Do v. Hollins Law, P.C.

Plaintiff: Vien Do
Defendant: Hollins Law, P.C.
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01322
Filed: March 25, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
 
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 26, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE MOTION TO TRANSFER. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/26/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2013)
May 21, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO CLARIFY STATUS OF 20 Motion to Transfer Case. Joint Status Report due by 2:00 p.m. on May 22, 2013. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 21, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2013)
June 12, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND DENYING AS MOOT MOTIONS TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/12/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2013)
June 17, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARINGS AND DENYING MOTIONS TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE WITHOUT PREJUDICE: as to 20 MOTION to Transfer Case; AND 24 First MOTION to Dismiss : Motion Hearing set for 7/26/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/17/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013)
June 20, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO MOTION TO STRIKE REPLY BRIEF. Replies due by 3:00 p.m. on 6/25/2013.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/20/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
July 12, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 20 Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on July 12, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2013)
July 18, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON MOTION TO DIMISS; DENYING OBJECTIONS TO REPLY; AND DENYING AS MOOT SECOND MOTION TO APPEAR BY PHONE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/18/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2013)
August 5, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 8/23/2013. Case Management Conference set for 8/30/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/5/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
September 24, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 54 STIPULATION selecting Mediation. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/24/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
October 1, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/1/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Do v. Hollins Law, P.C.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vien Do
Represented By: Ryan Scott Lee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hollins Law, P.C.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]