Collins v. Alameda County Superior Court

Plaintiff: Michael E. Collins
Defendant: Alameda County Superior Court
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01371
Filed: March 27, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: PSLC JNE
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
 
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 4, 2014 15 Featured Case ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/4/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2014)
May 27, 2014 24 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO REOPEN; VACATING DISMISSAL AND JUDGMENT; SCHEDULING BRIEFING; DENYING EXTENSION OF TIME TO PAY FILING FEE; INSTRUCTIONS TO CLERK. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/27/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 2, 2013 3 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/2/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Collins v. Alameda County Superior Court
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael E. Collins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alameda County Superior Court
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]