Wedgewood Community Fund II, LLC v. Barrios et al

Plaintiff: Wedgewood Community Fund II, LLC
Defendant: Olivia Barrios and Mary Sanchez
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01293
Filed: March 21, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 18, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 9 Letter filed by Wedgewood Community Fund II, LLC for Dana J. Seyler to appear on 4/19/13 at 9:30 AM for the Show Cause Hearing. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/18/13. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
June 11, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION AND REMANDING CASE TO THE SUPERIOR COURT FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
March 28, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 4/19/2013 09:30 AM. Show Cause Response due by 4/12/2013. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on March 28, 2013. (jcslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/28/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (klhS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Wedgewood Community Fund II, LLC v. Barrios et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wedgewood Community Fund II, LLC
Represented By: Sam Chandra
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olivia Barrios
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Sanchez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]