Edstrom et al v. Anheuser-Busch InBEV SA/NV et al

Plaintiff: William Stage, Sharon Martin, Steven Edstrom, Daniel Sayle, Edward Lawrence, Mark M. Naeger, Barry Ginsburg, John Nypl and Martin Ginsburg
Defendant: Anheuser-Busch InBEV SA/NV, Grupo Modelo S.A.B. de C.V. and Constellation Brands Inc
Case Number: 3:2013cv01309
Filed: March 22, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 26, 2013 114 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins denying 75 Motion to Compel. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
September 13, 2013 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 64 , 66 DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS; DENYING 68 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 13, 2013. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2013)
September 18, 2013 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 18, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2013)
October 8, 2013 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference is continued to January 17, 2014. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 8, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2013)
October 16, 2013 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 16, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
October 16, 2013 134 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT: The action is hereby DISMISSED. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
December 17, 2013 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING DECEMBER 20, 2013 HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 17, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 23, 2013 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Plaintiffs' request for oral argument is granted and the hearing on plaintiffs' Motion for Relief from Judgment is scheduled for January 24, 2014, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 23, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2013)
January 24, 2014 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 24, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2014)
May 1, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES OF DOCUMENT IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 1, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2013)
June 4, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY YONATAN EVEN PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 4, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
June 5, 2013 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 5, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2013)
June 11, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT GRUPO MODELO S.A.B. DE C.V. AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 11, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
March 22, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER case reassigned to Honorable Maxine M. Chesney (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
July 2, 2013 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION 75 TO COMPEL DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS OF WITNESSES. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 2, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013)
July 23, 2013 93 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Granting 92 Stipulation to Continue Discovery Hearing. Discovery Hearing set for 8/9/2013 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 07/23/2013. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
July 24, 2013 94 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY IN COMPLIANCE WITH THE CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 24, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edstrom et al v. Anheuser-Busch InBEV SA/NV et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Stage
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: John Haslet Boone
Represented By: Derek G. Howard
Represented By: Jack Wing Lee
Represented By: Timothy A.C. May
Represented By: Gil D. Messina
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Jeffery Kenneth Perkins
Represented By: Thomas Paul Pier
Represented By: Kenneth R. Schwartz
Represented By: Theodore Frank Schwartz
Represented By: Peter C. Sullivan
Represented By: Sean Tamio Tamura-Sato
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Martin
Represented By: Sean Tamio Tamura-Sato
Represented By: Peter C. Sullivan
Represented By: Theodore Frank Schwartz
Represented By: Kenneth R. Schwartz
Represented By: Thomas Paul Pier
Represented By: Jeffery Kenneth Perkins
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Gil D. Messina
Represented By: Timothy A.C. May
Represented By: Jack Wing Lee
Represented By: Derek G. Howard
Represented By: John Haslet Boone
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Edstrom
Represented By: Sean Tamio Tamura-Sato
Represented By: Peter C. Sullivan
Represented By: Theodore Frank Schwartz
Represented By: Kenneth R. Schwartz
Represented By: Thomas Paul Pier
Represented By: Jeffery Kenneth Perkins
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Gil D. Messina
Represented By: Timothy A.C. May
Represented By: Jack Wing Lee
Represented By: Derek G. Howard
Represented By: John Haslet Boone
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Sayle
Represented By: Gil D. Messina
Represented By: Timothy A.C. May
Represented By: Jack Wing Lee
Represented By: Derek G. Howard
Represented By: John Haslet Boone
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Jeffery Kenneth Perkins
Represented By: Thomas Paul Pier
Represented By: Kenneth R. Schwartz
Represented By: Theodore Frank Schwartz
Represented By: Peter C. Sullivan
Represented By: Sean Tamio Tamura-Sato
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Lawrence
Represented By: Sean Tamio Tamura-Sato
Represented By: Peter C. Sullivan
Represented By: Theodore Frank Schwartz
Represented By: Kenneth R. Schwartz
Represented By: Thomas Paul Pier
Represented By: Jeffery Kenneth Perkins
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Gil D. Messina
Represented By: Timothy A.C. May
Represented By: Jack Wing Lee
Represented By: Derek G. Howard
Represented By: John Haslet Boone
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark M. Naeger
Represented By: Sean Tamio Tamura-Sato
Represented By: Peter C. Sullivan
Represented By: Theodore Frank Schwartz
Represented By: Kenneth R. Schwartz
Represented By: Thomas Paul Pier
Represented By: Jeffery Kenneth Perkins
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Gil D. Messina
Represented By: Timothy A.C. May
Represented By: Jack Wing Lee
Represented By: Derek G. Howard
Represented By: John Haslet Boone
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Ginsburg
Represented By: Sean Tamio Tamura-Sato
Represented By: Peter C. Sullivan
Represented By: Theodore Frank Schwartz
Represented By: Kenneth R. Schwartz
Represented By: Thomas Paul Pier
Represented By: Jeffery Kenneth Perkins
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Gil D. Messina
Represented By: Timothy A.C. May
Represented By: Jack Wing Lee
Represented By: Derek G. Howard
Represented By: John Haslet Boone
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Nypl
Represented By: Sean Tamio Tamura-Sato
Represented By: Peter C. Sullivan
Represented By: Theodore Frank Schwartz
Represented By: Kenneth R. Schwartz
Represented By: Thomas Paul Pier
Represented By: Jeffery Kenneth Perkins
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Gil D. Messina
Represented By: Timothy A.C. May
Represented By: Jack Wing Lee
Represented By: Derek G. Howard
Represented By: John Haslet Boone
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Ginsburg
Represented By: Sean Tamio Tamura-Sato
Represented By: Peter C. Sullivan
Represented By: Theodore Frank Schwartz
Represented By: Kenneth R. Schwartz
Represented By: Thomas Paul Pier
Represented By: Jeffery Kenneth Perkins
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Gil D. Messina
Represented By: Timothy A.C. May
Represented By: Jack Wing Lee
Represented By: Derek G. Howard
Represented By: John Haslet Boone
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anheuser-Busch InBEV SA/NV
Represented By: Ian G John
Represented By: James A. Keyte
Represented By: Karen Hoffman Lent
Represented By: Allen Ruby
Represented By: Steven C. Sunshine
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grupo Modelo S.A.B. de C.V.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Constellation Brands Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]