Cascadia Windows LTD et al v. Radiant Global Logistics, Inc et al

Defendant: Radiant Global Logistics, Inc, Airgroup Adcom Worldwide Distribution by Air, Border Express Services, LTD and PTL Logistics, Inc
Plaintiff: Cascadia Windows LTD and The Dominion of Canada General Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2013cv01331
Filed: March 25, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 13, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 13 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2013)
October 9, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER WITHDRAWING REFERRAL TO ADR UNIT FOR MEDIATION. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/9/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
October 9, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE DIRECTED TO PLAINTIFFS: Show Cause Response due by noon on 10/24/2013. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/9/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
June 25, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING Initial Case Management Conference to 8/28/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Parties shall file case management statement and consent or declination form by 8/21/13. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 6/25/13. (Attachments: # 1 Consent/Declination)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cascadia Windows LTD et al v. Radiant Global Logistics, Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radiant Global Logistics, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airgroup Adcom Worldwide Distribution by Air
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Border Express Services, LTD
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PTL Logistics, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cascadia Windows LTD
Represented By: Michael C. Douglass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Dominion of Canada General Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael C. Douglass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]