgra Foods, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Allen
Represented By: Ureka Ellie Idstrom
Represented By: Elaine T. Byszewski
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConAgra Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Stacy R. Hovan
Represented By: Robert B. Hawk
Represented By: Patrick E. Brookhouser, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]