Prince et al v. Fremont Police Department et al

Plaintiff: Kisha Prince, Daryl Prince, Justice Prince and Khloe Prince
Defendant: Fremont Police Department, Hoquin and Gaghes
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01366
Filed: March 27, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2013 16 Featured Case ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting in part and denying in part 10 Motion to Dismiss; Denied as moot 14 Motion to Strike (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
August 9, 2013 28 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL. Show Cause Response due by 8/23/2013. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 8/9/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
August 27, 2013 32 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DISMISSING ACTION. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) Motion Terminated: 27 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2013)
August 27, 2013 33 Featured Case JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 8/27/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2013)
August 30, 2013 37 Featured Case ORDER ( 28 , 32 , 33 , 35 )VACATING DISMISSAL, REOPENING ACTION, AND REMANDING ACTION TO STATE COURT. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 8/30/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Prince et al v. Fremont Police Department et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kisha Prince
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daryl Prince
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justice Prince
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khloe Prince
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fremont Police Department
Represented By: Arlene Catherine Helfrich
Represented By: Arlene C. Helfrich
Represented By: Gregory Mellon Fox
Represented By: Harvey Ezekiel Levine
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoquin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaghes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]